Novia v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Richard Novia
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc and Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive
Case Number: 4:2020cv40107
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Referring Judge: F Dennis Saylor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 43 Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER (Wave 5). See Order for Full Text.(Bono, Christine)
October 20, 2020 Filing 42 Recommendations for Scheduling Order -Joint Motion to Adopt the Deadlines in the "Wave 5" Scheduling Order-. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE re: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV.This hearing shall take place remotely, by telephone only.Please use the following dial-in information:DIAL IN: (888) 675-2535ACCESS CODE: 7629998REMINDER: Counsel and participants who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on speaker or hold.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-13111-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
October 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re Withdrawal of Appearances for Melissa Dorman Matthews and Jordan E. Jarreau of Hartline Barger LLP (Brown, Matthew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 39 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 10/1/2020. Case called; hearing is conducted by telephone. Parties update court as to progress of cases, matters that are near or have reached settlement, and recently transferred matters. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Various) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-13111-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 29, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE re: Telephone Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 2:10 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (This notice is a reminder, and identical to Docket Entry. No. 58, posted for the benefit of the newly added related matters.)This hearing shall take place remotely, by telephone only. Please use the following dial-in information: DIAL IN: (888) 675-2535 ACCESS CODE: 7629998 REMINDER: Counsel and participants who are not addressing the Court, please mute your telephones, so that you may hear the proceeding but other participants will not hear background noise or interference. Please do not put your telephone on hold.Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-13111-FDS et al.(Bono, Christine)
September 29, 2020 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Reassignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris)
September 28, 2020 Filing 36 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to L.R. 40.1 the Clerk shall reassign this case to Chief Judge Saylor. (Castles, Martin)
September 24, 2020 Filing 35 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #34 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are continued for 90 days from the date of this Order. (Castles, Martin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Brown, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims Against McKesson Corporation Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Brown, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Gail Roma on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Roma, Jennifer)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Brown, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02461.
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grants #23 Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Michelle Guptil's case be severed and transferred to the Minneapolis Division of the District of Minnesota (Civil case 3:20-cv-2458 opened); b. Plaintiff Allen Harrison's case be severed and transferred to the Pittsburgh Division of the Western District of Pennsylvania (Civil case 3:20-cv-2459 opened); c. Plaintiff Larry Napier's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2460 opened); d. Plaintiff Richard Novia's case be severed and transferred to the Worcester Division of the District of Massachusetts (Civil case 3:20-cv-2461 opened); e. Plaintiff Sharon Sutherland's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2462 opened); f. Plaintiff Craig Thompson's case be severed and transferred to the Milwaukee Division of the Eastern District of Wisconsin (Civil case 3:20-cv-2463 opened); g. Plaintiff John Vail's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2464 opened). Plaintiff Frank Aguilera is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/20/2020) (jmg)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, see ECF Nos. #23 , #25 , the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Melissa Reyes's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (ndt)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order: Pursuant to the parties' agreement, see ECF Nos. #23 , #25 , the Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff Jerry Derrick's claims against Defendants. The parties shall bear their own costs. All relief not expressly granted is DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/19/2020) (ndt)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #23 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re #23 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Frank Aguilera, Jerry Derrick, Michelle Guptil, Allen Harrison, Larry Napier, Richard Novia, Melissa Reyes, Sharon Sutherland, Craig Thompson, John Vail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1512-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/11/2020) (ctf)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Becton, Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan) Modified corporate parent on 6/12/2020 (mla).
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Jarreau, Jordan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10904036) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson page, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D Index of State Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - 2020-04-03 Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - 2020-04-03 Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - 2020-04-03 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - 2020-04-06 Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - 2020-04-06 Citation issued To Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - 2020-04-17 Status Conference Order, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - 2020-05-06 Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - 2020-05-22 Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - 2020-05-29 Status Conference Order, #18 Exhibit(s) D-12 - 2020-06-04 Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Jarreau, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novia v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E Jarreau
Represented By: Jennifer Gail Roma
Represented By: Matthew E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Novia
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?