RYAN et al v. GREIF, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS RYAN, SUSAN RYAN, SEAN GALLAGHER and ASHLEY SULTAN GALLAGHER
Defendant: GREIF, INC., CARAUSTAR INDUSTRIES, INC., THE NEWARK GROUP, INC., MASSACHUSETTS NATURAL FERTILIZER COMPANY, INC., OTTER FARM, INC., SEAMAN PAPER COMPANY OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC. and Plaintiff Seaman Paper Company Of Massachusetts, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2022cv40089
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Nathaniel M Gorton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Gardella on behalf of Greif, Inc. (Gardella, John)
September 27, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Gardella on behalf of Caraustar Industries, Inc. (Gardella, John)
September 27, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Gardella on behalf of The Newark Group, Inc. (Gardella, John)
September 16, 2022 Filing 22 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #21 STIPULATION Joint and Proposed Order filed by Thomas Ryan, Susan Ryan, Sean Gallagher, Ashley Sultan Gallagher; Answers due by 10/6/2022 (Warnock, Douglas)
September 15, 2022 Filing 21 STIPULATION Joint and Proposed Order by Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan. (Sloss, Ian)
August 31, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Rynar on behalf of Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan (Rynar, Zachary)
August 26, 2022 Filing 19 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Zachary A. Rynar. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 25, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Zachary A. Rynar Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9469646 by Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McElligott, Sean)
August 22, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Santoro on behalf of Thomas Ryan (Santoro, Victoria)
August 22, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tucker Merrigan on behalf of Thomas Ryan (Merrigan, Jonathan)
August 16, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian W. Sloss on behalf of Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan (Sloss, Ian)
August 16, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Slager on behalf of Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan (Slager, Paul)
August 15, 2022 Filing 13 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Paul A. Slager. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 15, 2022 Filing 12 Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ian W. Sloss. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. Counsel may need to link their CM/ECF account to their upgraded individual pacer account. Instructions on how to link CM/ECF accounts to upgraded pacer account can be found at # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-current-pacer-accounts.htm#link-account. (Warnock, Douglas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Paul A. Slager Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9452280 by Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McElligott, Sean)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ian W. Sloss Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9452249 by Ashley Sultan Gallagher, Sean Gallagher, Susan Ryan, Thomas Ryan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McElligott, Sean)
August 8, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Seaman Paper Company Of Massachusetts, Inc. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (McElligott, Sean)
August 8, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Otter Farm, Inc. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (McElligott, Sean)
August 8, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Massachusetts Natural Fertilizer Company, Inc. served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. (McElligott, Sean)
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed The Newark Group, Inc. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (McElligott, Sean)
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Caraustar Industries, Inc. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (McElligott, Sean)
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Greif, Inc. served on 8/4/2022, answer due 8/25/2022. (McElligott, Sean)
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barrows, Jennifer)
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9438993 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by ASHLEY SULTAN GALLAGHER, SEAN GALLAGHER, SUSAN RYAN, THOMAS RYAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(McElligott, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RYAN et al v. GREIF, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS RYAN
Represented By: Sean K. McElligott
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Jonathan Tucker Merrigan
Represented By: Paul A. Slager
Represented By: Victoria Santoro
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN RYAN
Represented By: Sean K. McElligott
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Paul A. Slager
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: Sean K. McElligott
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Paul A. Slager
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY SULTAN GALLAGHER
Represented By: Sean K. McElligott
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Paul A. Slager
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREIF, INC.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARAUSTAR INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEWARK GROUP, INC.
Represented By: John P. Gardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASSACHUSETTS NATURAL FERTILIZER COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTTER FARM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAMAN PAPER COMPANY OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiff Seaman Paper Company Of Massachusetts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?