Foss v. Spencer Brewery et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Foss
Defendant: Big Eastern Exposition, St. Joseph's Abbey, Cup of Julie Show, Ruggles Media, Spencer Brewery and Northeastern University
Case Number: 4:2018cv40122
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: Massachusetts District Court
Office: Worcester Office
County: Worcester
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2018 13 Letter/request (non-motion) from Lauren C. Ostberg, Esq. . (Ostberg, Lauren)
August 24, 2018 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief and Opposition to filed by Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show. (Ostberg, Lauren)
August 24, 2018 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (With Prejudice) filed by Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show. (Ostberg, Lauren)
August 24, 2018 10 MOTION to Dismiss (With Prejudice) by Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show.(Ostberg, Lauren)
August 20, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren C. Ostberg on behalf of Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show (Ostberg, Lauren)
August 20, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Duda on behalf of Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show (Duda, James)
August 16, 2018 7 STATE COURT Record Spencer Brewery summons served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018; St. Joseph's Abbey summons served on 7/19/2018, answer due 8/9/2018.. (Lindsay, Maurice)
August 14, 2018 6 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Cynthia Foss.(Burgos, Sandra)
July 19, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Poindexter on behalf of Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show (Poindexter, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2018 4 Featured Case General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 19, 2018 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
July 19, 2018 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris)
July 19, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Big Eastern Exposition, Cup of Julie Show ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7236738 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Zuckerman, Elizabeth) (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/19/2018) (Burgos, Sandra). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/19/2018) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foss v. Spencer Brewery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Eastern Exposition
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Zuckerman
Represented By: Lauren C. Ostberg
Represented By: James C. Duda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph's Abbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cup of Julie Show
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Poindexter
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Zuckerman
Represented By: Lauren C. Ostberg
Represented By: James C. Duda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruggles Media
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Brewery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeastern University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?