Northern Security Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC
Plaintiff: Northern Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-NuTone LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv40027
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Black, Andrew)
April 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 STATE COURT Record. (Duggan, Christopher)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary) Modified on 3/16/2021 to add RE- before the word Assignment (Finn, Mary).
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Duggan, Christopher)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (King, Dawn)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Broan-NuTone LLC.(Duggan, Christopher)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Black on behalf of Broan-NuTone LLC (Black, Andrew)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Jones, Sherry)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broan-NuTone LLC identifying Corporate Parent nortek, inc. for Broan-NuTone LLC.. (Duggan, Christopher)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Broan-NuTone LLC ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8667688 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Category Form, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duggan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Security Insurance Company v. Broan-NuTone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Security Insurance Company
Represented By: William O. Monahan
Represented By: Edward A. Bopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-NuTone LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Duggan
Represented By: Andrew D. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?