GENERALI U.S. BRANCH v. The Commerce Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Generali U.S. Branch
Defendant: The Commerce Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv10692
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Generali U.S. Branch. The Commerce Insurance Company waiver sent on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Gregory, Laura)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Howard Wollitz. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Howard Wollitz Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8188936 by Generali U.S. Branch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gregory, Laura)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Generali U.S. Branch. (Gregory, Laura)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Generali U.S. Branch. (Gregory, Laura)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The Commerce Insurance Company. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. (Burgos, Sandra)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 4/8/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-10692. (Alba, Robert)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester). (Jones, Sherry)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Commerce Insurance Company Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8188290 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by GENERALI U.S. BRANCH dba THE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF TRIESTE & VENICE U.S. BRANCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gregory, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERALI U.S. BRANCH v. The Commerce Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commerce Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generali U.S. Branch
Represented By: Laura M. Gregory
Represented By: Howard Wollitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?