Cioffi v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Kristal Rose Cioffi
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv12247
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Castles, Martin)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. For the reasons stated in the Defendant's supporting memorandum, Plaintiff has failed to state a plausible claim for relief. (Castles, Martin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kristal Rose Cioffi. (Jones, Sherry)
December 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Adams on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Adams, Jeffrey)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Amended MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Chapter 13 Petition, #4 Exhibit D- Order, #5 Exhibit E- Notice of Repeat Filer)(Tracey, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Tracey, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A..(Tracey, Patrick)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT Record. (Tracey, Patrick)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Tracey, Patrick)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 10/29/2018 Case Number 1:18-cv-12247. (Alba, Robert)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Vieira, Leonardo)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Tracey, Patrick)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7384038 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A)(Tracey, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/29/2018) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/29/2018) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cioffi v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristal Rose Cioffi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Patrick S. Tracey
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?