Redmond-Nieves v. Okuma America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Monica Redmond-Nieves
Defendant: Okuma America Corporation and Robert E. Morris Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2016cv12216
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER and MEMORANDUM entered denying 104 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Castles, Martin)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered denying 36 Motion to Compel. "For the foregoing reasons, Redmond-Nieves motion to compel (Docket #36) is DENIED AS MOOT as to Defendant Morris and DENIED as to Defendant Okuma." (Belpedio, Lisa)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered. By 5:00 pm on Friday, July 20, 2018, Plaintiff shall file a copy of the requests for the discovery sought in the pending motion to compel and the responses thereto. Alternatively, if Plaintiff failed to serve such discovery requests, Plaintiff shall file a declaration to that effect. (DHH, law1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond-Nieves v. Okuma America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Redmond-Nieves
Represented By: Richard J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okuma America Corporation
Represented By: Heidi R. Wolmuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Morris Company, LLC
Represented By: Grace V. Bacon Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?