Orkin et al v. Albert et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Orkin and Wayne Orkin
Defendant: Lisa Sue Albert and Ian Albert
Intervenor Plaintiff: Boost Web SEO, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Judge David Hennessy
Case Number: 4:2021cv40060
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2021 Filing 40 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Arthur Orkin by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert. (Gee, Garrett)
November 1, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Garrett A.D. Gee on behalf of Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert (Gee, Garrett)
October 29, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of ADR Conference, Order and Telephone Conference. *See attached order*. Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing via video conference set for 12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding: Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. A separate video conference invitation will be emailed to counsel. Pre-Mediation Telephone Conferences set for 12/16/2021 as follows: 9:15 AM for Plaintiff; 9:40 AM for Defendants. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel along with video conference invitation.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the sessions courtroom deputy as soon as possible.(King, Dawn)
October 29, 2021 Filing 37 *NOT RECORDED* Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Telephone Conference held on 10/29/2021. Parties discuss proceeding with a mediation in person or via video conference. Parties to pick a date. (Court Reporter: None.)(Attorneys present: Tauches, Khan, Schwartz, Gee) (King, Dawn)
October 26, 2021 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of pre-ADR Phone Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester (Remote only) before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Please be prepared to discuss the parties' position on participating in a mediation via video conference as well as agreed upon dates to present to the Court in order to schedule the mediation. *Call-in phone number will be emailed to counsel separately.(King, Dawn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 35 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Hennessy for mediation.(Castles, Martin)
October 5, 2021 Filing 34 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2021 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Orkin, Wayne Orkin, Case called, Counsel appear by video-conference for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Parties to inform the Court by 10/8/21 if they agree to a referral to mediation, (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com)(Attorneys present: Tauches/Schwartz,Khan) (Castles, Martin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 33 DECLARATION re #31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Khan, Sara)
October 4, 2021 Filing 32 DECLARATION re #31 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion For Preliminary Injunction by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Khan, Sara)
October 4, 2021 Filing 31 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert. (Khan, Sara)
October 4, 2021 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference time reset for 10/5/2021 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Castles, Martin)
October 4, 2021 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting TIME OF Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing TIME reset for 10/5/2021 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Castles, Martin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wayne Orkin, Arthur Orkin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Tauches, Jason)
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Wayne Orkin, Arthur Orkin.(Tauches, Jason)
September 28, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert, Boost Web SEO, Inc. re #22 Notice of Scheduling Conference . (Khan, Sara)
September 16, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #23 Intervenor Complaint by Wayne Orkin.(Tauches, Jason)
August 31, 2021 Filing 24 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to serve additional discovery subpoena. (Castles, Martin)
August 26, 2021 Filing 23 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Boost Web SEO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Khan, Sara)
August 25, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2021 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. (Castles, Martin)
August 23, 2021 Filing 21 Letter/request (non-motion) from Irwin Schwartz . (Schwartz, Irwin) Modified on 8/24/2021 (Burgos, Sandra). Modified on 8/31/2021 (Castles, Martin).
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Castles, Martin)
August 20, 2021 Filing 19 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ORDER entered denying #7 Motion for TRO; granting in part and denying in part #10 Motion to Intervene; and granting #13 Motion to Expedite Discovery. (Castles, Martin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 18 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2021 re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Arthur Orkin and Wayne Orkin, #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Boost Web SEO, Inc., and #13 Cross MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lisa Sue Albert and Ian Albert, Case called, Counsel appear by video-conference for motion hearing, Court hears arguments of counsel, Court rules taking under advisement #10 Motion to Intervene; taking under advisement #7 Motion for TRO; taking under advisement #13 Motion to Expedite; (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa-Ryll at justicehill@aol.com.)(Attorneys present: Tauches/Schwartz,Khan) (Castles, Martin)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 Opposition re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Wayne Orkin, Arthur Orkin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Tauches, Jason)
August 13, 2021 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motions re #7 Motion for TRO, #10 Motion to Intervene, and #13 Motion for Expedited Discovery for 8/19/2021 04:15 PM before District Judge Timothy S. Hillman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Lovett, Jarrett)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Cross Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion for TRO and Granting Expedited Discovery)(Khan, Sara)
August 11, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ian Albert. (Khan, Sara)
August 11, 2021 Filing 13 Cross MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert.(Khan, Sara)
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Irwin B. Schwartz on behalf of Boost Web SEO, Inc. (Schwartz, Irwin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Boost Web SEO, Inc.. (Khan, Sara)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Boost Web SEO, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Khan, Sara)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara W. Khan on behalf of Boost Web SEO, Inc. (Khan, Sara)
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Injunctive Relief filed by Wayne Orkin, Arthur Orkin. (Tauches, Jason)
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Wayne Orkin, Arthur Orkin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Wayne Orkin, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Tauches, Jason). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 8/11/2021 (Burgos, Sandra).
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ian Albert.(Khan, Sara)
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 STATE COURT Record Ian Albert summons served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021; Lisa Sue Albert summons served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021.. (Schwartz, Irwin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Lisa Sue Albert.(Schwartz, Irwin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email.(Burgos, Sandra)
June 8, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Burgos, Sandra)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ian Albert, Lisa Sue Albert ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8808809 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schwartz, Irwin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orkin et al v. Albert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Sue Albert
Represented By: Irwin B. Schwartz
Represented By: Garrett A.D. Gee
Represented By: Sara W. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Albert
Represented By: Irwin B. Schwartz
Represented By: Sara W. Khan
Represented By: Garrett A.D. Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Orkin
Represented By: Jason Edward Tauches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Orkin
Represented By: Jason Edward Tauches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Boost Web SEO, Inc.
Represented By: Sara W. Khan
Represented By: Irwin B. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Judge David Hennessy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?