Celluci v. Staten et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Celluci
Defendant: Kevin Staten, Edwin Gonzalez, Natala Yenatska, Thomas A Wells and Priority Payout, Corp.
Case Number: 4:2022cv40100
Filed: September 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Timothy S Hillman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3545 Action to Recovery Money
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Filing 24 District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Kevin Staten answer due 10/28/2022. All future filing should be made in the MDL case #14-md-2566. (Castles, Martin)
September 26, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to October 28, 2022 to Respond to the First Amended Complaint by Kevin Staten.(Downey, Alicia) Modified on 10/3/2022 (Castles, Martin).
September 26, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia L. Downey on behalf of Kevin Staten (Downey, Alicia)
September 14, 2022 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Danieli, Chris)
September 14, 2022 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-22083.
September 9, 2022 Filing 19 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) transferring case to the District of Massachusetts re: MDL 2566 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Honorable Timothy S. Hillman. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (pes)
September 9, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (pes)
August 18, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Anthony Celluci (Eubank, James)
August 18, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony Celluci. Edwin Gonzalez waiver sent on 8/10/2022, response/answer due 10/11/2022; Kevin Staten waiver sent on 8/9/2022, response/answer due 10/11/2022; Natala Yenatska waiver sent on 8/10/2022, response/answer due 10/11/2022. (Eubank, James)
August 16, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Anthony Celluci. Priority Payment, Corp. served on 8/13/2022, response/answer due 9/6/2022. (Contartese, Adriana)
August 9, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Anthony Celluci Civil Cover Sheet (Eubank, James)
August 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Striking #4 Notice (Other) filed by Anthony Celluci by Anthony Celluci (Eubank, James)
August 9, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Bringhurst Eubank on behalf of Anthony Celluci. Attorney James Bringhurst Eubank added to party Anthony Celluci(pty:pla). (Eubank, James)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 8/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
July 25, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Edwin Gonzalez, Priority Payment, Corp., Kevin Staten, Thomas A. Wells, Natala Yenatska. (jas)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) For Each of the five defendants by Anthony Celluci re #6 Notice of Action/Publication, filed by Anthony Celluci (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons, #2 Proposed summons, #3 Proposed summons, #4 Proposed summons) (Contartese, Adriana)
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT as of RIght against Anthony Celluci, filed by Anthony Celluci.(Contartese, Adriana)
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Striking #6 Notice of Action/Publication filed by Anthony Celluci Motion to Strike all of Filing 6 by Anthony Celluci (Contartese, Adriana)
July 21, 2022 Filing 6 STRICKEN - Notice of Action/Publication filed by Anthony Celluci. Anthony Celluci answer/written defenses due by 10/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Contartese, Adriana) Modified to show that this document has been stricken per DE #7 on 7/22/2022 (jua).
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #4 Notice (Other). Document Blank; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile a legible copy of the document. (jas)
July 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Anthony Celluci civil cover sheet (Contartese, Adriana)
July 11, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jas)
July 8, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
July 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1:22-CV22083 against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15776784, filed by ANTHONY CELLUCI.(Contartese, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celluci v. Staten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Celluci
Represented By: Adriana Contartese
Represented By: James B. Eubank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Staten
Represented By: Alicia L. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natala Yenatska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Payout, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?