Sosa et al v. 28Freight LLC
Plaintiff: Claudio Sosa, Luis Aguilar and Cristian Lamarque
Defendant: 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier, Richard Marks and 28Freight LLC doing business as TruckCourier
Case Number: 4:2024cv40064
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Presiding Judge: Margaret R Guzman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2024 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Luis Aguilar, Cristian Lamarque, Claudio Sosa. (Smit, Rachel)
May 31, 2024 Filing 17 District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss . Response due by 6/24/2024, Reply due by 7/15/2024. (Castles, Martin)
May 29, 2024 Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Luis Aguilar, Cristian Lamarque, Claudio Sosa.(Smit, Rachel)
May 21, 2024 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: re #14 MOTION to Dismiss by 28Freight LLC, Richard Marks. Pursuant to ECF Administrative Procedure G(4) under Electronic Filing: "Any memorandum of law or other attachment filed in support of a main document shall be filed as a separate document, using the proper event." Additionally, any exhibits/ accompanying documents shall be attached to the Memorandum of law.Counsel is reminded to review the Local Rules and the Attorney Handbook when filing documents with the Court by accessing our web page, at www.mad.uscourts.gov under CM/ECF E-Filing. (Barrows, Jennifer)
May 20, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by 28Freight LLC, Richard Marks. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit A - Marks Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Sosa System Subscription, #4 Exhibit C - Aguilar System Subscription, #5 Exhibit D - Lamarque System Subscription, #6 Exhibit E - Employee Handbook, #7 Exhibit F - Complaint)(Callaghan, Peter)
May 3, 2024 Filing 13 District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. 28Freight LLC answer due 5/20/2024; Richard Marks answer due 5/20/2024. (Castles, Martin)
May 2, 2024 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 20, 2024 to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by 28Freight LLC, Richard Marks.(Sonneborn, Daniel)
May 1, 2024 Filing 11 STATE COURT Record 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier summons served on 3/28/2024, answer due 4/18/2024; Richard Marks summons served on 4/16/2024, answer due 5/7/2024.. (Sonneborn, Daniel)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Harper A. Weissburg on behalf of 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier, Richard Marks (Weissburg, Harper)
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Callaghan on behalf of 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier, Richard Marks (Callaghan, Peter)
April 29, 2024 Filing 8 District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Peter G. Callaghan. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at # https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected.Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions # https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm.A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (Barrows, Jennifer)
April 29, 2024 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Barrows, Jennifer)
April 29, 2024 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Barrows, Jennifer)
April 29, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary A. Schwab on behalf of Luis Aguilar, Cristian Lamarque, Claudio Sosa (Schwab, Hillary)
April 29, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel J. Smit on behalf of Luis Aguilar, Cristian Lamarque, Claudio Sosa (Smit, Rachel)
April 26, 2024 Filing 3 Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Peter G. Callaghan Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10387118 by 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier, Richard Marks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Peter G. Callaghan)(Sonneborn, Daniel)
April 26, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier. (Sonneborn, Daniel)
April 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier, Richard Marks ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10386945 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Sonneborn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Massachusetts District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa et al v. 28Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudio Sosa
Represented By: Hillary A. Schwab
Represented By: Rachel J. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Aguilar
Represented By: Hillary A. Schwab
Represented By: Rachel J. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristian Lamarque
Represented By: Hillary A. Schwab
Represented By: Rachel J. Smit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 28Freight LLC d/b/a Truck Courier
Represented By: Daniel R. Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Marks
Represented By: Daniel R. Sonneborn
Represented By: Harper A. Weissburg
Represented By: Peter Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 28Freight LLC doing business as TruckCourier
Represented By: Daniel R. Sonneborn
Represented By: Harper A. Weissburg
Represented By: Peter Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?