Boisvert v. Healy et al
Plaintiff: Sean Patrick Boisvert
Defendant: Amy D., Andrew Abdella, Maura Healy, Emily C, Brooks, Dr. David Andrews, Richard Vincuilla, David H Tuttle, Lewis Evangelidis, Michelle, James Trainor, Lynne Gillis, Attorney General William Barr, Mike Brennon, Donald Siergie, John Foley, Seamus O'Day, Attorney Edward Gauthier, Truman Head, Daniel Mara and Alexis
Case Number: 4:2019cv40132
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION for Order to stop the retaliation by Sean Patrick Boisvert.(Burgos, Sandra)
December 9, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) re #18 MOTION to Correct the Docket or, in the Alternative, Motion for Plaintiff to Provide a More Definite Statement, #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Correct the Docket or, in the Alternative, Motion for Plaintiff to Provide a More Definite Statement by David Andrews, Brooks, Emily C, Lynne Gillis, Michelle.(Welch, Amy) Modified on 12/10/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 DOCUMENT REMOVED, COUNSEL ATTACHED THE WRONG DOCUMENT, COUNSEL TO REFILE. MOTION Motion to Waive Local Rule 7.1(a)(2) re #18 MOTION to Correct the Docket or, in the Alternative, Motion for Plaintiff to Provide a More Definite Statement, #19 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Correct the Docket or, in the Alternative, Motion for Plaintiff to Provide a More Definite Statement by David Andrews, Brooks, Emily C, Lynne Gillis, Michelle.(Welch, Amy) Modified on 12/9/2019 (Jones, Sherry).
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Correct the Docket or, in the Alternative, Motion for Plaintiff to Provide a More Definite Statement filed by David Andrews, Brooks, Emily C, Lynne Gillis, Michelle. (Welch, Amy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Correct the Docket or, in the Alternative, Motion for Plaintiff to Provide a More Definite Statement by David Andrews, Brooks, Emily C, Lynne Gillis, Michelle.(Welch, Amy)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy B. Welch on behalf of David Andrews, Brooks, Emily C, Lynne Gillis, Michelle (Welch, Amy)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Sean Patrick Boisvert re #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/26/19 to Amend #1 Complaint, #14 Amended Complaint,. (Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sean Patrick Boisvert.(Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michelle, Brooks, Lynne Gillis, James Trainor, Richard Vincuilla, Emily C, David Andrews, Amy D., Donald Siergie, Daniel Mara, John Foley, Seamus O'Day, Edward Gauthier, Mike Brennon, William Barr, Alexis, Truman Head, filed by Sean Patrick Boisvert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. (Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/26/19 to Amend #1 Complaint by Sean Patrick Boisvert.(Jones, Sherry)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return for David Andrews served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Brooks served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Emily C served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Lynne Gillis served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Michelle served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; James Trainor served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019; Richard Vincuilla served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 US Marshal Process Receipt and Return Unexecuted for as to Nurse Amy D. (Burgos, Sandra)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction for failure to meet burden. (Castles, Martin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Abdella, Amy D., David Andrews, Brooks, Emily C, Lynne Gillis, Michelle, James Trainor, Richard Vincuilla. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) Modified on 11/1/2019 (Jones, Sherry). (Summons, Order, Marshal Form, Complaint and Motion for TRO mailed to Mr. Boisvert)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE: re payment of fee (prisoner filer) issued to the Treasurer at Worcester County Jail (Castles, Martin)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Castles, Martin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 11/1/2019) by Sean Patrick Boisvert.(Burgos, Sandra)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sean Patrick Boisvert. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean Patrick Boisvert.(Burgos, Sandra)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sean Patrick Boisvert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons, #4 cover letter)(Burgos, Sandra) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/21/2019) (Burgos, Sandra).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boisvert v. Healy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Abdella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maura Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily C
Represented By: Amy B. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Represented By: Amy B. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. David Andrews
Represented By: Amy B. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Vincuilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Evangelidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle
Represented By: Amy B. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Trainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne Gillis
Represented By: Amy B. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Brennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Siergie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seamus O'Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Edward Gauthier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truman Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Patrick Boisvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?