Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Stavas Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Suffer In Silence Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Cyanide Publishing, Sams Jammin Songs, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Counting Crows, LLC d/b/a Jones Falls Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC and Rondor Music International, Inc.
Defendant: Constantino Zahariadis, Anastasios Zahariadis, Stavas Inc. d/b/a Black Sheep Tavern a/k/a The Blacksheep Tavern, Stavas Inc. and The Blacksheep Tavern
Case Number: 4:2019cv40116
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (King, Dawn)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Stavas Inc., Anastasios Zahariadis, Constantino Zahariadis.(Dombrowski, John)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Dombrowski on behalf of Stavas Inc., Anastasios Zahariadis, Constantino Zahariadis (Dombrowski, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Constantino Zahariadis served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Strong, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Anastasios Zahariadis served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Strong, William)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Stavas Inc. served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (Strong, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Strong, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC d/b/a Jones Falls Music, Cyanide Publishing, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Suffer In Silence Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Strong, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anastasios Zahariadis, Constantino Zahariadis, Stavas Inc. d/b/a Black Sheep Tavern a/k/a The Blacksheep Tavern Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7881363 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Counting Crows, LLC d/b/a Jones Falls Music, Cyanide Publishing, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Sams Jammin Songs, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Suffer In Silence Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Action Cover Sheet and Local Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Strong, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Stavas Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suffer In Silence Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyanide Publishing
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sams Jammin Songs
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Counting Crows, LLC d/b/a Jones Falls Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Counting Crows, LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constantino Zahariadis
Represented By: John M. Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastasios Zahariadis
Represented By: John M. Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stavas Inc. d/b/a Black Sheep Tavern a/k/a The Blacksheep Tavern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stavas Inc.
Represented By: John M. Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blacksheep Tavern
Represented By: John M. Dombrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?