Thomas v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mireille Thomas
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. and Nissan North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv10378
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Gutbezahl, Adam)
March 20, 2020 Filing 16 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. answer due 4/6/2020. (Castles, Martin)
March 16, 2020 Filing 15 STATE COURT Record Nissan North America, Inc. summons served on 1/28/2020, answer due 3/23/2020.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attested State Court Records)(Gutbezahl, Adam)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd..(Gutbezahl, Adam) Modified on 3/20/2020 (Castles, Martin).
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G. Gutbezahl on behalf of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (Gutbezahl, Adam)
March 16, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Polglase, Holly)
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. (Polglase, Holly)
February 28, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 3/23/2020. (Castles, Martin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 23, 2020 to To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nissan North America, Inc..(Gutbezahl, Adam) Modified on 2/28/2020 (Castles, Martin).
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail.(Burgos, Sandra)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 2/25/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-10378. (Alba, Robert)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Coppola, Katelyn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam G. Gutbezahl on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Gutbezahl, Adam)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly M. Polglase on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Polglase, Holly)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Polglase, Holly)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan Motor Co., Ltd., Nissan North America, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8123356 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint etc., #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Polglase, Holly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mireille Thomas
Represented By: Demetrios G. Kafkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Adam G. Gutbezahl
Represented By: Holly M. Polglase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?