Stewart v. Green Arrow Solutions d/b/a Green Arrow Loans et al
Plaintiff: Richard Stewart
Defendant: Green Arrow Solutions d/b/a Green Arrow Loans, Integra Financial Services, LLC, Nevada Impact Management, LLC, Dan K Shaw, Greg Jones, John Does 1-10, Dan Shaw and John Does 1-20
Case Number: 4:2022cv40091
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Leo T Sorokin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2023 Filing 24 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 24, 2023 to reopen action (Unopposed) by Richard Stewart. ALLOWED. (Belmont, Kellyann)
January 12, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to February 24, 2023 to reopen action (Unopposed) by Richard Stewart.(Goldstein, Matthew)
November 14, 2022 Filing 22 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Dore, Samantha)
November 14, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement by Richard Stewart (Goldstein, Matthew)
November 2, 2022 Filing 20 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/09/2023 to Serve Defendants Dan Shaw and Greg Jones Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants Dan Shaw and Greg Jones by Richard Stewart. ALLOWED. (Belmont, Kellyann)
October 31, 2022 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/09/2023 to Serve Defendants Dan Shaw and Greg Jones Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants Dan Shaw and Greg Jones filed by Richard Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Goldstein, Matthew)
October 31, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to 01/09/2023 to Serve Defendants Dan Shaw and Greg Jones Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Serve Defendants Dan Shaw and Greg Jones by Richard Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Matthew)
October 19, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Grant on behalf of Green Arrow Solutions (Grant, Michael)
October 18, 2022 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by Richard Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kolbus, Heather)
October 18, 2022 Filing 15 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Adding Claim by Richard Stewart. ALLOWED. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Belmont, Kellyann)
October 6, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Stewart. Green Arrow Solutions waiver sent on 10/6/2022, answer due 12/5/2022. (Kolbus, Heather)
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Adding Claim by Richard Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment I)(Goldstein, Matthew)
August 31, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Nevada Impact Management, LLC served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 25, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Integra Financial Services, LLC served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 19, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Richard Stewart (Kolbus, Heather)
August 19, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Goldstein on behalf of Richard Stewart (Goldstein, Matthew)
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Heather Kolbus and #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew J. Goldstein Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Dore, Samantha)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew J. Goldstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9452251 by Richard Stewart.(Lefebvre, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2022: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha).
August 17, 2022 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Heather Kolbus Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9452238 by Richard Stewart.(Lefebvre, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2022: Updated docket text. (Dore, Samantha).
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barrows, Jennifer)
August 15, 2022 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Finn, Mary)
August 12, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew J. Goldstein Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9452251 by Richard Stewart.(Lefebvre, Christopher)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Heather Kolbus Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number AMADC-9452238 by Richard Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lefebvre, Christopher)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9452164 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Richard Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Lefebvre, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Green Arrow Solutions d/b/a Green Arrow Loans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stewart
Represented By: Christopher M. Lefebvre
Represented By: Heather A. Kolbus
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Arrow Solutions d/b/a Green Arrow Loans
Represented By: Michael T. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integra Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Impact Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan K Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?