UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Prashad et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Savton, LLC, Mohan Prashad, Lanaton, LLC and David Besaw
Case Number: 4:2019cv40114
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 First MOTION to Dismiss w/Cert. of Service filed by United States of America. (Leung, Michelle)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 11/4/2019. (Castles, Martin)
October 22, 2019 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/4/2019 to File Response/Reply to Prashad Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by United States of America.(Leung, Michelle)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss w/Cert. of Service by David Besaw.(O'Brien, Edward)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. David Besaw answer due 10/21/2019. (Castles, Martin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Continue Responsive Pleading Date to 10/21/2019 w/ Certificate of Service by David Besaw.(O'Brien, Edward) Modified on 10/16/2019 (Castles, Martin).
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lanaton, LLC, Mohan Prashad, Savton, LLC. (Angelini, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Lanaton, LLC, Mohan Prashad, Savton, LLC.(Angelini, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Angelini on behalf of Lanaton, LLC, Mohan Prashad, Savton, LLC (Angelini, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared A. Fiore on behalf of Lanaton, LLC, Mohan Prashad, Savton, LLC (Fiore, Jared)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Executed Mohan Prashad served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Executed Lanaton, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Executed Savton, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Executed for David Besaw served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle L. Leung on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Leung, Michelle)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status: US Government), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Cummings, Torey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Prashad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savton, LLC
Represented By: Jared A. Fiore
Represented By: Michael P. Angelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohan Prashad
Represented By: Jared A. Fiore
Represented By: Michael P. Angelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanaton, LLC
Represented By: Jared A. Fiore
Represented By: Michael P. Angelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Besaw
Represented By: Edward A. O'Brien, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Torey B. Cummings
Represented By: Michelle L. Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?