Rivera v. Worcester et al

Plaintiff: Paublo Rivera
Defendant: City of Worcester, Richard Burgos, James O'Rourke, Francis Bartley and Gary J. Gemme
Case Number: 4:2012cv40066
Filed: May 25, 2012
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered Memorandum and Order granting 86 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 17, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 62 Motion to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Lieutenant John Towns. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 2, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 62 Motion to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Detective Daniel Rosario; granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery( Motions due by 6/6/2014); denying 68 Motion to Re-Open Discovery; denying 68 Motion to Compel Production of Documents; reserving ruling on 62 Motion to Preclude Opinion Testimony of Lieutenant John Towns. Further, the clerk is directed to seal documents 62, 64 & 70 and their corresponding exhibits. (Belpedio, Lisa)
October 26, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court District Judge Timothy S Hillman: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered denying 4 Motion to Dismiss (Castles, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Worcester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paublo Rivera
Represented By: Harold I. Resnic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Worcester
Represented By: Kevin M. Gould
Represented By: Wendy L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Burgos
Represented By: Wendy L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O'Rourke
Represented By: Wendy L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Bartley
Represented By: Wendy L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary J. Gemme
Represented By: Kevin M. Gould
Represented By: Wendy L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?