Foley v. City of Worcester School Department
Plaintiff: Jennifer Foley
Defendant: City of Worcester School Department
Case Number: 4:2019cv40109
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Castles, Martin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 Motion to Cancel Preliminary Injunction Hearing & Issue a 30-day Nisi Order. (Castles, Martin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION Cancel Preliminary Injunction Hearing & Issue a 30-day Nisi Order by Jennifer Foley.(Welsh, John)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing reset for 9/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion to Continue motion hearing. (Castles, Martin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing to September 18, 2019 by Jennifer Foley.(Welsh, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. Counsel is ordered to serve this notice of hearing on the defendant forthwith.(Castles, Martin)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #8 Motion for short Order notice. (Castles, Martin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Jennifer Foley. City of Worcester School Department served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Acknowledgement filed by Jennifer Foley. (Welsh, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to of Short Notice Scheduling Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jennifer Foley.(Welsh, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Welsh, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jennifer Foley. (Welsh, John)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jennifer Foley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welsh, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Worcester School Department. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Welsh, III on behalf of Jennifer Foley (Welsh, John)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against City of Worcester School Department Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7833514 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jennifer Foley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Case Category Sheet)(Welsh, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foley v. City of Worcester School Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Foley
Represented By: John F. Welsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Worcester School Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?