Danforth v. BELFOR USA Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Danforth
Defendant: BELFOR USA Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv40028
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BELFOR USA Group, Inc.. (Joseph, Jessica)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BELFOR USA Group, Inc..(Joseph, Jessica)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BELFOR USA Group, Inc. answer due 3/26/2019. (Castles, Martin)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 26, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by BELFOR USA Group, Inc..(Joseph, Jessica) Modified on 3/12/2019 (Burgos, Sandra).
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. Joseph on behalf of BELFOR USA Group, Inc. (Joseph, Jessica)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Schroeder on behalf of BELFOR USA Group, Inc. (Schroeder, Donald)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed BELFOR USA Group, Inc. served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Bace, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BELFOR USA Group, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against BELFOR USA Group, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7528710 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Joseph Danforth. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danforth v. BELFOR USA Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELFOR USA Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica E. Joseph
Represented By: Donald W. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Danforth
Represented By: Michael J. Bace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?