Long v. Garland et al
Petitioner: James Robert Long
Respondent: Merrick Garland and Warden Bowers
Case Number: 4:2023cv40169
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Margaret R Guzman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Sauter on behalf of Bowers, Merrick Garland (Sauter, Mark)
January 12, 2024 Filing 7 District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. SERVICE ORDER re 2241 Petition. Order entered pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243 governing Section 2241 cases for service on respondents. The answer or responsive pleading is due no later than 21 days from receipt of this order.(Castles, Martin)
December 21, 2023 Filing 6 Filing fee/payment: $ 5.00, receipt number 100005929 for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) (Phillips, Sophie)
December 20, 2023 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Robert Long. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 Letter re filing fee from John Long. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 1, 2023 Filing 3 District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. Procedural Order regarding resolution of filing fee. Plaintiff must respond within 21 days. (Castilla, Francis)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Burgos, Sandra)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by James Robert Long. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion and Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Burgos, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Garland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Robert Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Merrick Garland
Represented By: Mark Sauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Bowers
Represented By: Mark Sauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?