Burt et al v Caraustar Industries Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michele Burt, Christopher Cerasuolo, Nancy Donovan and Lauren Ladue
Defendant: Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc., The Newark Group, Inc., Massachusetts Natural Fertilizer Company, Otter Farm Inc., Seaman Paper Company Of Massachusetts, Inc., 3M Company and Joe Doe Companies
Case Number: 4:2022cv11937
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2023 Filing 18 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered re #17 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and {Proposed} Order by 3M Company. (Warnock, Douglas)
January 3, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and {Proposed} Order by 3M Company. (Lantry, Jacob)
December 20, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Dorkin on behalf of Otter Farm Inc., Seaman Paper Company Of Massachusetts, Inc. (Dorkin, Eric)
December 13, 2022 Filing 15 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #14 STIPULATION (Joint) and Proposed Order by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc., The Newark Group, Inc.. (Warnock, Douglas)
December 12, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION (Joint) and Proposed Order by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc., The Newark Group, Inc.. (Gardella, John)
November 30, 2022 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal to Extend Time of Defendant 3M Company to Respond to Plt's Complaint and for Plt's to Oppose any Motion to Dismiss by 3M Company. (Lantry, Jacob)
November 30, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J. Keenan on behalf of 3M Company (Keenan, Trevor)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of 3M Company (Campbell, James)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob J. Lantry on behalf of 3M Company (Lantry, Jacob)
November 16, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryna Rosen Misiura on behalf of The Newark Group, Inc. (Misiura, Bryna)
November 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryna Rosen Misiura on behalf of Greif, Inc. (Misiura, Bryna)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryna Rosen Misiura on behalf of Caraustar Industries, Inc. (Misiura, Bryna)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Barrows, Jennifer)
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 11/15/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-11937. (Alba, Robert)
November 15, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester). (Pacho, Arnold)
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Caraustar Industries, Inc., Greif, Inc., The Newark Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Gardella, John)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Caraustar Industries Inc., The Newark Group, Inc., greif Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9586887 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Gardella, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burt et al v Caraustar Industries Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Burt
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cerasuolo
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Donovan
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ladue
Represented By: Leah M. McMorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caraustar Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Represented By: Bryna Rosen Misiura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greif, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Represented By: Bryna Rosen Misiura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Newark Group, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Represented By: Bryna Rosen Misiura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Natural Fertilizer Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otter Farm Inc.
Represented By: Eric Dorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaman Paper Company Of Massachusetts, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Dorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jacob J. Lantry
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Trevor J. Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Doe Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?