Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium v. Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Case Number: 4:2019cv40021
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae).(Power, Alexandra)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium. Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mailing, #2 Exhibit Return)(Landers, George)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R. Power on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) (Power, Alexandra)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) answer due 3/20/2019. (Castles, Martin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 20, 2019 to File Answer by Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae).(Paine, Ryan)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae). Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7509902 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Landers, George) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/28/2019) (Jones, Sherry). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/28/2019) (Jones, Sherry).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium v. Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company a/s/o Quabbin Estates Condominium
Represented By: George Quinn Landers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Represented By: Ryan H. Paine
Represented By: Alexandra R. Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?