Burnham v. Agency, the United States District Court of Eastern & Central District of Massachusetts
Plaintiff: Arthur A Burnham
Defendant: Agency, the United States District Court of Eastern & Central District of Massachusetts
Case Number: 4:2019cv40096
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Referring Judge: Mark G Mastroianni
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Arthur A Burnham (Jones, Sherry)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Copy re 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #10 Order Dismissing Case, #8 Order, mailed to Arthur A. Burnham on 7/30/2019. (Rivera, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER ISSUED. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. It is so Ordered. (Rivera, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No Filing fee is due. (Rivera, Christina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered in regards to #1 Complaint, filed by Arthur A Burnham. For the foregoing reasons, the court ORDERS that this action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis shall be terminated as moot and no filing fee is due. It is So Ordered. (Rivera, Christina)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment of the Magistrate Judge. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni added. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Castles, Martin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Arthur A Burnham. (Burgos, Sandra)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur A Burnham.(Burgos, Sandra)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 Request for Review under the Administrative Procedures Act against Agency, the United States District Court of Eastern & Central District of Massachusetts, filed by Arthur A Burnham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet, #2 cover letter)(Burgos, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnham v. Agency, the United States District Court of Eastern & Central District of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agency, the United States District Court of Eastern & Central District of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur A Burnham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?