Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 11 Exchange Street LLC d/b/a The Steel Pub et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Beanly, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Contessa Publishing LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc. and EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Defendant: 11 Exchange Street LLC and Irvin J. Hartin, Sr.
Case Number: 4:2019cv40136
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: David H Hennessy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Request for notice of default by Beanly, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Contessa Publishing LLC, Coral Reefer Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC . (Strong, William)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Irvin J. Hartin, Sr. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Strong, William)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed 11 Exchange Street LLC served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Strong, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Burgos, Sandra)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Strong, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beanly, Inc. d/b/a Beanly Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., Contessa Publishing LLC d/b/a Rosasharn Music, Coral Reefer Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Strong, William)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Irvin J. Hartin, Sr., 11 Exchange Street LLC d/b/a The Steel Pub Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7937537 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Beanly, Inc. d/b/a Beanly Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., Contessa Publishing LLC d/b/a Rosasharn Music, Coral Reefer Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Schedule A)(Strong, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. 11 Exchange Street LLC d/b/a The Steel Pub et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beanly, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contessa Publishing LLC
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: William S. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11 Exchange Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin J. Hartin, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?