Nygren v. Boncher
Petitioner: Steven Nygren
Respondent: Amy Boncher
Case Number: 4:2021cv40004
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Excess of Twenty Pages by Amy Boncher.(Sady, Michael)
March 9, 2021 Filing 14 Copy re 13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply mailed to Steven Nygren 12727-036 DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 879 AYER, MA 01432 on 3/9/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). Responses due by 3/15/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 15, 2021 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by Amy Boncher.(Sady, Michael)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 Copy re 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - Mailed to: Steven Nygren 12727-036 DEVENS FEDERAL MEDICAL CENTER Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 879 AYER, MA 01432 on 2/22/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241). Responses due by 3/8/2021. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Amy Boncher.. (Sady, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST083609 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Barbosa, Nilsa)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to March 8, 2021 to File Response/Reply by Amy Boncher.(Sady, Michael)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Amy Boncher (Sady, Michael)
January 11, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. 1.The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus on FMC Devens Warden Amy Boncher and the United States Attorney for the District of Massachusetts. 2.The Respondent shall, within 21 days of the date of this Order, file a response to the petition. 3.Within 21 days of this Order, Petitioner shall either (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee; or (2) file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a certified prison account statement. Failure of Petitioner to comply with this directive may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk shall provide Petitioner with an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.4.The Clerk shall provide the Petitioner, Respondent and the United States Attorneyfor the District of Massachusetts with the form for Consent/Refusal of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction and the instructions for that form. The parties shall indicate their consent or refusal to the final assignment of this case to the magistrate judge by completing and separately filing the form entitled Notice to Parties in Pro Se Prisoner Litigation Cases. The form must be filed in paper form and clearly marked DO NOT SCAN. While consent to the final assignment of the case to the magistrate judge is entirely voluntary, and no adverse substantive consequences of any kind will redound to an attorney or party refusing consent, each party must submit the form indicating their consent or refusal to consent within thirty days of receipt of this order. (Attachments: #1 consent package)(PSSA, 4)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary)
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Steven Nygren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - restricted due to personal identifiers, #2 Cover letter)(Burgos, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygren v. Boncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Nygren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amy Boncher
Represented By: Michael P. Sady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?