Roy et al v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roy, Richard Roy and Jeffrey Lavelle
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc, Lowe's Companies, Inc. and Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv40029
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Lipshutz, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kevin J. Stoops. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Jones, Sherry)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Roy, Jeffrey Lavelle. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Steffans, Benjamin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Roy, Jeffrey Lavelle. Lowe's Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 3/20/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Steffans, Benjamin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kevin J. Stoops Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8170639 by Jeffrey Lavelle, Richard Roy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Steffans, Benjamin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8154353 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Jeffrey Lavelle, Richard Roy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 JS45)(Steffans, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy et al v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Roy
Represented By: Benjamin K. Steffans
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lavelle
Represented By: Benjamin K. Steffans
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?