Himmelreich v. Spaulding
Petitioner: Walter Himmelreich
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Case Number: 4:2019cv40152
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Richard G Stearns
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying #8 Motion to Amend by Walter Himmelreich NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 2/10/2020. (Burgos, Sandra)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 Copy re [Dkt # 9] Order on Motion for Reconsideration mailed to Walter Himmelreich on 1/7/2020. (Pacho, Arnold)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying #8 Motion to Amend. (mkz)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Alter or Amend #6 Order Dismissing Case by Walter Himmelreich.(Jones, Sherry)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Copy re #5 Memorandum and Order, #6 Order Dismissing Case, mailed to Walter Himmelreich on 12/2/2019. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (Pacho, Arnold)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Richard G. Stearns: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying the petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241.(PSSA, 4)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Walter Himmelreich. (Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Himmelreich.(Jones, Sherry)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Walter Himmelreich.(Jones, Sherry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Himmelreich v. Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Spaulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter Himmelreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?