Bryson v. Milford Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Sabrina Bryson
Defendant: M.D. Hayley Marshall, Milford Regional Medical Center, Ute K Taylor and American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Judge David Hennessy
Not Classified By Court: Joan F. Renehan
Case Number: 4:2011cv40052
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 225 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 14, 2021 Filing 224 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day 6 held on November 10, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. Redaction Request due 2/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
January 14, 2021 Filing 223 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day 1 held on November 3, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com. Redaction Request due 2/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn)
December 11, 2014 Filing 222 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 11, 2014 Filing 221 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Six - Testimony of Brendan Kearney held on November 10, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 1/1/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 218 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Six (Closing Statement of Ms. Buell) held on November 10, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 217 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Five (Continued Testimony of Ronald Pye,M.D.) held on November 7, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 216 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Five (Testimony of Prescott Clark) held on November 7, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 215 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four (Testimony of Ronald Pye, M.D.) held on November 6, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 214 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Four (Testimony of Monica Kleinman, M.D.) held on November 6, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 213 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Three (Testimony of Prescott Clark) held on November 5, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 212 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day Two (Testimony of David Brass) held on November 4, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 211 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day One (Opening Statement of Ms. Buell) held on November 3, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 210 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day One (Opening Statement of Ms. Williams) held on November 3, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 209 EXCERPT Transcript of Jury Trial Day One (Examination of Abdullah Rehayem) held on November 3, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 12/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/10/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
November 12, 2014 Filing 208 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of the defendant American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc., against the plaintiff. (Castles, Martin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 207 Jury trial Witness List. (Castles, Martin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 206 Jury trial Exhibit List. (Castles, Martin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 205 JURY VERDICT in favor of Defendant American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc., against Plaintiff. (Castles, Martin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 204 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/12/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 7, Jury deliberation continue, Jury returns verdict in favor of the dft, Jury excused with the thanks of the Court. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 12, 2014 Filing 203 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #194 Motion for Directed Verdict (Castles, Martin)
November 10, 2014 Filing 202 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/10/2014; Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 6, Defendant's case continues, Dft rests, Closing arguments of dft given, Closing arguments of plaintiff given, Court charges jury, Jury deliberations commence, Court answers jury question on the record, Jury excused for the day, ( Jury Trial continued to 11/12/2014 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman), Court rules denying #184 Motion to Bifurcate outside the hearing of the jury, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 7, 2014 Filing 201 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/7/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 5, Dft's case continues with witness testimony, ( Jury Trial continued to 11/10/2014 at 8:30AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 7, 2014 Filing 199 Opposition re #196 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Cumulative Expert Testimony filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
November 6, 2014 Filing 198 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
November 6, 2014 Filing 197 Opposition to Motion re #194 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail) Modified on 11/7/2014 (Burgos, Sandra).
November 6, 2014 Filing 196 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Cumulative Expert Testimony by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
November 6, 2014 Filing 195 MEMORANDUM in Support re #194 MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
November 6, 2014 Filing 194 MOTION for Directed Verdict by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
November 6, 2014 Filing 193 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/6/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 4, Plaintiff's case continues with witness testimony, Plaintiff rests, Dft moves for directed verdict, Taken under advisement, Dft's case commences with witness testimony, Jury trial continued to 11/7/14 at 9:00AM, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 5, 2014 Filing 192 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/5/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 3, Plaintiff's case continues with witness testimony, Jury trial continued to 11/6/14 at 9:00AM, Court rules taking under advisement #184 Motion to Bifurcate. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 5, 2014 Filing 191 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDERS entered in open court on 11/3/14: Denying #108 Motion in Limine; granting in part #120 Motion in Limine; granting in part #122 Motion in Limine; granting in part #123 Motion in Limine; granting #124 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #125 Motion in Limine; granting #126 Motion in Limine. (Castles, Martin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 190 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Punitive Damages by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Jauquet, Pauline)
November 4, 2014 Filing 189 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/4/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 2, Plaintiff's case commences with witness testimony, Jury trial continued to 11/5/14 at 8:30AM. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 4, 2014 Filing 188 RESPONSE to Motion re #184 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
November 3, 2014 Filing 187 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Jury Trial held on 11/3/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for jury trial day 1, Court and counsel meet outside the hearing of the jury panel, Court rules on In limine motions, Voir dire held, Jury selection held, Court empanels 8 jurors, Opening statements of plaintiff given, Opening statements of dft given, Jury trial continued to 11/4/14, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
November 3, 2014 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM in Support re #184 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
November 3, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Bifurcate by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
November 2, 2014 Filing 183 TRIAL BRIEF by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Jauquet, Pauline)
November 1, 2014 Filing 182 Objection by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. to the Admission of Plaintiff's Proposed Exhibit of Photos of Baby Vaughn and Family in Hospital. (Buell, Barbara)
November 1, 2014 Filing 181 Amended Proposed Jury Verdict by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
November 1, 2014 Filing 180 Amended Proposed Jury Instructions by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 31, 2014 Filing 179 Set/Reset Hearings: Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 10/31/2014 09:30 AM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa)
October 30, 2014 Filing 186 Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge David Hennessy appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
October 30, 2014 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to #123 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying to Matters Outside the Scope of the Subject Incident filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 30, 2014 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to #121 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Reference to Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Medical Records or Medical Conditions Unrelated to Subject Incident filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 30, 2014 Filing 176 REPLY to Response to #122 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Testifying Regarding Medical Conditions of Sabrina Bryson Unrelated to Subject Incident filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 30, 2014 Filing 175 REPLY to Response to #127 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying that Other Defendants Were Dismissed Prior to Trial filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 30, 2014 Filing 174 REPLY to Response to #120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Reference to Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Record of Criminal Convictions filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 30, 2014 Filing 173 REPLY to Response to #125 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Informed Consent or Assumption of the Risk of Negligent Care filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 30, 2014 Filing 172 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #161 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #162 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #163 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #164 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #165 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #166 Motion for Leave to File Document; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (Castles, Martin)
October 30, 2014 Filing 171 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #107 Motion to Dismiss. (Castles, Martin)
October 30, 2014 Filing 169 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 10/31/2014 9:30 AM in BOSTON, Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa)
October 30, 2014 Filing 168 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Hennessy for mediation.(Castles, Martin)
October 29, 2014 Filing 170 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/29/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for final pretrial conference, Court and counsel discuss trial and the Court hears arguments of counsel on motions in limine, Court rules taking under advisement #108 Motion in Limine; finding as moot #119 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #120 Motion in Limine; granting #121 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #122 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #123 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #124 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #125 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement #126 Motion in Limine; finding as moot #127 Motion in Limine; withdrawing #128 Motion in Limine; ( Jury Trial set for 11/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman., Jury Trial set for 11/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman., Jury Trial set for 11/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman., Jury Trial set for 11/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman., Jury Trial set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams,Atwater/Buell) (Castles, Martin)
October 29, 2014 NOTICE Resetting TIME ONLY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference TIME reset for 10/29/2014 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 28, 2014 Filing 167 Second Proposed Jury Verdict by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 28, 2014 Filing 166 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition [D.E. 150] to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Regarding Matters Outside the Scope of Subject Incident [D.E. 123] by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 28, 2014 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition [D.E. 124] to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Regarding Vaughn Wilson Sr.'s Medical Records Unrelated to Subject Incident [D.E. 121] by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 28, 2014 Filing 164 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition [D.E. 149] to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Regarding Sabrina Bryson's Medical Records Unrelated to Subject Incident [D.E. 125] by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 28, 2014 Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition [D.E. 146] to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Regarding Dismissal of Prior Defendants [D.E. 127] by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 28, 2014 Filing 162 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition [D.E. 147] to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine regarding Vaughn Adam Wilson Sr.'s Criminal Convictions [D.E. 120] by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 28, 2014 Filing 161 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition [DE 149] to Plaintiff's Motion In Limine Regarding Informed Consent or Assumption of Risk [DE 125] by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 160 TRIAL BRIEF by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 159 Amended Proposed Voir Dire by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 158 Amended Proposed Jury Verdict by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 157 Objection to #117 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sabrina Bryson . (Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 156 Objection to #141 Witness List by Sabrina Bryson [Defendant's Second Supplemental Witness List]. (Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 155 Plaintiff's Objections to #140 Defendant's Second Supplemental Exhibit List by Sabrina Bryson.. (Williams, Abigail) Modified on 10/27/2014 (Jones, Sherry).
October 24, 2014 Filing 154 Supplemental Proposed Jury Instructions by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 24, 2014 Filing 153 DUPLICATE OF 152, BUT WITH EXHIBITS. Opposition re #124 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying That "They Did Their Best" filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Expert Report)(Buell, Barbara) Modified on 10/27/2014 (Jones, Sherry).
October 24, 2014 Filing 152 Opposition re #124 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying That "They Did Their Best" filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 151 Opposition re #119 MOTION in Limine to Read Pertinent Parts of Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Deposition Transcript filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 150 Opposition re #123 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying to Matters Outside the Scope of the Subject Incident filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 149 Opposition re #125 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Informed Consent or Assumption of the Risk of Negligent Care filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 148 Opposition re #128 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Testifying, Stating, or Referring to Vaughn Adam Wilson, Jr. as a "Fetus" filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 147 Opposition re #120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Reference to Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Record of Criminal Convictions filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 146 Opposition re #127 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying that Other Defendants Were Dismissed Prior to Trial filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 145 Opposition re #126 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Apologizing or Expressing Condolences in Public filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 144 Opposition re #121 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Reference to Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Medical Records or Medical Conditions Unrelated to Subject Incident filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 23, 2014 Filing 143 Opposition re #122 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Testifying Regarding Medical Conditions of Sabrina Bryson Unrelated to Subject Incident filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 22, 2014 Filing 142 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 22, 2014 Filing 141 Second Supplemental Witness List by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 22, 2014 Filing 140 Second Supplemental Exhibit List by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc... (Buell, Barbara)
October 22, 2014 Filing 139 Supplemental Witness List by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 21, 2014 Filing 138 Supplemental Exhibit List by Sabrina Bryson.. (Williams, Abigail)
October 20, 2014 Filing 137 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Plaintiff, Individually, by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 17, 2014 Filing 136 Plaintiff's Witness List by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 135 Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Sabrina Bryson.. (Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 134 Proposed Voir Dire by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 133 Proposed Jury Verdict by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 132 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 131 Proposed Jury Questions by Sabrina Bryson . (Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 130 REPLY to Response to #108 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Plaintiff's Witness Abdullah Rehayem from Testifying at Trial filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 17, 2014 Filing 129 Supplemental Exhibit List by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc... (Buell, Barbara)
October 17, 2014 Filing 128 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Testifying, Stating, or Referring to Vaughn Adam Wilson, Jr. as a "Fetus" by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 127 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying that Other Defendants Were Dismissed Prior to Trial by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 126 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Apologizing or Expressing Condolences in Public by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 125 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Informed Consent or Assumption of the Risk of Negligent Care by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 124 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying That "They Did Their Best" by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Stating or Testifying to Matters Outside the Scope of the Subject Incident by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 122 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant, American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. from Testifying Regarding Medical Conditions of Sabrina Bryson Unrelated to Subject Incident by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 121 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Reference to Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Medical Records or Medical Conditions Unrelated to Subject Incident by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 120 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony, Evidence, and Reference to Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Record of Criminal Convictions by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
October 17, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION in Limine to Read Pertinent Parts of Plaintiff's Witness, Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr.'s Deposition Transcript by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Depo Transcript for Vaughn Adam Wilson, Sr., #2 Exhibit B - Abuse Prevention Order)(Williams, Abigail)
October 16, 2014 Filing 118 Proposed Voir Dire by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 16, 2014 Filing 117 Proposed Jury Instructions by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 16, 2014 Filing 116 Proposed Jury Verdict by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 16, 2014 Filing 115 Supplemental Witness List by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 16, 2014 Filing 114 Witness List by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
October 16, 2014 Filing 113 Exhibit List by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc... (Buell, Barbara)
October 16, 2014 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Ute K Taylor re #111 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants, Ute K. Taylor, R.N. and Milford Regional Medical Center, Inc., Only, with Prejudice, without Costs and Waiving All Rights of Appeal. (Colman, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2014 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendants, Ute K. Taylor, R.N. and Milford Regional Medical Center, Inc., Only, with Prejudice, Without Costs and Waiving All Rights of Appeal by Ute K Taylor. (Colman, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2014 Filing 110 Opposition re #108 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Plaintiff's Witness Abdullah Rehayem from Testifying at Trial filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
October 15, 2014 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin A. Atwater on behalf of Sabrina Bryson (Atwater, Erin)
October 14, 2014 Filing 108 MOTION in Limine to Prohibit Plaintiff's Witness Abdullah Rehayem from Testifying at Trial by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
October 13, 2014 Filing 107 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants, Milford Regional Medical Center, Inc. and Ute K. Taylor, R.N. by Ute K Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colman, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2014 Filing 106 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buell, Barbara)
July 31, 2014 Filing 105 DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by Ute K Taylor . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nurse Armstrong, #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Lichter, #3 Exhibit C - Dr. D'Alton, #4 Exhibit D - Dr. Ringer, #5 Exhibit E - Dr. Hutter, #6 Exhibit F - Dr. Silken)(Faggiano, John)
July 31, 2014 Filing 104 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Milford Regional Medical Center.(Cheslofska, Richard)
July 31, 2014 Filing 103 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Buell, Barbara)
June 12, 2014 Filing 102 DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS by Sabrina Bryson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Kleinman Report, #2 Exhibit A - Kleinman CV, #3 Exhibit A - Klienman Testimony and Fees, #4 Exhibit B - Kensey Report, CV and Fees, #5 Exhibit C - Forgues Report, CV and Fees)(Williams, Abigail)
May 9, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Abigail R. Williams [Change of Firm Address Only] (Williams, Abigail)
May 9, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE by Sabrina Bryson Withdrawal of Appearance for Attorney Ross Annenberg and Attorney Carmela Telese. Attorney Abigail Williams remains as Lead Council. (Williams, Abigail)
May 7, 2014 Filing 99 Documents received from the Medical Tribunal. (No judgment or opinion received.) (Jones, Sherry)
April 30, 2014 Filing 98 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #96 Motion for Reconsideration. (Castles, Martin)
April 21, 2014 Filing 96 MOTION for Reconsideration of Trial Date by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
April 10, 2014 Filing 95 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 4/10/2014, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Parties inform the Court that the only remaining discovery is expert depositions, Court and counsel discuss the issue of case going to state court, Court sets a jury trial date, Jury Trial set for 11/3/2014 at 9:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman, Court cancels final pretrial conference set for 5/5/14, The final Pretrial Conference is reset for 10/29/2014 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman, All In limine motions, Proposed voir dire questions, Proposed jury instructions, Witness/exhibit lists and proposed jury verdict forms are due by 10/17/14, Responses to In limine motions are due by 10/24/14. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams/Faggiano,Hunter,Bettigole) (Castles, Martin)
April 4, 2014 Filing 94 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Conference set for 4/10/2014 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. The call in number is 888-675-2535 Access code 9932461.(Castles, Martin)
April 3, 2014 Filing 93 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2014 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman.(Castles, Martin)
March 27, 2014 Filing 92 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER entered granting #79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin)
August 26, 2013 Filing 87 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2013 re #79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Milford Regional Medical Center, Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #79 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Williams/Cheslofska,Colman,Bettigole) (Castles, Martin)
July 31, 2013 Filing 86 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Canceling Deadline. The status conference set for 7/31/13 is hereby canceled. The Court will hold the status conference on the date of the hearing on the motion for summary judgment. Which is currently set for 8/26/13 at 2:30PM.(Castles, Martin)
June 19, 2013 Filing 85 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Milford Regional Medical Records, #2 Exhibit B - Sabrina Bryson Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Sabrina Bryson Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Vaughn Wilson Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - AMR Records, #6 Exhibit F - Vaughn Jr Medical Records, #7 Exhibit G - Death Certificate, #8 Exhibit H - Marshall Depo Transcript, #9 Exhibit J - Clark Depo Transcript, #10 Exhibit K - Hart Depo Transcript)(Annenberg, Ross)
June 19, 2013 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Milford Regional Medical Records, #2 Exhibit B - Sabrina Bryson Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Sabrina Bryson Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Vaughn Wilson Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - AMR Medical Records, #6 Exhibit F - Vaughn Jr Medical Records, #7 Exhibit G - Death Certificate, #8 Exhibit H - Marshall Depo Transcript, #9 Exhibit I - Policies Index, #10 Exhibit J - Clark Depo Transcript, #11 Exhibit K - Hart Depo Transcript)(Annenberg, Ross)
June 19, 2013 Filing 83 Opposition re #79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Annenberg, Ross)
June 3, 2013 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal Hayley Marshall, D.O. by Sabrina Bryson. (Annenberg, Ross)
May 31, 2013 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Support re #79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Milford Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Memo of Law in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibits E-L to Memo of Law in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment)(Cheslofska, Richard)
May 31, 2013 Filing 80 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Milford Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of MRMC Keeper of Records in Support of Statement of Facts)(Cheslofska, Richard)
May 30, 2013 Filing 79 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Milford Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts to MRMC Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of MRMC Keeper of Records - Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Memo of Law Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit Exhibits E-L to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.1)(Cheslofska, Richard)
May 13, 2013 Filing 78 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 5/13/2013, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Parties inform the Court of the status of the case and discovery, Fact discovery is complete except for a few minor outstanding issues that the parties anticipate will be completed shortly, Medical Tribunal is scheduled for 6/7/13 for dft Marshall, Dft Milford requests leave to file motion for summary judgment, Other dfts do not expect to file summary judgment motions, Court grants request, Motion filing deadlines will be set as follows: Motions due by 5/31/2013, Responses due by 6/21/2013, Motion Hearing is set for 8/26/2013 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman, Court sets further statue conference, ( Status Conference set for 7/31/2013 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Annenberg/Cheslofska,Colman,Jauquet,Renehan) (Castles, Martin)
April 17, 2013 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 5/13/2013 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
January 3, 2013 Filing 76 Return receipt received for mail sent to Worcester Superior Court. Delivered on 12/21/2012. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 14, 2012 Filing 75 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Medical Malpractice Tribunal.(Castles, Martin)
December 14, 2012 Filing 74 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #70 Motion for Referral to Medical Malpractice Tribunal (Castles, Martin)
December 14, 2012 Filing 73 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 5/2/2013 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
December 14, 2012 Filing 72 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part #68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties are granted an additional 4 months to complete fact discovery.Fact Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2013. (Castles, Martin)
December 7, 2012 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #70 Assented to MOTION for Referral to Medical Malpractice Tribunal filed by Hayley Marshall. (Renehan, Joan)
December 7, 2012 Filing 70 Assented to MOTION for Referral to Medical Malpractice Tribunal by Hayley Marshall.(Renehan, Joan)
December 7, 2012 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Support re #68 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2013 to Complete Discovery filed by Hayley Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling order, #2 Exhibit Joint Motion to extend discovery deadline, #3 Exhibit Order granting motion for extension of time to complete discovery)(Renehan, Joan)
December 7, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2013 to Complete Discovery by Hayley Marshall.(Renehan, Joan)
November 26, 2012 Filing 67 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Sabrina Bryson. Hayley Marshall served on 11/9/2012, answer due 11/30/2012. Acknowledgement filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Annenberg, Ross)
November 8, 2012 Filing 66 ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint by Hayley Marshall.(Renehan, Joan)
November 7, 2012 Filing 65 ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
November 5, 2012 Filing 64 ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Demand for Jury Trial by Ute K Taylor.(Faggiano, John)
November 1, 2012 Filing 63 ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint by Milford Regional Medical Center.(Cheslofska, Richard)
October 29, 2012 Filing 62 Summons Issued as to Hayley Marshall. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 26, 2012 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT To Add A Party Defendant, Hayley Marshall, M.D. against All Defendants, filed by Sabrina Bryson.(Annenberg, Ross)
October 25, 2012 Filing 60 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #57 Motion to Amend complaint. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the amended complaint in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures; (Castles, Martin)
October 3, 2012 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, To Add A Party Defendant filed by Joan F. Renehan. ( re-entered, as memorandum should be filed as separate entries) (Burgos, Sandra)
October 2, 2012 Filing 58 First Opposition re #57 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, To Add A Party Defendant Dr. Hayley Marshall filed by Joan F. Renehan. (Renehan, Joan) (Main Document 58 replaced on 10/3/2012) (Burgos, Sandra).
September 28, 2012 Filing 57 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, To Add A Party Defendant by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Haley Marshall, D.O. Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Rose Galimi-Hayes Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Ute Taylor, R.N. Deposition Excerpts)(Annenberg, Ross)
September 17, 2012 Filing 56 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 1/3/2013 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 17, 2012 Filing 55 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery to be completed by 12/31/2012. (Castles, Martin)
September 17, 2012 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support re #53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/31/12 to Complete Discovery filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc., Sabrina Bryson, Milford Regional Medical Center, Ute K Taylor. (Buell, Barbara)
September 17, 2012 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/31/12 to Complete Discovery by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc., Sabrina Bryson, Milford Regional Medical Center, Ute K Taylor.(Buell, Barbara)
June 27, 2012 Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to complete discovery and finding as moot #40 Motion to Compel; finding as moot #42 Motion to Compel. (Castles, Martin) Modified on 6/27/2012 (Castles, Martin).
June 21, 2012 Filing 52 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered to Obtain a Complete Set of Medical Records and Original Pathology Slides and/or Specimens from UMass Memorial Medical Center. (Castles, Martin)
June 21, 2012 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 6/21/2012, Case called, Counsel appear, Counsel discuss status of case, Counsel orally move to extend discovery deadlines, All requests for production of documents, interrogatories and requests for admission to be served by July 20, 2012, Further Status Conference set for 9/28/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Court Reporter: Helana Kline at helanakline@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Telese, Bettigole, Cheslofska, Colman) (Belpedio, Lisa)
June 21, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmela L. Telese on behalf of Sabrina Bryson (Telese, Carmela)
June 20, 2012 Filing 50 Opposition re #42 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Nurse Taylor filed by Ute K Taylor. (Colman, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2012 SECOND ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 6/21/2012 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
June 12, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 6/20/2012 at 2:15PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
June 12, 2012 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment to New District Judge Timothy S Hillman. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
May 31, 2012 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to #40 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories and Request for Production from American Medical Response Plaintiff's Reply to American Medical Response's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
May 29, 2012 Filing 48 Opposition re #40 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories and Request for Production from American Medical Response filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
May 24, 2012 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/25/2012 to Plaintiff to complete discovery filed by Ute K Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colman, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION for Order to to Obtain a Complete Set of Medical Records and Original Pathology Slides and/or Specimens from UMass Memorial Medical Center by Ute K Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Colman, Jeffrey)
May 22, 2012 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/25/2012 to Plaintiff to complete discovery Plaintiff, Sabrina Bryson Individually and as Administratrix of the Estate of Vaughn Adam Wilson, Jr. Reply Brief filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Williams, Abigail)
May 21, 2012 Filing 44 Opposition re #39 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/25/2012 to Plaintiff to complete discovery filed by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.. (Buell, Barbara)
May 21, 2012 Filing 43 Withdrawal of motion: #41 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories and Request For Production from Milford Regional Hospital filed by Sabrina Bryson.. (Williams, Abigail)
May 16, 2012 Filing 42 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories Nurse Taylor by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
May 16, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories and Request For Production from Milford Regional Hospital by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
May 16, 2012 Filing 40 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories and Request for Production from American Medical Response by Sabrina Bryson.(Williams, Abigail)
May 10, 2012 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/25/2012 to Plaintiff to complete discovery by Sabrina Bryson.(Annenberg, Ross)
January 31, 2012 Filing 38 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
January 31, 2012 Filing 37 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/15/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2012. Discovery to be completed by 10/1/2012(Castles, Martin)
January 27, 2012 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 1/27/2012. Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, The Medical Tribunal has been completed and the parties are ready to proceed with fact discovery, Court orders partial scheduling order deadlines, Scheduling order to issue, Court will revisit fact discovery deadline and order expert discovery deadlines and dispositive motion filing deadlines at a future hearing. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Annenberg/Cheslofska,Colman,Bettigole) (Castles, Martin)
January 19, 2012 Filing 36 FINDINGS of the Medical Malpractice Tribunal. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 12, 2012 Filing 35 REPORT of the Medical Malpractice Tribunal. (Burgos, Sandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2012: #1 State Court Records Part 1, #2 State Court Records Part 2, #3 State Court Records Part 3, #4 State Court Records Part 4, #5 State Court Records Part 5) (Burgos, Sandra).
November 23, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 1/27/2012 at 11:15AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Parties informed Court that Tribunal has been continued to 1/10/12.(Castles, Martin)
November 8, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 11/8/2011, Case called, Counsel appear for status conference, Parties inform Court that the medical tribunal is scheduled for 12/6/11, Court sets further status conference after the tribunal is held, ( Status Conference set for 12/21/2011 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Annenberg in person/Bettigole,Cheslofska,Colman all by phone) (Castles, Martin)
November 4, 2011 Filing 34 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Milford Regional Medical Center.(Cheslofska, Richard)
November 1, 2011 Filing 33 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Ute K Taylor.(Colman, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2011 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: docket entry #31 corrected because: incorrect document attached, counsel refiled as #32 . (Burgos, Sandra)
October 13, 2011 Filing 32 Corrected Initial disclosure pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara) Modified docket text on 10/14/2011 (Burgos, Sandra).
October 13, 2011 Filing 31 Initial disclosure pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara) Modified on 10/14/2011 (Burgos, Sandra).
September 26, 2011 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2011 re #24 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(f) filed by Sabrina Bryson, and #18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Milford Regional Medical Center; Case called, Counsel appear for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules denying without prejudice #18 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting #24 Motion for Discovery; Court and counsel discuss status of discovery, Court expects initial discovery to be completed or commenced if it has not been completed, All other discovery is stayed, Medical tribunal has not be held as of this date, Counsel to inquire of state court the status of the tribunal hearing, Court sets further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV) (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Annenberg/Cheslofska,Colman,Bettigole) (Castles, Martin) Modified on 10/13/2011 (Castles, Martin).
August 24, 2011 Filing 30 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Sabrina Bryson.(Annenberg, Ross)
August 3, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Pauline A. Jauquet Change of Firm Name Only (Jauquet, Pauline)
August 3, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Kara A. Bettigole Change of Firm Name Only (Bettigole, Kara)
August 3, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Barbara Hayes Buell Change of Firm Name Only (Buell, Barbara)
July 20, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and #24 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(f) : Motion Hearing/status conference set for 9/26/2011 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
July 20, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Status conference set for 7/21/11 is hereby canceled. (Castles, Martin)
July 20, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Pauline A. Jauquet on behalf of American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. (Jauquet, Pauline)
July 5, 2011 Filing 25 Opposition re #24 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(f) filed by Milford Regional Medical Center. (Cheslofska, Richard)
July 1, 2011 Filing 24 MOTION for Discovery Rule 56(f) by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Abigail R. Williams, Esquire)(Annenberg, Ross)
July 1, 2011 Filing 23 STATEMENT of facts re #18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MRMC Records, #2 Exhibit 7/1/11 Affidavit of Sabrina Bryson, #3 Exhibit 2/18/11 Affidavit of Sabrina Bryson, #4 Exhibit 2/18/11 Affidavit of Vaughn Wilson, #5 Exhibit AMR Records, #6 Exhibit UMass Records, #7 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Annenberg, Ross) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/20/2011) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/20/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).
July 1, 2011 Filing 22 Opposition re #18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MRMC Records, #2 Exhibit 7/11/11 Affidavit of Sabrina Bryson, #3 Exhibit 2/18/11 Affidavit of Sabrina Bryson, #4 Exhibit 2/18/11 Affidavit of Vauhn Wilson, #5 Exhibit AMR Records, #6 Exhibit UMass Records, #7 Exhibit Death Certificate)(Annenberg, Ross) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/20/2011) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 5 replaced on 7/20/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).
June 15, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION pursuant to LR 7.1 re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment by Richard F. Cheslofska on behalf of Milford Regional Medical Center filed by on behalf of Milford Regional Medical Center. (Cheslofska, Richard) (Main Document 21 replaced on 6/16/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).
June 15, 2011 Filing 20 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment filed by Milford Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KOR Affidavit with Exhibits)(Cheslofska, Richard) (Main Document 20 replaced on 6/16/2011) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).
June 15, 2011 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial Summary Judgment filed by Milford Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Memorandum of Law)(Cheslofska, Richard) (Main Document 19 replaced on 6/16/2011) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).
June 15, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Milford Regional Medical Center.(Cheslofska, Richard) Modified docket text on 6/16/2011 (Burgos, Sandra). (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/16/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).
May 20, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara A. Bettigole on behalf of American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. (Bettigole, Kara)
May 4, 2011 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Emergency Medical Services Corporation for American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc... (Buell, Barbara)
April 18, 2011 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc..(Buell, Barbara)
April 11, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Hayes Buell on behalf of American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. (Buell, Barbara)
April 7, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/21/2011 at 2:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Castles, Martin)
April 7, 2011 Filing 13 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Medical Malpractice Tribunal.(Castles, Martin)
April 7, 2011 Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #8 Motion for Referral to Medical Malpractice Tribunal. (Castles, Martin)
April 6, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudia A. Hunter on behalf of Milford Regional Medical Center (Hunter, Claudia)
April 6, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard F. Cheslofska on behalf of Milford Regional Medical Center (Cheslofska, Richard)
April 6, 2011 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Milford Regional Medical Center.(Hunter, Claudia)
April 1, 2011 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 Assented to MOTION for Referral to Medical Malpractice Tribunal in the Superior Court Department of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts Pursuant to M.G.L. Ch. 231, Sec. 60B filed by Ute K Taylor. (Colman, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2011 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Referral to Medical Malpractice Tribunal in the Superior Court Department of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts Pursuant to M.G.L. Ch. 231, Sec. 60B by Ute K Taylor.(Colman, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2011 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ute K Taylor served on 3/22/2011, answer due 4/12/2011. (Annenberg, Ross)
March 31, 2011 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc. served on 3/28/2011, answer due 4/18/2011. (Annenberg, Ross)
March 31, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Colman on behalf of Ute K Taylor (Colman, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2011 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Ute K Taylor.(Faggiano, John)
March 28, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed Milford Regional Medical Center served on 3/22/2011, answer due 4/12/2011. (Annenberg, Ross)
March 14, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc., Milford Regional Medical Center, Ute K Taylor. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 14, 2011 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 14, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3310455 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Sabrina Bryson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Affidavit of Sabrina Bryson, #4 Affidavit of Vaugh Wilson)(Annenberg, Ross) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2011) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/14/2011) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryson v. Milford Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Judge David Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Hayley Marshall
Represented By: Joan F. Renehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milford Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Richard F. Cheslofska
Represented By: Claudia A. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ute K Taylor
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Colman
Represented By: John P. Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Response of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Kara A. Bettigole
Represented By: Barbara Hayes Buell
Represented By: Pauline A. Jauquet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Joan F. Renehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Sabrina Bryson
Represented By: Erin A. Atwater
Represented By: Ross A. Annenberg
Represented By: Carmela L. Telese
Represented By: Abigail R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?