Bleau v. Iyer et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Bleau
Defendant: I Health and Life Insurance Services and Krishen Iyer
Case Number: 4:2019cv11513
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Matthew Bleau (Paronich, Anthony)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy A. Cohen on behalf of Matthew Bleau (Cohen, Jeremy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to I Health and Life Insurance Services, Krishen Iyer. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Alba, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 7/11/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-11513. (Alba, Robert)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew Bleau. I Health and Life Insurance Services waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (McDonagh, Christina)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against I Health and Life Insurance Services, Krishen Iyer Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7774302 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Matthew Bleau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Civil Category Form)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleau v. Iyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bleau
Represented By: Anthony I. Paronich
Represented By: Jeremy A. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Health and Life Insurance Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishen Iyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?