K.O. et al v. Sessions, III et al
Plaintiff: C.J., F.C., L.J., E.O., Jr., E.O. and K.O.
Defendant: Alex Azar, John Doe CBP Agents, John Doe ORR Personnel, Ronald D Vitiello, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, John Doe ICE Agents, John F Kelly, Stephen Miller, Thomas Homan, Kirstjen Nielsen and Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Case Number: 4:2018cv40149
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Office: Worcester Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Hearing (Request for an Initial Scheduling Conference) by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J..(Cooper, Howard)
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kirstjen Nielsen served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Cacace, Joseph)
October 15, 2018 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed L. Francis Cissna served on 10/4/2018, answer due 10/25/2018. (Cacace, Joseph)
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion to proceed under pseudonyms; granting #11 Motion to proceed under pseudonyms ; granting #10 Motion for Protective Order; and granting #11 Motion for Protective Order. (Castles, Martin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 28 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: US Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on HHS)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. John F Kelly served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Serv John F Kelly)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. Alex Azar served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Cacace, Joseph) (Main Document 26 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Jones, Sherry). Modified on 10/11/2018 (Jones, Sherry).
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Serv on US DOJ)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions III in his capacity as Attorney General of U.S.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on Sessions as Ag of US)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: U.S. Office of Refugee Resettlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on US Office of Refugee Resettlement)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Service of Process filed by C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J.. Individual(s)/Entities served: Andrew E. Lelling, US Atty for District of Massachusetts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aff of Service on Lelling)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Aff of Service on J B Sessions)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. Stephen Miller served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Acknowledgement filed by E.O., Jr.; K.O.; F.C.; E.O. ; L.J. ; C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Aff of Service on S Miller)(Cacace, Joseph)
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Oren N. Nimni on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Nimni, Oren)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Scott Lloyd served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph)
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin K. McAleenan served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Jones, Sherry).
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ronald D Vitiello served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph)
September 12, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Homan served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/11/2018) (Jones, Sherry).
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed Gene Hamilton served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Cacace, Joseph)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order filed by K.O.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Church, Susan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order filed by E.O., Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Church, Susan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order by E.O., Jr..(Church, Susan). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 9/10/2018 (Jones, Sherry).
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and For Protective Order by K.O..(Church, Susan). Added MOTION for Protective Order on 9/10/2018 (Jones, Sherry).
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Maynard on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Maynard, Lauren)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Warecki on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Warecki, Nathan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, L. Francis Cissna, Gene Hamilton, Thomas Homan, John Doe CBP Agents, John Doe ICE Agents, John Doe ORR Personnel, John F Kelly, Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Stephen Miller, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, Ronald D Vitiello. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan B. Church on behalf of K.O. (Church, Susan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse M. Bless on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Bless, Jesse)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard M. Cooper on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Cooper, Howard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Cacace on behalf of C.J., E.O., E.O., Jr., F.C., K.O., L.J. (Cacace, Joseph)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand (Class Action) against All Plaintiffs Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7305438 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by E.O., Jr., K.O., F.C., E.O., L.J., C.J.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 to Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit Attachment B to Civil Cover Sheet, #11 JS45 Category Sheet)(Cacace, Joseph) (Attachment 11 replaced on 9/6/2018) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.O. et al v. Sessions, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe CBP Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ORR Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe ICE Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.J.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Lauren Maynard
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.C.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Lauren Maynard
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.J.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Lauren Maynard
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O., Jr.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Lauren Maynard
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Lauren Maynard
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.O.
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Jesse M. Bless
Represented By: Susan B. Church
Represented By: Joseph M. Cacace
Represented By: Oren N. Nimni
Represented By: Lauren Maynard
Represented By: Nathan P. Warecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?