Beccia v. Harding et al
Plaintiff: Willow Beccia
Defendant: Caitlin Harding, Kevin Lyons, Brian Daniels, Matthew Gaffny, Town of Hudson and Defendant Six
Case Number: 4:2022cv12103
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Angel Kelley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Filing 24 Opposition re #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Willow Beccia. (Garabedian, Mitchell)
January 27, 2023 Filing 23 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Oppositions re #20 Motion for Judgment of the Pleadings. GRANTED. Oppositions shall be filed no later than February 7, 2023. (Lara, Miguel)
January 20, 2023 Filing 22 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/07/2023 to File Opposition by Willow Beccia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition)(Garabedian, Mitchell)
January 10, 2023 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Brian Daniels, Matthew Gaffny, Kevin Lyons, Town of Hudson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Amos, Justin)
January 10, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Brian Daniels, Matthew Gaffny, Kevin Lyons, Town of Hudson.(Amos, Justin)
January 6, 2023 Filing 19 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel)
January 6, 2023 Filing 18 District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court ADOPTS the parties' proposed #17 Agreed-Upon Pretrial Schedule and sets the following deadlines:SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES:Initial disclosures to be completed by 2/10/23Amendments to pleadings filed by 5/18/23All fact discovery shall be completed by 4/12/24All expert discovery shall be completed by 8/12/24Dispositive motions due 9/26/24Oppositions to dispositive motions due 10/17/24Reply briefs due 10/31/24NOTICE OF HEARING:The Scheduling Conference previously set for 1/18/23 is CANCELLED. Status Conference set for 4/16/2024 11:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley.Should the parties wish to appear in-person, and all parties assent to such change, they may reach out to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to modify the hearing no later than two business days prior to the scheduled hearing.(Lara, Miguel)
January 5, 2023 Filing 17 JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Garabedian, Mitchell)
January 5, 2023 Filing 16 STATE COURT Record. (Amos, Justin)
December 29, 2022 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Memorandum of Law by Brian Daniels, Matthew Gaffny, Kevin Lyons, Town of Hudson.(Amos, Justin)
December 22, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference:The parties are directed to consult and submit an agreed-upon pretrial schedule, as per the attached sample, no later than 7 days before the Scheduling Conference. If the Court finds parties' proposed deadlines reasonable or requires only minor adjustments, it may enter a scheduling order in lieu of holding the scheduling conference. Otherwise, Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2023 02:30 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley. Should the parties wish to appear in-person, and all parties assent to such change, they may reach out to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to modify the hearing no later than two business days prior to the scheduled hearing.(Lara, Miguel)
December 21, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Caitlin Harding.(Tagliamonte, Glen)
December 21, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen A. Tagliamonte, I on behalf of Caitlin Harding (Tagliamonte, Glen)
December 15, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Town of Hudson.(Amos, Justin)
December 15, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Matthew Gaffny.(Amos, Justin)
December 15, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kevin Lyons.(Amos, Justin)
December 15, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brian Daniels.(Amos, Justin)
December 13, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Simms on behalf of Matthew Gaffny, Brian Daniels, Kevin Lyons, Town of Hudson. (Simms, Adam) Modified on 12/13/2022 to correct docket text as to parties represented by counsel. (Pacho, Arnold).
December 12, 2022 Filing 6 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Barrows, Jennifer)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
December 12, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 12/12/2022 Case Number 1:22-cv-12103. (Alba, Robert)
December 12, 2022 Filing 3 Case transferred to Central Division (Worcester) (McManus, Caetlin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Amos on behalf of Brian Daniels, Matthew Gafny, Kevin Lyons, Town of Hudson (Amos, Justin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Daniels, Matthew Gafny, Kevin Lyons, Town of Hudson ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9626100 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Form)(Amos, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beccia v. Harding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willow Beccia
Represented By: Mitchell Garabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlin Harding
Represented By: Glen A. Tagliamonte, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lyons
Represented By: Justin L. Amos
Represented By: Adam Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Daniels
Represented By: Justin L. Amos
Represented By: Adam Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Gaffny
Represented By: Justin L. Amos
Represented By: Adam Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hudson
Represented By: Justin L. Amos
Represented By: Adam Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Six
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?