Erickson et al v. AmeriCold Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erickson, R. Thomas Erickson, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand and Richard L. Fredrick
Defendant: Born, Global Experience Specialists, Inc., Minnesota Chemical Company, The, Sysco Minnesota, Inc., Veritiv Operating Company, Jon Born, Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc., AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, Sabin Peterson, US Foods, Inc., GES Exposition Services, Tracy McDonald, William Seehafer, Minnesota Chemical Company, The a Minnesota corporation, separately and doing business as Minnesota Chemical Company Warehouse, US Foods, Inc. a Delaware corporation, separately and doing business as U.S. Foodservice, Jerry's Enterprises, Inc. a Minnesota corporation, separately and doing business as Jerry's Foods, Unisource Worldwide, Inc., Versacold Logistics Services and GES Exposition Services, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2017cv01176
Filed: April 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 118 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(kt)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER on #115 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/6/2018. (DLO)
December 4, 2018 Filing 116 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #115 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 4, 2018 Filing 115 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. Jointly Signed by SuperValu Inc., Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., Americold Logistics, LLC, Veritiv Operating Company, Global Experience Specialists, Inc., Sysco Minnesota, Inc., The Minnesota Chemical Company, and US Foods, Inc.. (Atmore, Thomas)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/28/2018. (CLB)
October 26, 2018 Filing 113 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings from Counsel for SuperValu, Inc.. (Hall, Isaac)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Sysco Minnesota Inc.'s Crossclaim Against SuperValu Inc. (a Delaware corporation). Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/26/2018. (DLO)
October 25, 2018 Filing 111 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #110 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
October 25, 2018 Filing 110 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Crossclaim By and Between SuperValu Inc. and Sysco Minnesota, Inc. by SuperValu Inc.. Jointly Signed by Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
October 4, 2018 Filing 109 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #106 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
October 4, 2018 Filing 108 MEMORANDUM in Support re #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by SuperValu Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ellingboe, Deborah)
October 4, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Ellingboe, Deborah) Modified on 10/5/2018 (kt).
October 4, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by SuperValu Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Dismiss/General (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/2/2018. (DLO)
March 26, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, Veritiv Operating Company. (Shillingstad, Hal)
March 15, 2018 Filing 103 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Thomas Atmore & Peter Rosene, on behalf of plaintiffs; Deborah Ellingboe & Issac Hall, on behalf of the defendants Supervalu Inc. & Jerry's Enterprises, Inc; and Mary Knoblauch, Tina Syring & John McGowan, on behalf of Cross Claimant Sysco Minnesota, Inc. Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2018 re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by SuperValu Inc. & Jerry's Enterprises, Inc. argued and taken under advisement. Order to be issued. TIME IN COURT: 40 minutes. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (CLB)
March 1, 2018 Filing 102 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc. re #101 Reply filed by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc..(Ellingboe, Deborah)
March 1, 2018 Filing 101 REPLY re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc..(Ellingboe, Deborah)
February 22, 2018 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas C. Atmore in OPPOSITION TO #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand.(Atmore, Thomas)
February 22, 2018 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Atmore, Thomas)
February 16, 2018 Filing 98 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Atmore, Thomas)
February 16, 2018 Filing 97 SuperValu Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by SuperValu Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
January 29, 2018 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
January 26, 2018 Filing 95 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Jerry's Enterprises, Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
January 26, 2018 Filing 94 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Blackrock, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant SuperValu Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
January 26, 2018 Filing 93 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendants SuperValu and Jerry's Enterprises Joint Motion to Dismiss #96 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Ellingboe, Deborah) Modified text and link on 1/29/2018 (kt).
January 26, 2018 Filing 92 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #96 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc..(Ellingboe, Deborah) Modified text and link on 1/29/2018 (kt).
January 26, 2018 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM in Support re #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, Jerry's Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ellingboe, Deborah) Modified text and link on 1/29/2018 (kt).
January 26, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #96 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Ellingboe, Deborah) Modified text and link on 1/29/2018 (kt).
January 26, 2018 Filing 89 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc.. (Ellingboe, Deborah) Modified text on 1/29/2018 (kt).
January 26, 2018 Filing 88 Defendant Sysco Minnesota, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against SuperValu Inc.., COUNTERCLAIM against R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. filed by Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. (Knoblauch, Mary)
January 26, 2018 Filing 87 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Defendant Veritiv Operating Company is a subsidiary of Veritiv Corporation. (McKinney, David) Modified text on 1/29/2018 (kt).
January 26, 2018 Filing 86 Defendant Veritiv Operating Company's ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Veritiv Operating Company. (McKinney, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 85 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Americold Realty Trust is a corporate parent of Defendant AmeriCold Logistics, LLC. (McKinney, David)
January 26, 2018 Filing 84 Defendant Americold Logistics, LLC's ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by AmeriCold Logistics, LLC. (McKinney, David)
January 24, 2018 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand re #37 Amended Complaint (Atmore, Thomas)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re #52 Stipulation: Defendants Veritiv Operating Company and Americold Logistics LLC may have an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until January 26, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/8/2018. (lmb)
January 5, 2018 Filing 81 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. US Foods Holding Corp. is a corporate parent of Defendant US Foods, Inc.. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
January 5, 2018 Filing 80 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by US Foods, Inc.. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #71 Stipulation: US Foods, Inc. answer due 1/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/4/2018. (lmb)
January 5, 2018 Filing 78 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Sysco, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. Sysco, Inc. is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. (Knoblauch, Mary)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kimberly Ann Jones for AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, and Veritiv Operating Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/4/2018. (JLW)
January 3, 2018 Filing 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimberly A. Jones. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5890051 filed by AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, Veritiv Operating Company. (McKinney, David)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeffrey Ivan Pasek for US Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 01/03/2018. (JLW)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #69 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Daniel Clyde for US Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/2/2018. (JLW)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re #71 Stipulation: Jerry's Enterprises, Inc. answer due 1/26/2018; SuperValu Inc. answer due 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/2/2018. (lmb)
December 29, 2017 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #71 Stipulation,. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
December 29, 2017 Filing 71 STIPULATION to extend the time for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by US Foods, Inc.. Jointly Signed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, and William C. Wedebrand. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
December 29, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey I Pasek. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5886702 filed by US Foods, Inc.. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
December 29, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Clyde. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5886688 filed by US Foods, Inc.. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re #56 Stipulation: Defendant Sysco Minnesota, Inc. shall have to and including January 26, 2018 to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, and that, notwithstanding this extension, Defendant Sysco Minnesota, Inc. has not waived its right to assert any defenses, including defenses provide by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/29/2017. (lmb)
December 28, 2017 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina Syring-Petrocchi on behalf of US Foods, Inc.. (Syring-Petrocchi, Tina)
December 27, 2017 Filing 66 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #65 Stipulation,. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
December 27, 2017 Filing 65 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint for Defendants SuperValu Inc. and Jerry's Enterprises, Inc. by Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., SuperValu Inc.. Jointly Signed by Plaintiffs R. Thomas Erickson, et al.. (Ellingboe, Deborah)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert C. Christenson for Global Experience Specialists, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/27/2017. (JLW)
December 27, 2017 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Viad Corp is a corporate parent of Defendant Global Experience Specialists, Inc.. (Voelbel, Richard)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Joseph McGowan, Jr., for Sysco Minnesota, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/27/2017. (JLW)
December 27, 2017 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Minnesota Chemical Company, The. (James, David)
December 27, 2017 Filing 60 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Minnesota Chemical Company, The. (James, David)
December 26, 2017 Filing 59 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert C. Christenson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5881231 filed by Global Experience Specialists, Inc.. (Voelbel, Richard)
December 26, 2017 Filing 58 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Global Experience Specialists, Inc.) filed by Global Experience Specialists, Inc.. (Voelbel, Richard)
December 22, 2017 Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #56 Stipulation. (Knoblauch, Mary)
December 22, 2017 Filing 56 STIPULATION re #37 Amended Complaint Extension of Time to Respond by Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. Jointly Signed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, and William C. Wedebrand. (Knoblauch, Mary)
December 21, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John McGowan, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5878656 filed by Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. (Knoblauch, Mary)
December 21, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary L Knoblauch on behalf of Sysco Minnesota, Inc.. (Knoblauch, Mary)
December 21, 2017 Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #52 Stipulation,. (McKinney, David)
December 21, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond by AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, Veritiv Operating Company. Jointly Signed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand, and Union Trustees of the Minneapolis Food Distributing Industry Pension Plan. (McKinney, David)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re #49 Dismissal of Defendants Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, and William Seehafer ONLY filed by William Seehafer, Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/14/2017. (DLO)
December 13, 2017 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #49 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Congiu, Michael)
December 13, 2017 Filing 49 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, and William Seehafer without prejudice by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer. Jointly Signed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, and William C. Wedebrand. (Congiu, Michael)
December 11, 2017 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. Minnesota Chemical Company, The served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. Jerry's Enterprises, Inc. served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. Sysco Minnesota, Inc. served on 12/5/2017, answer due 12/26/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. Veritiv Operating Company served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. US Foods, Inc. served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. SuperValu Inc. served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. Global Experience Specialists, Inc. served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 11, 2017 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. AmeriCold Logistics, LLC served on 12/6/2017, answer due 12/27/2017. (Atmore, Thomas)
December 1, 2017 Filing 40 Summons Issued as to SuperValu Inc.. (AKL)
December 1, 2017 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to William Seehafer. (AKL)
December 1, 2017 Filing 38 Summons Issued as to AmeriCold Logistics, LLC, Jon Born, Global Experience Specialists, Inc., Jerry's Enterprises, Inc., Tracy McDonald, Minnesota Chemical Company, The, Sabin Peterson, Sysco Minnesota, Inc., US Foods, Inc., Veritiv Operating Company. (AKL)
November 30, 2017 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT naming additional parties against All Defendants. filed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand. Filer requests summons issued. (Atmore, Thomas)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/29/2017. (lmb)
October 31, 2017 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2017. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint and Add Parties #28 taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (lmb)
October 24, 2017 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Congiu, Michael)
October 17, 2017 Filing 33 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re To Allow Amended Complaint and the Naming of Additional Defendants #28 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. (Atmore, Thomas)
October 17, 2017 Filing 32 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #28 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand.(Atmore, Thomas)
October 17, 2017 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas C. Atmore in SUPPORT OF #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-G)(Atmore, Thomas)
October 17, 2017 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Atmore, Thomas)
October 17, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Atmore, Thomas)
October 17, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Atmore, Thomas)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/6/2017. (lmb)
October 2, 2017 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/2/2017. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (lmb)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Melissa M. Harclerode for Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson and William Seehafer. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/27/17. (AKL)
September 26, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melissa M. Harclerode. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-5735913 filed by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer. (Congiu, Michael)
September 26, 2017 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Melissa M. Harclerode as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (JDF)
September 25, 2017 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. Jointly Signed by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, and William Seehafer.(Atmore, Thomas)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/1/2017. (lmb)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Remand to State Court(Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/31/2017. (DLO)
July 20, 2017 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Thomas Atmore for plaintiffs; Michael Congiu for defendants; Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2017 re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Troy D. Gustafson, Richard L. Fredrick, R. Thomas Erickson, William C. Wedebrand - argued and taken under advisement. Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (CLB)
July 6, 2017 Filing 18 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Atmore, Thomas)
June 26, 2017 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Congiu, Michael)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/25/2017. (DLO)
May 25, 2017 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Congiu, Michael)
May 25, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer. (Congiu, Michael)
May 24, 2017 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2017 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Atmore, Thomas) Modified text on 5/25/2017 (JDF).
May 17, 2017 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand.(Atmore, Thomas)
May 17, 2017 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Thomas C. Atmore in SUPPORT OF #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Atmore, Thomas)
May 17, 2017 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Atmore, Thomas)
May 8, 2017 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: The May 30, 2017 pretrial conference with Magistrate Judge David Schultz is CANCELED and will be rescheduled, if necessary, after a ruling on the Motion to Remand. (KMH)
May 1, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Atmore, Thomas)
May 1, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by R. Thomas Erickson, Richard L. Fredrick, Troy D. Gustafson, William C. Wedebrand. (Atmore, Thomas)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2017 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KNK)
April 21, 2017 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Defendants' Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses filed by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit(s) A-O, #3 Certificate of Service) (Congiu, Michael)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 4/20/2017. (CLB)
April 18, 2017 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jon Born, Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer re #1 Notice of Removal, (Congiu, Michael)
April 14, 2017 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 17-cv-1176 (DSD/DTS). (lmb)
April 14, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-TR-CV-17-38. (Filing fee $400 receipt number AMNDC-5446603.) Filed by Tracy McDonald, Sabin Peterson, William Seehafer, Jon Born. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Notice of Hearing, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service). (Congiu, Michael) Modified text on 4/14/2017 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson et al v. AmeriCold Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Born
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Experience Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R Voelbel
Represented By: Robert C. Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Chemical Company, The
Represented By: David A James
Represented By: Sarah B C Riskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Minnesota, Inc.
Represented By: John Joseph McGowan, Jr.
Represented By: Mary L Knoblauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veritiv Operating Company
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Jones
Represented By: David Paul McKinney
Represented By: Hal A Shillingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Born
Represented By: Michael G Congiu
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Represented By: Melissa M. Harclerode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry's Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac B Hall
Represented By: Deborah A Ellingboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SuperValu Inc.
Represented By: Isaac B Hall
Represented By: Deborah A Ellingboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriCold Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Jones
Represented By: David Paul McKinney
Represented By: Hal A Shillingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabin Peterson
Represented By: Michael G Congiu
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Represented By: Melissa M. Harclerode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ivan Pasek
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Clyde
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GES Exposition Services
Represented By: Richard R Voelbel
Represented By: Robert C. Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy McDonald
Represented By: Michael G Congiu
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Represented By: Melissa M. Harclerode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Seehafer
Represented By: Michael G Congiu
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Represented By: Melissa M. Harclerode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Chemical Company, The a Minnesota corporation, separately and doing business as Minnesota Chemical Company Warehouse
Represented By: David A James
Represented By: Sarah B C Riskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Foods, Inc. a Delaware corporation, separately and doing business as U.S. Foodservice
Represented By: Jeffrey Ivan Pasek
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Clyde
Represented By: Tina Syring-Petrocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry's Enterprises, Inc. a Minnesota corporation, separately and doing business as Jerry's Foods
Represented By: Isaac B Hall
Represented By: Deborah A Ellingboe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unisource Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Jones
Represented By: David Paul McKinney
Represented By: Hal A Shillingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versacold Logistics Services
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Jones
Represented By: David Paul McKinney
Represented By: Hal A Shillingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GES Exposition Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R Voelbel
Represented By: Robert C. Christenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Thomas Erickson
Represented By: Thomas C Atmore
Represented By: Thomas R Haugrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy D. Gustafson
Represented By: Thomas C Atmore
Represented By: Thomas R Haugrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Wedebrand
Represented By: Thomas C Atmore
Represented By: Thomas R Haugrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Fredrick
Represented By: Thomas C Atmore
Represented By: Thomas R Haugrud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?