Birchler v. Inspire Energy Holdings LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Birchler
Defendant: Inspire Energy Holdings LLC, Albert Gramlick and Premium Advertising, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv11721
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss filed by Timothy Birchler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Lane, Brook)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #16 Opposition to Motion, #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Saunders, Diane)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC. (Saunders, Diane)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss filed by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Saunders, Diane)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss filed by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC. (Saunders, Diane)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC.(Saunders, Diane)
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Timothy Birchler.(Lane, Brook)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC.(Saunders, Diane)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Inspire Energy Holdings LLC answer due 9/12/2019. (Castles, Martin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to September 12, 2019 to File Answer by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC.(Saunders, Diane)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT Record. (Saunders, Diane)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 8/9/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-11721. (Alba, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (McDonagh, Christina)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Inspire Energy Holdings LLC for Inspire Energy Holdings LLC.. (Saunders, Diane)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane M. Saunders on behalf of Inspire Energy Holdings LLC (Saunders, Diane)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Inspire Energy Holdings LLC ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7823809 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Form)(Saunders, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birchler v. Inspire Energy Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspire Energy Holdings LLC
Represented By: Diane M. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Gramlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Advertising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Birchler
Represented By: Brook S. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?