In Re. Jelen et al
In Re: Sean Jelen
Trustee: Richard King and Anne J. White
Not Yet Classified: United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Massachusetts and The First National Bank of Long Island
Appellant: Sean E. Jelen
Case Number: 4:2019cv12008
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Elizabeth D. Katz: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE for Debtor's Failure to Pay the Filing Fee Regarding the Debtor's September 23, 2019 Notice of Appeal Following the Court's Denial of the Request to Waive the Filing Fee, and in Accordance with Massachusetts District Court Local Rule 203.8003, the September 23, 2019 Appeal of this Court's September 16, 2019 Order is DISMISSED. (Attachments: #1 USDC Bankruptcy Docket, #2 USDC Transmittal Cover Sheet)(Paine, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 11/12/2019. Appellee Brief due by 11/25/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/9/2019. (Paine, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Record Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 USBC (Worcester) Record)(Paine, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. (Alba, Robert)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Case is to be returned to the Clerk's Office to be randomly drawn to a District Judge in accordance with Local Rule 40.1. (Castles, Martin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 9/24/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-12008. (Alba, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Copy of Bankruptcy Docket Received: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Coppola, Katelyn)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-41137. File received (Attachments: #1 Initial Transmittal)(Coppola, Katelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re. Jelen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Sean Jelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Richard King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Anne J. White
Represented By: Anne J. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: The First National Bank of Long Island
Represented By: Matthew L. Schwartz
Represented By: Michael H. Theodore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sean E. Jelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?