McNamee v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2
Plaintiff: William T. McNamee
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2
Case Number: 4:2021cv11729
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2022 11:45 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester (Remote only) before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Pisano, Vanessa)
October 29, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2.(Pisano, Vanessa)
October 29, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2. (Seeley, Donald)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Alba, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 10/22/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-11729. (Alba, Robert)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2 (Seeley, Donald)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (Kelly, Danielle)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa V. Pisano on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2 (Pisano, Vanessa)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2 ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9023095 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Category Form)(Pisano, Vanessa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNamee v. Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. McNamee
Represented By: James P. Ehrhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-SL2
Represented By: Vanessa V. Pisano
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?