Libby v. Divris
Petitioner: Jeremy Libby
Respondent: Matthew Divris
Case Number: 4:2021cv40013
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 30, 2021 to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Matthew Divris.(Blume, Todd)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd M. Blume on behalf of Matthew Divris (Blume, Todd)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2254 Petition. Order entered pursuant to R.4 of the Rules governing Section 2254 cases for service on respondents. Answer/responsive pleading due w/in 21 days of receipt of this order.(Castles, Martin)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 1BST083671 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Barbosa, Nilsa)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254, filed by Jeremy Libby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 cover letter)(Castilla, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Libby v. Divris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Libby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Divris
Represented By: Todd M. Blume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?