Berkshire Bank v. Chosen Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Berkshire Bank
Defendant: Chosen Consulting, LLC, Moshe Orlinsky and Jay Orlinsky
Case Number: 4:2020cv40105
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Berkshire Bank. Jay Orlinsky served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Berkshire Bank. (Gibbons, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Berkshire Bank. Moshe Orlinsky served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. Acknowledgement filed by Berkshire Bank. (Gibbons, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Chosen Consulting, LLC, Jay Orlinsky, Moshe Orlinsky. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Jones, Sherry)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Berkshire Bank. (Gibbons, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Berkshire Bank.(Gibbons, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8380571 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Berkshire Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Gibbons, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkshire Bank v. Chosen Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkshire Bank
Represented By: Robert B. Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chosen Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moshe Orlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Orlinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?