Voice Domain Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Voice Domain Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 4:2013cv40138
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: David H. Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Filing 93 REPORT ON THE TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 23, 2015 Filing 92 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Apple Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 4, 2015 Filing 91 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM OF DECISION ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. (Jones, Sherry)
June 22, 2015 Filing 90 Response by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC to 89 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PTO 883 file history, 4-3-1995 Office Action, # 2 Exhibit 2 - PTO 883 file history, Examiners 1-21-1997 Reply, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 1-13-2015 Markman Hrg Tr.)(Battaglia, John)
June 17, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re 75 Brief, 68 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs,, of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Williamson v. Citrix)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
May 12, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John T. Battaglia (Battaglia, John)
February 27, 2015 Filing 87 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 27, 2015 Filing 86 Transcript of Markman Hearing held on January 13, 2015, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 3/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
February 10, 2015 Filing 85 Response by Apple Inc. to 84 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
February 6, 2015 Filing 84 NOTICE by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC re 69 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs - Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Papst Licensing GmbH & Co. KG)(Battaglia, John)
January 13, 2015 Filing 83 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Markman Hearing held on 1/13/2015, Case called, Counsel appear for Markman hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Matter taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Battaglia,Scoolidge,Barker/Papastavros,Fowler,Miller,Choksi) (Castles, Martin)
December 29, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 29, 2014 Filing 81 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on December 18, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 1/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
December 18, 2014 Filing 80 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 12/18/2014, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Court and counsel discuss Markman hearing, Court continues Markman hearing date, ( Markman Hearing reset for 1/13/2015 at 1:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Battaglia,Scoolidge/Papastavros,Choksi) (Castles, Martin)
December 8, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of First Supplemental Invalidity Contentions and Second Supplemental Non-Infringement Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit A, # 11 Exhibit B, # 12 Exhibit C)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
December 1, 2014 Filing 78 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Attachment to Joint Claim Construction Statement)(Battaglia, John)
November 26, 2014 Filing 77 EXHIBIT re 76 Brief Responsive Claim Construction - Exhibit to Footnote 37 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Battaglia, John)
November 24, 2014 Filing 76 BRIEF by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC Responsive Claim Construction Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - Claim Construction Evidence Diagram, # 2 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent Application No. 2012/0218396)(Battaglia, John)
November 24, 2014 Filing 75 BRIEF by Apple Inc. Responsive Claim Construction Brief. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
November 12, 2014 Filing 74 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Status Conference reset for 12/18/2014 at 10:15AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
October 24, 2014 Filing 73 Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa)
October 24, 2014 Filing 72 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: PROTECTIVE ORDER entered.(Belpedio, Lisa)
October 22, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Agreed Protective Order (Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 20, 2014 Filing 70 DECLARATION re 69 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,281,883, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated Jan. 1, 2013 from B. Barker, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter dated March 12, 2013 from R. Chang, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter dated March 20, 2013 from B. Barker, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter dated May 1, 2013 from R. Chang, # 6 Exhibit 6 - U.S. Patent No. 5,036,539, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Remarks Accompanying the Preliminary Amendment dated Sept. 8, 1994)(Battaglia, John)
October 20, 2014 Filing 69 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Battaglia, John)
October 20, 2014 Filing 68 Preliminary Claim Construction Briefs by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Summer Krause, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Declaration of Richard Stern, # 22 Exhibit A to Stern Declaration)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
October 8, 2014 Filing 67 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 44 Motion for Protective Order; denying 45 Motion for Protective Order. "The Parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a Proposed Protective Order consistent with the reasoning and dictates of this Order by October 22, 2014." (Belpedio, Lisa)
September 29, 2014 Filing 66 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 65 Motion to Withdraw 64 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Belpedio, Lisa)
September 25, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION to Withdraw 64 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC.(Battaglia, John)
September 23, 2014 Filing 64 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Draft Provision)(Battaglia, John) WITHDRAWN after Motion filed and Granted. (See document # 66)
September 22, 2014 Filing 63 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 9/22/2014, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Parties inform the Court of the status of the case, Plaintiff requests that an additional 7 days be added to all the claim construction deadlines, Court grants request, Court sets Markman hearing date, ( Markman Hearing set for 1/7/2015 at 9:15AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman, Court sets a further interim status conference, Status Conference set for 11/20/2014 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Battaglia,Scoolidge/Papastavros,Choksi) (Castles, Martin)
September 21, 2014 Filing 62 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of First Supplemental Non-infringement Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
September 19, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re Supplemental Submission Addressing Issues Raised at the Protective Order Hearing (Papastavros, Nicholas)
September 15, 2014 Filing 60 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING TIME OF STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference time reset for 9/22/2014 at 2:15PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 12, 2014 Filing 59 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 12, 2014 Filing 58 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 5, 2014, before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 10/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
September 5, 2014 Filing 57 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2014 re 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC, 45 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Apple Inc. Case called, Counsel appear, Counsel argue motions, Matters taken under advisement, Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - 2:15 For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Battaglia, Barker, Papastavros) (Belpedio, Lisa)
August 14, 2014 Filing 56 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 44 MOTION for Protective Order , 45 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Belpedio, Lisa)
August 11, 2014 Filing 55 Preliminary Invalidity and Non-Infringement Contentions by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 8, 2014 Filing 54 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 51 Motion for Leave to File Surreply by Apple Inc. "No further filings with respect to this motion shall be filed by the parties." (Belpedio, Lisa)
August 8, 2014 Filing 53 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING MOTION 51 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Apple Inc. to Judge Hennessy(Castles, Martin) Motions referred to David H. Hennessy.
August 5, 2014 Filing 52 Opposition re 51 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of P. Scoolidge, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 2014-07-30 Email from P. Scoolidge, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 2014-07-30 Email from S. Krause, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 2014-07-31 Email from P. Scoolidge, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 2014-07-31 Email from S. Krause, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Battaglia, John)
August 4, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Surreply Brief)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
August 4, 2014 Filing 50 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. "In so far as Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order (Docket #44) includes a motion for an interim protective order, that motion is denied. The Court will take the rest of the motion under advisement and will notify the parties as to a hearing date." (Belpedio, Lisa)
August 3, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
August 3, 2014 Filing 48 Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on June 26, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 8/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
July 29, 2014 Filing 47 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: 44 MOTION for Protective Order , 45 MOTION for Protective Order. Further information: Rulings.(Castles, Martin) Motions referred to David H. Hennessy.
July 24, 2014 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to 44 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - P. Scoolidge Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 2014-06-24 Email from P. Scoolidge to M. Choksi, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Revised Draft Interim Protective Order, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Revised Final Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 2011-08-12 EveryScape Minute Entry, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 2014-06-20 "A Definition for IPR 'Real Party-In-Interest'", # 7 Exhibit 6 - 2014-07-03 "Apple, Samsung Top Filers of AIA Review Petitions", # 8 Exhibit B - B. Barker Declaration)(Battaglia, John)
July 17, 2014 Filing 45 Opposition re 44 MOTION for Protective Order and Entry of Interim Protective Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maya Prakash Choksi, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Apple Proposed Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Papastavros, Nicholas) Modified on 7/18/2014 (Burgos, Sandra).
July 3, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Protective Order by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Final Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Interim Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 2014-05-13 Excerpted Status Conference Tr., # 4 Exhibit 4 - VDT v. Philips - Protective Order, # 5 Exhibit 5 - DRAFT Protective Order, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Apple v. Samsung - Protective Order, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Decl. of P. Scoolidge, # 8 Exhibit A to Decl. - 2014-06-10 Email from Apple to VDT, # 9 Exhibit B to Decl. - 2014-06-13 Email from VDT to Apple, # 10 Exhibit C to Decl. - 2014-06-25 Email from VDT to Apple, # 11 Exhibit D to Decl. - 2014-06-25 Email from Apple to VDT, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Battaglia, John)
June 30, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 30, 2014 Filing 42 Transcript of Status Conference held on May 13, 2014, before Judge Timothy S. Hillman. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com Redaction Request due 7/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah)
June 26, 2014 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Status Conference held on 6/26/2014, Case called, Counsel appear by telephone for status conference, Parties inform the Court that they have not reached an agreement on the language in the protective order, Plaintiff will file a motion for a protective order within the week, Dft will file an opposition within 14 days, Parties further inform the Court that they are on-track with complying with the scheduling order, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 9/22/2014 at 3:30PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Battaglia,Scoolidge/Papastavros,Choksi,Krause) (Castles, Martin)
June 6, 2014 Filing 40 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas C. Chen terminated. (Castles, Martin)
June 5, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Thomas C. Chen (Unopposed) by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Battaglia, John)
June 3, 2014 Filing 38 Preliminary Disclosure of the Claims Infringed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A - iOS 5 Claim Chart, # 2 Appendix B - iOS 6 Claim Chart, # 3 Appendix C - iOS 7 Claim Chart)(Battaglia, John)
May 14, 2014 Filing 37 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason F. Hoffman terminated. (Castles, Martin)
May 13, 2014 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S Hillman: Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2014, Case called, Counsel appear for scheduling conference, Court adopts the parties joint statement as the scheduling order, Court sets a further status conference, ( Status Conference set for 6/26/2014 at 3:00PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman.). (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Battaglia,Barker/Papastavros,Choksi) (Castles, Martin)
May 12, 2014 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason F. Hoffman (Unopposed) by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Battaglia, John)
May 12, 2014 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by John T. Battaglia (Battaglia, John)
May 6, 2014 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC.(Battaglia, John)
May 6, 2014 Filing 32 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of Apple Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
May 5, 2014 Filing 31 JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC.(Battaglia, John)
April 18, 2014 Filing 30 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2014 at 10:15AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
April 16, 2014 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. Apple Inc. served on 1/15/2014, answer due 3/7/2014. Acknowledgement filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Fisch, Alan)
March 31, 2014 Filing 28 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC.(Battaglia, John)
March 12, 2014 Filing 27 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark D. Fowler, Tiffany C. Miller, Summer Krause and Robert C. Williams. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 11, 2014 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark D. Fowler, Tiffany C. Miller, Summer Krause, and Robert C. Williams Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4901531 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nicholas G. Papastavros, # 2 Affidavit of Mark D. Fowler, # 3 Affidavit of Tiffany C. Miller, # 4 Affidavit of Summer Krause, # 5 Affidavit of Robert C. Williams)(Papastavros, Nicholas)
March 11, 2014 Filing 25 District Judge Timothy S Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added John T. Battaglia and Peter J. Scoolidge. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 10, 2014 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John T. Battaglia and Peter J. Scoolidge Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-4899823 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Mr. Battaglia, # 2 Certificate of Mr. Scoolidge)(Barker, Bruce)
March 7, 2014 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc.. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
March 7, 2014 Filing 22 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Voice Domain Technologies, LLC by Apple Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
February 6, 2014 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. District Judge Timothy S Hillman added. (Abaid, Kimberly)
February 4, 2014 Filing 20 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Hoffman, Jason)
January 31, 2014 Filing 19 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint, Apple Inc.; answer due 3/7/2014. (Belpedio, Lisa)
January 30, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Maya Prakash Choksi on behalf of Apple Inc. (Choksi, Maya)
January 30, 2014 Filing 17 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/7/2014 to answer or otherwise respond to complaint by Apple Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
January 30, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas G. Papastavros on behalf of Apple Inc. (Papastavros, Nicholas)
November 26, 2013 Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Barker, Bruce) (Main Document 15 replaced on 11/27/2013) (Burgos, Sandra).
November 26, 2013 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Silvia Jordan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 26, 2013 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas C. Chen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 26, 2013 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added R. William Sigler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 26, 2013 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Jason F. Hoffman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 26, 2013 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Alan M. Fisch. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 26, 2013 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 26, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly)
November 25, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Silvia Jordan Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4745999 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Silvia Jordan)(Barker, Bruce)
November 25, 2013 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas C Chen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4745979 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Thomas C. Chen)(Barker, Bruce)
November 25, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William Sigler Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4745948 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of William Sigler)(Barker, Bruce)
November 25, 2013 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jason F. Hoffman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4745909 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Jason Hoffman)(Barker, Bruce)
November 25, 2013 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Alan M. Fisch Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-4745782 by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Alan Fisch)(Barker, Bruce)
November 25, 2013 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Barker, Bruce)
November 25, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Apple Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-4745620 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Voice Domain Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Exhibit A)(Barker, Bruce) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/26/2013) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/26/2013) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voice Domain Technologies, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voice Domain Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Bruce J. Barker
Represented By: Thomas C. Chen
Represented By: Alan M. Fisch
Represented By: Jason F. Hoffman
Represented By: Silvia Jordan
Represented By: R. William Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?