UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Gerard
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: John M Gerard
Case Number: 4:2018cv40153
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #6 Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Konig, Jordan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff. (Castles, Martin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION and Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Konig, Jordan)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John M Gerard. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John M Gerard (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Konig, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Gerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Gerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jordan A. Konig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?