In Re: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: In Re: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation, Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Tim Ault
Defendant: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation and Defendant's Primary Outside Counsel
Case Number: 0:2017md02795
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 455 (Text-Only)SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/12/2019. (LCC)
September 5, 2019 Filing 454 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel . (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 453 MEMORANDUM OF LAW. Based on the foregoing reasons, the Court issued the August 20, 2019 Order granting the State's motion for a continuance. #447 K (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/28/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER FOR A STAY OF THE CONSOLIDATED DERIVATIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/28/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
August 28, 2019 Filing 451 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by State of Oregon. Jointly Signed by CenturyLink, Inc., Glen F. Post III, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., David D. Cole, Karen Puckett, Dean J. Douglas, and G. Clay Bailey.(Blatchley, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 450 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension of Time to Submit Joint Report in the Consolidated Securities Action #449 Letter to District Judge. (McNab, William)
August 26, 2019 Filing 449 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CenturyLink, Inc. . (McNab, William)
August 20, 2019 Filing 448 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Order for a Stay of the Consolidated Derivative Action. (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The State of Minnesota's Motion for Continuance and Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant and Intervenors' Motion for Temporary Injunction #436 and #438 is GRANTED. 2. The hearing on Defendant and Intervenors' Motion for Temporary Injunction to Enjoin and Stay Minnesota Attorney General's Duplicative Consumer Restitution Claims #421 is cancelled and will be rescheduled after Defendant files for preliminary approval of the class action settlement. The State of Minnesota's opposition to the Motion for Temporary Injunction will be due 30 days after the date that Defendant files for preliminary approval of the class action settlement. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/20/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 446 DECLARATION of Douglas P. Lobel in Opposition to #436 MOTION for Continuance filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 445 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #436 MOTION for Continuance filed by CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
August 19, 2019 Filing 444 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry W Blackwell on behalf of CenturyLink, Inc.. (Blackwell, Jerry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 443 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #436 MOTION for Continuance : Date and time to be determined. (Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 442 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by State of Minnesota re #437 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by State of Minnesota.(Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 441 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #436 MOTION for Continuance filed by State of Minnesota.(Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 440 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #436 Motion for Continuance filed by State of Minnesota.(Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 439 AFFIDAVIT of James W. Canaday in SUPPORT OF #436 MOTION for Continuance filed by State of Minnesota.(Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 438 MOTION for Continuance filed by State of Minnesota. (Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM in Support re #436 MOTION for Continuance filed by State of Minnesota.(Canaday, James)
August 16, 2019 Filing 436 MOTION for Continuance filed by State of Minnesota. (Canaday, James)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The State of Minnesota's Letter Request #430 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/15/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER in Response to #432 in 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM Letter to District Judge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, the parties' request to extend their time to meet and confer and submit a revised Case Management Schedule to and including August 20, 2019 is GRANTED. 2. If an agreement cannot be reached by that date, the parties shall on that date each submit counter-proposals of a revised Case Management Schedule for the Court's consideration. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/14/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (KDS).
August 13, 2019 Filing 433 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 13, 2019 Filing 432 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Tim Ault Joint Letter re Extension of Time to Continue Discussions re Revised Case Management Schedule. (Eagel, Lawrence)
August 8, 2019 Filing 431 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CenturyLink, Inc. . (McNab, William)
August 7, 2019 Filing 430 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Minnesota requesting relief regarding 9/25/2019 hearing. (Canaday, James)
August 5, 2019 Filing 429 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation re #428 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion (Lobel, Douglas)
August 5, 2019 Filing 428 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #421 MOTION Temporary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Lobel, Douglas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 427 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation re #421 MOTION Temporary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Lobel, Douglas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 426 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #421 MOTION Temporary Injunction filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 425 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #421 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 424 Declaration of Douglas P. Lobel in Support of #421 MOTION Temporary Injunction filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 423 MEMORANDUM in Support re #421 MOTION Temporary Injunction filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 422 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re #421 MOTION for Temporary Injunction: time and date t.b.d. (Lobel, Douglas) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (kt).
August 1, 2019 Filing 421 MOTION Temporary Injunction filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Lobel, Douglas)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) (18-cv-00296 #154 and (17-md-02795 #276 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/30/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM(GRR)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER FOR STAY OF THE CONSOLIDATED DERIVATIVE ACTION. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/24/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
July 22, 2019 Filing 418 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel . (Gudmundson, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 417 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Michael P. Srodoski (Hagstrom, Richard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 416 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Order for a Stay of the Consolidated Securities Action. (Gibbs, Patrick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 415 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Addressing Plaintiffs' July 1, 2019 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Answer, #2 Exhibit(s) Response)(Gibbs, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 414 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Oregon filed with permission of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Blatchley, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 413 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Re: Addressing Plaintiffs' June 14, 2019 Letter. (Gibbs, Patrick)
June 14, 2019 Filing 412 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Oregon re Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed with permission of the Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A June 10, 2019 Order of Hon. Bethany A. Fountain Lindberg, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B June 11, 2019 Order of Hon. Bethany A. Fountain Lindberg, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C April 10, 2019 Transcript of Motion Hearing, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D June 7, 2019 Transcript of Motion Hearing)(Blatchley, Michael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 411 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript of #407 Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Fortunato, Melissa)
June 9, 2019 Filing 410 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 06/07/2019 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (78 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (LAS)
June 9, 2019 Filing 409 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
June 7, 2019 Filing 408 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #407 Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Blatchley, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 407 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2019 re #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Karen Puckett, Glen F. Post, III, Dean J. Douglas. A status update was given regarding the tentative settlement of the consumer fraud portion of the case. A request to stay that portion of the case until mid-August so that negotiations can be concluded, was requested. The Court ordered that an update, signed by both partes, shall be electronically submitted every 30-45 days. Order to follow. The motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (GRR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 406 (Text-only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (TIME CHANGE ONLY): #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 08:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (GRR)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 405 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/30/2010. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER REGARDING LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/30/2010. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
May 21, 2019 Filing 403 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Case Management Order for the Consolidated Securities Action #400 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,. (Gibbs, Patrick)
May 14, 2019 Filing 402 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Leadership Structure #400 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,. (Eagel, Lawrence)
May 8, 2019 Filing 401 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Gudmundson, Brian)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 400 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.'s Motion to Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Action, Appoint Lead or Co-lead Plaintiff, and Approve Its Selection of Lead or Co-lead Counsel #330 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: the motion to consolidate is GRANTED, and the motion to appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel is DENIED. 2. Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. v. Storey, Civil File No. 19-263, and Palkon v. CenturyLink, Inc., Civil File No. 19-284 are hereby consolidated with the Consolidated Derivative Action for all purposes in the above-captioned MDL. 3. The Application by Plaintiff Edward Tansey for Appointment of Lead and Liaison Counsel in Consolidated Derivative Action #332 is DENIED. 4. Plaintiff Ault's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel #342 is GRANTED. The Court appoints Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C. as Lead Counsel in the Consolidated Derivative Action and appoints Tim Ault as Lead Plaintiff in the Consolidated Derivative Action. Within three weeks of the date of this Order, Lead Counsel shall submit a proposed leadership structure to this Court. 5. Michael Hartleib's Motion for Acceptance of Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to the Appointment of the Robbins Arroyo and Weiser Firms as Lead Counsel and Notice of Intent to Attend the Hearing on 3-6-19 #381 is GRANTED. 6. Lead Counsel and defense counsel shall meet and confer and shall submit a proposed draft case management order for the Consolidated Derivative Action within four weeks from the date of this Order. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/23/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
March 22, 2019 Filing 399 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Wright on behalf of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Wright, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2019 Filing 398 Third Declaration of Dyani Galligan in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas)
March 22, 2019 Filing 397 Third Declaration of Douglas P. Lobel in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-9)(Lobel, Douglas)
March 22, 2019 Filing 396 RESPONSE re #360 Reply (Plaintiffs' Surreply) filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
March 13, 2019 Filing 395 DECLARATION of George C. Aguilar re #394 Response by Edward Tansey . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-8)(Aguilar, George)
March 13, 2019 Filing 394 RESPONSE re #382 Brief Self-Styled Amicus Curiae Brief of Shareholder Michael Hartleib filed by Edward Tansey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Aguilar, George)
March 12, 2019 Filing 393 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/6/2019 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (48 pages). Court Reporter: Renee Rogge. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019. (RAR)
March 12, 2019 Filing 392 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RAR)
March 12, 2019 Filing 391 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RAR) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (lmb).
March 7, 2019 Filing 389 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #384 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Blatchley, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 388 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #384 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Fortunato, Melissa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 390 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2019 re #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey, #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc., #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault. The motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (GRR)
March 6, 2019 Filing 387 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #384 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Federman, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 386 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #384 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (McNab, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 385 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Aguilar, George)
March 6, 2019 Filing 384 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2019 re #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey, #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc., #381 MOTION filed by Michael Hartleib, #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault. The motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (GRR)
March 5, 2019 Filing 383 EXHIBITS A-K re #382 Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Michael Hartleib. (kt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 382 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Michael Hartleib. (kt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 381 MICHAEL HARTLEIB, SHAREHOLDER AND CONCERNED CITIZEN, MOTION FOR ACCEPTANCE OF AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE APPOINTMENT OF THE ROBBINS ARROYO AND WEISER FIRMS AS LEAD COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO ATTEND THE HEARING ON 3-6-19 filed by Michael Hartleib. (kt)
March 5, 2019 Filing 380 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Channa A. Lloyd (O'Mara, Mark)
March 4, 2019 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Federman, William)
March 4, 2019 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth J S Leventhal on behalf of Tim Ault. (Leventhal, Seth)
February 15, 2019 Filing 377 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Gudmundson, Brian)
February 6, 2019 Filing 376 COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (kt)
February 5, 2019 Filing 375 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) (kt)
February 4, 2019 Filing 374 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Gibbs, Patrick)
February 4, 2019 Filing 373 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery, #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Lobel, Douglas)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AND PROPOSED INTERVENORS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE BRIEF UNTIL MARCH 22, 2019 #366 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED:Defendants and Proposed Intervenors' Motion is GRANTED and the deadline for Defendant and Proposed Intervenors to file their response to the Consumer Plaintiffs' Surreply is extended from February 22, 2019, to March 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/29/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
January 24, 2019 Filing 371 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Paul Eagel on behalf of Tim Ault. (Eagel, Lawrence)
January 24, 2019 Filing 370 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #366 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 369 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #366 Motion for Extension of Time (General), filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 368 MEMORANDUM in Support re #366 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 367 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #366 MOTION for Extension of Time : Date and time to be determined. (Lobel, Douglas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 366 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Lobel, Douglas)
January 22, 2019 Filing 365 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett Re: In response to Plaintiffs' January 14, 2019 letter (submitted with the Court's prior permission). (Gibbs, Patrick)
January 22, 2019 Filing 364 NOTICE of Appearance by George Carlos Aguilar on behalf of Edward Tansey. (Aguilar, George)
January 18, 2019 Filing 363 REPLY re #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Reply in Support of Application by Plaintiff Tim Ault for Appointment of Lead Counsel in Consolidated Derivative Actions filed by Tim Ault.(Fortunato, Melissa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 362 DECLARATION of Anne T. Regan in Opposition to #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Gudmundson, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 361 DECLARATION of Brian C. Gudmundson in Opposition to #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20, #21 Exhibit(s) 21, #22 Exhibit(s) 22, #23 Exhibit(s) 23, #24 Exhibit(s) 24, #25 Exhibit(s) 25, #26 Exhibit(s) 26, #27 Exhibit(s) 27, #28 Exhibit(s) 28, #29 Exhibit(s) 29, #30 Exhibit(s) 30, #31 Exhibit(s) 31, #32 Exhibit(s) 32, #33 Exhibit(s) 33, #34 Exhibit(s) 34, #35 Exhibit(s) 35, #36 Exhibit(s) 36, #37 Exhibit(s) 37, #38 Exhibit(s) 38, #39 Exhibit(s) 39, #40 Exhibit(s) 40, #41 Exhibit(s) 41, #42 Exhibit(s) 42)(Gudmundson, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 360 REPLY re #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers (Sur-Reply) filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gudmundson, Brian)
January 18, 2019 Filing 359 NOTICE by Sona Andresian, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker re #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Joinder in Plaintiff IMG's Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Counsel and Withdrawal of Motion of Andresian Plaintiffs for Appointment of Lead Counsel (Perry, Shawn)
January 18, 2019 Filing 358 REPLY re #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Reply in Support of Application By Plaintiff Edward Tansey for Appointment of Lead Counsel in Consolidated Derivative Actions filed by Edward Tansey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 18, 2019 Filing 357 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc..(Corwin, Gregg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 356 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Perry, Shawn)
January 16, 2019 Filing 355 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Fortunato, Melissa) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (JLB).
January 15, 2019 Filing 354 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel : by Plaintiff Edward Tansey Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 15, 2019 Filing 353 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Corwin, Gregg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 352 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by State of Oregon re Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed with permission of the Court. (Blatchley, Michael)
January 15, 2019 Filing 351 (Text-only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: The Motion Hearing scheduled on March 6, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13 for the following motions has been cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date: #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery; #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers; #132 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6); and #276 MOTION to Dismiss - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6). (GRR)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers #312 is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs shall file a sur-reply not exceeding 8,000 words by January 18, 2019. 3. Plaintiffs' sur-reply shall address the argument that Defendant has withdrawn its motion to compel arbitration under 4 of the Federal Arbitration Act ("FAA"); that Defendant has requested to stay these actions pursuant to 3 of the FAA; and any arguments or supporting documents that rely on discovery obtained or produced after August 23, 2018. Plaintiffs may submit conformed declarations in light of discovery that occurred after August 23, 2018; however, the admissibility and significance of these declarations will be decided after Defendant has had the opportunity to respond to the sur-reply. 4. Defendant shall be permitted to file a response to the sur-reply. The response shall be filed by February 22, 2019, and shall not exceed 8,000 words. 5. The oral argument currently set for March 6, 2019, is CANCELLED, and the parties shall contact the Court to reschedule oral argument at a later date. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/8/2019. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
January 3, 2019 Filing 349 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #332 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey.(Aguilar, George)
January 3, 2019 Filing 348 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C. Date and time to be determined. (Fortunato, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 347 EXHIBIT A to Declaration of Garrett D Blanchfield re #340 Declaration in Support filed by Edward Tansey.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 346 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #342 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault.(Fortunato, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 345 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault.(Fortunato, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 344 Declaration of Melissa A. Fortunato in Support of #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault.(Fortunato, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 343 MEMORANDUM in Support re #342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fortunato, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 342 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Tim Ault. (Fortunato, Melissa)
January 3, 2019 Filing 341 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #332 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 340 Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield in Support of #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey.(Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 339 Declaration of George C. Aguilar in Support of #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 Exhibit(s) D-G, #3 Exhibit(s) H-P)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 338 EXHIBIT Index re #336 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #331 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc..(Corwin, Gregg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 337 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re IMG's Motion to Consolifate #330 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Corwin, Gregg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 336 First AFFIDAVIT of Gregg M Corwin in SUPPORT OF #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Corwin, Gregg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 335 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #330 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc..(Corwin, Gregg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 334 MEMORANDUM in Support re #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 333 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel : Date and time to be determined. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 332 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edward Tansey. (Blanchfield, Garrett)
January 3, 2019 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM in Support re #330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc..(Corwin, Gregg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 330 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Corwin, Gregg)
January 3, 2019 Filing 329 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for MDL - Notice Only Sona Andresian, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker. (Perry, Shawn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 328 NOTICE of Change of Address by George Carlos Aguilar (Aguilar, George)
January 3, 2019 Filing 327 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sona Andresian, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker.(Perry, Shawn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 326 Declaration of Thomas J. McKenna in Support of #324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sona Andresian, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Perry, Shawn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 325 MEMORANDUM in Support re #324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sona Andresian, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Perry, Shawn)
January 3, 2019 Filing 324 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Sona Andresian, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker. (Perry, Shawn)
December 20, 2018 Filing 323 DECLARATION of William A. McNab in Opposition to #312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waiver filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Lobel, Douglas)
December 20, 2018 Filing 322 RESPONSE re #312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waiver filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Parties' Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing #318 is GRANTED. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 280. in case 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/19/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM(GRR)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The Joint Motion regarding Continued Sealing #311 is GRANTED and permanent sealing is GRANTED for Docket Nos.: 216, 219, 220, 221, 222, 223, 224, 225, 226, 227, 229, 232, 233, 234, 235, 236, 237, 238, 239, 240, 241, 242, 243, 244, 245, 246, 247, 248, 249, 250, 251, 253, 261, 263, 264, 265, and 266. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/19/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
December 18, 2018 Filing 319 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #311 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #232 Exhibit, #243 Exhibit, #251 Exhibit, #224 Exhibit, #222 Exhibit, #233 Exhibit, #264 Exhibit, #237 Exhibit, #227 Exhibit, #220 Exhibit, #226 Exhibit, #216 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
December 17, 2018 Filing 318 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #280 Exhibit filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (McNab, William)
December 13, 2018 Filing 317 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waiver filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 316 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #312 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 315 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel re #314 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 314 MEMORANDUM in Support re #312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waiver filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 313 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waiver : Date and time to be determined. (Gudmundson, Brian)
December 13, 2018 Filing 312 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyto Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waiver filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Gudmundson, Brian)
December 12, 2018 Filing 311 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #232 Exhibit, #243 Exhibit, #251 Exhibit, #224 Exhibit, #222 Exhibit, #233 Exhibit, #264 Exhibit, #237 Exhibit, #227 Exhibit, #220 Exhibit, #226 Exhibit, #216 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #253 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #236 Exhibit, #235 Exhibit, #242 Exhibit, #225 Exhibit, #248 Exhibit, #221 Exhibit, #250 Exhibit, #239 Exhibit, #223 Exhibit, #238 Exhibit, #244 Exhibit, #234 Exhibit, #240 Exhibit, #241 Exhibit, #229 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #261 Exhibit, #245 Exhibit, #266 Exhibit, #263 Exhibit, #249 Exhibit, #219 Exhibit, #265 Exhibit, #247 Exhibit, #246 Exhibit filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Gudmundson, Brian)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER GRANTING CONSOLIDATION OF FEDERAL DERIVATIVE ACTIONS #307 . The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. The Federal Derivative Actions (Civil File Nos. 18-2460, 18-2833, 18-2834, and 18-2835) are hereby consolidated for all purposes in the above-captioned MDL, including pretrial proceedings, trial, and appeal, and are referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action." 2. Within thirty (30) days of the date of entry of this Order, any plaintiff in the Consolidated Action moving for lead counsel appointment shall file an application for lead counsel with appropriate support in the form and substance as required by the Court's rules. 3. Within fifteen (15) days of the date by which any plaintiff in the Consolidated Action files an application for appointment as lead counsel, the parties in the Consolidated Action shall file reply brief(s) if desired in the form and substance as required by the Court's rules. 4. This Order consolidating the Federal Derivative Actions shall apply to each action arising out of the same transactions and occurrences and asserting derivative claims filed in this Court or transferred here. Unless otherwise ordered, the terms of all orders, rulings, and decisions in the Consolidated Action shall apply to all later shareholder derivative actions instituted herein. 5. No Defendant shall have any obligation to respond to any of the complaints in the Federal Derivative Actions until such time as the parties agree and/or the Court orders. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/4/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-02460-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-02833-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-02834-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-02835-MJD-KMM(GRR)
December 3, 2018 Filing 309 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Lindsey C. Herzik (Aguilar, George)
November 27, 2018 Filing 308 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #307 Stipulation,. (Fistel, Michael)
November 27, 2018 Filing 307 STIPULATION to Consolidate Federal Derivative Actions by Neil T S Flanders. Jointly Signed by Tim Ault, Michael Barbree, Glen Walker, Sona Andresian, Edward Tansey, CenturyLink, Inc., Sunit S. Patel, David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., Jeffrey K. Storey, Laurie A. Siegel, Glen F. Post III, Harvey P. Perry, Mary L. Landrieu, W. Bruce Hanks, Michael Glenn, Steven T. Clontz, Peter C. Brown, Virginia Boulet, Martha H. Bejar, Michael J. Roberts, and Kevin P. Chilton. (Fistel, Michael)
November 21, 2018 Filing 306 Reply to Response to Motion re #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery Reply Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Defendants Affiliates Motion To Intervene For The Limited Purposes Of Moving To Compel Arbitration And Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fairless, Carolyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 305 Reply to Response to Motion re #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) Reply Memorandum In Support Of Its Alternative Motion To Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fairless, Carolyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 304 DECLARATION of Carolyn J. Fairless re #134 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery by CenturyLink, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Kiran Seshagiri with exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Responses to Written Questions, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Declaration of Brittany Myers, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Decl. of McKenzie, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Oregon PUC Report, #6 Exhibit(s) F - Felz Tr., #7 Exhibit(s) G - CTL Interogatory Responses, #8 Exhibit(s) H - Follow-up Responses to Written Questions, #9 Exhibit(s) I - Decl. of Dyani Galligan, #10 Exhibit(s) J - Anderson Tr., #11 Exhibit(s) K - Bornholdt Tr._Redacted, #12 Exhibit(s) L - Chavez Tr., #13 Exhibit(s) M - Dahib Tr., #14 Exhibit(s) N - Dodge Tr., #15 Exhibit(s) O - Faulkner Tr., #16 Exhibit(s) P - Fournier Tr., #17 Exhibit(s) Q - Garten Tr., #18 Exhibit(s) R - Glodowski Tr._Redacted, #19 Exhibit(s) S - Jeske Tr., #20 Exhibit(s) T - Landahl Tr., #21 Exhibit(s) U - Lavelle-Register Tr., #22 Exhibit(s) V - Lawhead Tr., #23 Exhibit(s) W - Lodestein Tr._Redacted, #24 Exhibit(s) X - Lucero Tr., #25 Exhibit(s) Y - Marchese Tr., #26 Exhibit(s) Z -Marino Tr., #27 Exhibit(s) AA - Ochoa Tr., #28 Exhibit(s) BB - Raymond Tr., #29 Exhibit(s) CC - Richman Tr., #30 Exhibit(s) DD - Rocha Tr., #31 Exhibit(s) EE - Scott-Decker Tr., #32 Exhibit(s) FF - Tyler Tr., #33 Exhibit(s) GG - Young-Buck Tr., #34 Exhibit(s) HH - Customer Bills, #35 Exhibit(s) II - Discovery Letter)(Fairless, Carolyn)
November 21, 2018 Filing 303 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers #131 Proposed Order to Judge,. (Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 302 Declaration of Stacey Bales in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 301 Declaration of Charles Dawson in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-7)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 300 Declaration of Richard Symbal in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 299 Declaration of Kenneth Vicknair Jr. in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-10)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 298 Second Declaration of Dyani Galligan in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 297 Second Declaration of Travis Beard in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 296 Second Declaration of Douglas P. Lobel in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-25, #3 Exhibit(s) 26-54)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2018 Filing 295 REPLY re #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER REGARDING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE #292 OF PLAINTIFFS 528 SUSHI AND ASIAN CUISINE, BUNNIE CLAYTON, PETER DENNISTON, MICHAEL MAGUIRE AND SUSAN REMMELE. NOW THEREFORE, in light of the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this request is GRANTED. The Court hereby orders: 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Withdrawing Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant shall be dismissed without prejudice; 2. As the Court has not yet certified a class in this matter, the notice and approval requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e) do not apply; and 3. The Parties shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees incurred directly with respect to the Withdrawing Plaintiffs' claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/20/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
November 15, 2018 Filing 293 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #292 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Gudmundson, Brian)
November 15, 2018 Filing 292 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice of Plaintiffs 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Bunnie Clayton, Peter J. Denniston, Michael Maguire, and Susan Remmele by 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Bunnie Clayton, Peter J. Denniston, Michael Maguire, Susan Remmele. Jointly Signed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Gudmundson, Brian)
November 9, 2018 Filing 291 Declaration of Patrick Gibbs in Support of #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 28 - 2016 1Q, #2 Exhibit(s) 29 - 4Q13 Earnings Presentation, #3 Exhibit(s) 30 - 4Q15 Earnings Presentation, #4 Exhibit(s) 31 - 4Q17 Earnings Presentation, #5 Exhibit(s) 32 - Prospectus 425 re Douglas, #6 Exhibit(s) 33 - Analyst.Investor Day June 24, 2015 Call Presentation, #7 Exhibit(s) 34 - Graph Comparison)(Gibbs, Patrick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 290 MEMORANDUM in Support re #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Securities Class Action Complaint filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gibbs, Patrick)
October 31, 2018 Filing 289 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery, #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Lobel, Douglas)
October 15, 2018 Filing 288 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Marcussen, Carin)
October 12, 2018 Filing 287 DECLARATION of Michael D. Blatchley in Opposition to #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Oregon, Fernando Alberto Vildosola. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Blatchley, Michael)
October 12, 2018 Filing 286 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by State of Oregon, Fernando Alberto Vildosola. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 285 JPML TRANSFER ORDER (kt)
September 5, 2018 Filing 284 EXHIBIT PL-ARB-O (Declaration of Ben Jeske - Executed) re #257 Exhibit, #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
September 1, 2018 Filing 283 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Lauren)
September 1, 2018 Filing 282 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #276 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett.(Lee, Lauren)
September 1, 2018 Filing 281 Redacted Document for #280 Sealed Exhibit 26 filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett.(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 1, 2018 Filing 280 SEALED EXHIBIT 26 re #279 Declaration in Support, filed by CenturyLink, Inc., Glen F. Post, III, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr., David D. Cole, Karen Puckett, Dean J. Douglas, and G. Clay Bailey.(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 1, 2018 Filing 279 Declaration of Patrick Gibbs in Support of #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2013, filed on February 27, 2014 with the Securities Exchange Commission (SEC), #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2014, filed on February 24, 2015 with the SEC, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2015, filed on February 25, 2016 with the SEC, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2016 filed on February 23, 2017 with the SEC, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-K for the fiscal year ending on December 31, 2017, filed on March 1, 2018 with the SEC, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2013, filed on May 10, 2013 with the SEC, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2013, filed on August 8, 2013 with the SEC, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2013, filed on November 8, 2013 with the SEC, #9 Exhibit(s) 9 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2014, filed on May 9, 2014 with the SEC, #10 Exhibit(s) 10 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2014, filed on August 7, 2014 with the SEC, #11 Exhibit(s) 11 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2014, filed on November 6, 2014 with the SEC, #12 Exhibit(s) 12 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2015, filed on May 6, 2015 with the SEC, #13 Exhibit(s) 13 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2015, filed on August 6, 2015 with the SEC, #14 Exhibit(s) 14 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2015, filed on November 5, 2015 with the SEC, #15 Exhibit(s) 15 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2016, filed on May 5, 2016 with the SEC, #16 Exhibit(s) 16 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2016, filed on August 4, 2016 with the SEC, #17 Exhibit(s) 17 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2016, filed on November 4, 2016 with the SEC, #18 Exhibit(s) 18 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on March 31, 2017, filed on May 5, 2017 with the SEC, #19 Exhibit(s) 19 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on June 30, 2017, filed on August 7, 2017 with the SEC, #20 Exhibit(s) 20 - An excerpt of CenturyLinks Form 10-Q for the quarterly period ending on September 30, 2017, filed on November 9, 2017 with the SEC, #21 Exhibit(s) 21 - CenturyLinks Code of Conduct,, #22 Exhibit(s) 22 - Heidi Heiser Complaint filed in Heiser v. CenturyLink, Inc., No. CV2017-008928 (Maricopa Cty. Super. Ct.), #23 Exhibit(s) 23 - Bloomberg publication by Mosendz and Moritz titled CenturyLink Is Accused of Running a Wells Fargo-Like Scheme, dated June 16, 2017, #24 Exhibit(s) 24 - Assurance of Discontinuance and Approval for In the Matter of Qwest Corporation, d/b/a/ CenturyLink QC, No. CV2016-002842 (Maricopa Cty. Super. Ct. Apr. 4, 2016), #25 Exhibit(s) 25 - Public Utilities Commission of the State of California Revised General Order 168 titled Market Rules to Empower Telecommunications Consumers and to Prevent Fraud (Decision 06-03-013 in Rulemaking 00-02-004), #26 Exhibit(s) 27 - Summary Exhibit identifying all challenged statements in Plaintiffs Consolidated Securities Action Complaint, filed on June 26, 2018 (Docket No. 143))(Gibbs, Patrick)
September 1, 2018 Filing 278 MEMORANDUM in Support re #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gibbs, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 277 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #276 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 276 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 30, 2018 Filing 275 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED INTO INDIVIDUAL CASE. NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren G Lee on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Lee, Lauren) Modified text on 9/10/2018 (lmb).
August 29, 2018 Filing 274 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on August 20, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (42 pages). Transcriber: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 9/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2018. (CRB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 273 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
August 28, 2018 Filing 272 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E Gibbs on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 28, 2018 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Lightdale on behalf of G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (Lightdale, Sarah)
August 24, 2018 Filing 270 (Text-only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. The Motion Hearing scheduled for November 14, 2018 on the Motion to Compel Arbitration, Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Intervene has been stricken from the Court Calendar. A new date shall be rescheduled in the future. (KMW)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER GRANTING CONSENT OTION FOR EXTENSION OF THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EXPANSTION OF WORD COUNT LIMIT on (147 in 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/23/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM(KMW)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER in Response to (211 in 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM) Letter to District Judge.Defendants and Proposed Intervenors' Motion is GRANTED and the deadline forDefendant and Proposed Intervenors to file their Reply briefs on the Motion to Intervene, the Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers, and the Alternative Motion to Dismiss is extended from October 23, 2018, to November 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/23/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
August 24, 2018 Filing 267 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #264 , #266 , #263 , #265 Statement of Confidentiality filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 266 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-ARB-TT re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 265 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-ARB-SS re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 264 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-ARB-RR re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 263 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-ARB-QQ re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 262 Redacted Document for #261 Redacted PL-ARB-K filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 261 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-ARB-K re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 260 EXHIBIT PL-ARB-MM to PL-ARB-PP, PL-ARB-UU re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 259 EXHIBIT PL-ARB-HH to PL-ARB-LL re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 258 EXHIBIT PL-ARB-AA to PL-ARB-GG re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 257 EXHIBIT PL-ARB-M to PL-ARB-Z re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 256 EXHIBIT PL-ARB-A to PL-ARB-J, PL-ARB-L re #255 Declaration in Opposition filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 24, 2018 Filing 255 DECLARATION of James F. McDonough in Opposition to #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 254 Redacted Document for #253 Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant And Proposed Intervenors Motion To Compel Arbitration And Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 253 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 252 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #232 , #243 , #251 , #233 , #237 , #236 , #235 , #242 , #248 , #250 , #239 , #238 , #244 , #234 , #240 , #241 , #245 , #249 , #246 , #247 Statement of Confidentiality filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 251 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-J re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 250 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-II re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 249 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-DD re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 248 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-CC re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 247 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-BB re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 246 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-AA re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 245 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-Z re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 244 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-Y re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 243 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-X re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 242 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-W re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 241 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-V re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 240 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-U re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 239 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-T re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 238 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-R re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 237 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-Q re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 236 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-P re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 235 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-M re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 234 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-L re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 233 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-K re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 232 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTD-F re #231 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Brian C. Gudmundson in Opposition to #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-A, #2 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-B, #3 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-C, #4 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-D, #5 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-E, #6 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-G, #7 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-H, #8 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-I, #9 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-N, #10 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-O, #11 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-S, #12 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-EE, #13 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-FF, #14 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-GG, #15 Exhibit(s) PL-MTD-HH)(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 229 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gudmundson, Brian)
August 23, 2018 Filing 228 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #224 , #222 , #221 , #223 , #227 , #220 , #226 , #219 , #225 Sealed Exs. PL-MTI-C, PL-MTI-D, PL-MTI-F, PL-MTI-G, PL-MTI-H, PL-MTI-I, PL-MTI-J, PL-MTI-K filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 227 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-D re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 226 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-P re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 225 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-K re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 224 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-J re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 223 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-I re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 222 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-H re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 221 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-G re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 220 SEALED EXHIBIT PL-MTI-F re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 219 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit PL-MTI-C re #218 Declaration in Opposition,, filed by Plaintiffs.(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 218 DECLARATION of Anne T. Regan in Opposition to #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-A, #2 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-B, #3 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-E, #4 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-L, #5 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-M, #6 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-N, #7 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-O, #8 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-Q, #9 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-R, #10 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-S, #11 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-T, #12 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-U, #13 Exhibit(s) PL-MTI-V)(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 217 Redacted Document for #216 Memorandum of Law In Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Lead Counsel.(Regan, Anne) Modified text on 8/24/2018 (MMP).
August 23, 2018 Filing 216 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Regan, Anne)
August 23, 2018 Filing 215 REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (McNab, William)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER in response to informal discovery dispute concerning Plaintiffs' responses to requests for admissions. See Order for details. (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/22/2018. (BJP)
August 22, 2018 Filing 212 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #211 Letter to District Judge. (Lobel, Douglas)
August 22, 2018 Filing 211 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by CenturyLink, Inc. for One-Month Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs in Support of Pending Motions. (Lobel, Douglas)
August 20, 2018 Filing 214 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 8/20/2018. (KAT)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER in Response to Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits #208 (in 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM). It is so Ordered: 1. That the word limits be enlarged to 18,000 words per side for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant and Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Compel Arbitration [Dkt. 122], and for Defendant and the Proposed Intervenor' combined opening and reply memoranda in support thereof; 2.That the word limits be enlarged to 15,000 words per side for Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss #132 , and for Defendant's combined opening and reply memoranda in support thereof; and 3. That the Proposed Intervenors be permitted to file a reply memorandum in support of their Motion to Intervene [Dkt. 80]. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 8/20/2018. Associated Cases: 17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
August 17, 2018 Filing 209 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #208 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 17, 2018 Filing 208 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Gudmundson, Brian)
August 16, 2018 Filing 207 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney - George Edward Anhang and Lyle Roberts (Gibbs, Patrick)
August 6, 2018 Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of Oregon for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #186 Telephone Conference to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Blatchley, Michael)
August 6, 2018 Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 07/23/18 before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (28 pages). Transcriber: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (MVW)
August 6, 2018 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 071118 before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (28 pages). Transcriber: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (MVW)
August 6, 2018 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 07/06/18 before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (44 pages). Transcriber: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 8/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2018. (MVW)
August 6, 2018 Filing 202 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 3 transcript(s) associated with it. (MVW)
July 25, 2018 Filing 201 NOTICE of Appearance for Charles Hodge on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Langley, Timothy) Modified textg on 7/27/2018 (lmb).
July 25, 2018 Filing 200 STIPULATION of Lead Counsel regarding MDL Transcripts Intended to be Placed on Court's External Website by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Jointly Signed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Gudmundson, Brian)
July 24, 2018 Filing 197 REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (McNab, William)
July 24, 2018 Filing 196 REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (Blatchley, Michael)
July 24, 2018 Filing 195 REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (McNab, William)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER re #191 Letter to Magistrate Judge. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/24/2018. (BJP) Modified text on 7/26/2018 (ACH). cc: Charles Hodge
July 23, 2018 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 7/23/2018. Order to be issued. (KAT)
July 23, 2018 Filing 191 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel . (Gudmundson, Brian)
July 20, 2018 Filing 190 REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (Blatchley, Michael)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference set for 7/23/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/20/2018. (KAT) cc: Charles J. Hodge. Modified text on 7/24/2018 (MMG).
July 11, 2018 Filing 188 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 7/11/2018. (KAT)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER in Response to #184 Letter to Magistrate Judge, #185 Letter to Magistrate Judge regarding discovery dispute. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/9/2018. (BJP)
July 6, 2018 Filing 186 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 7/6/2018. Order to be issued. (KAT)
July 2, 2018 Filing 185 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by CenturyLink, Inc. . (Lobel, Douglas)
June 29, 2018 Filing 184 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - A)(Gudmundson, Brian)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Telephone Discovery Dispute Conference set for 7/6/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Plaintiffs shall file letter brief no later than 6/29/18 and Defendant shall file letter brief no later than 7/2/18. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/29/2018. (KAT)
June 26, 2018 Filing 182 Summons Issued as to G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (lmb)
June 26, 2018 Filing 181 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. Summons Issued as to G. Clay Bailey, CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, Dean J. Douglas, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, Karen Puckett. (lmb) Modified text on 6/26/2018 (lmb).
June 25, 2018 Filing 180 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated Complaint) against CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III, G. Clay Bailey, Karen Puckett, Dean J. Douglas. filed by State of Oregon, Fernando Alberto Vildosola. Filer requests summons issued. (Blatchley, Michael)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE CIVIL CASE: Kramer v. CenturyLink Inc. (17-5001) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/20/2018. (KMW)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR THE CONSOLIDATED SECURITIES ACTION. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 6/13/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00297-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00298-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00299-MJD-KMM(KMW)
June 8, 2018 Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6-4-2018 before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (89 pages). Court Reporter: Renee Rogge. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 6/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2018. (RAR) cc: NEF to Charles J. Hodge. Modified on 6/11/2018 (lmb).
June 8, 2018 Filing 176 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RAR) cc: Charles J. Hodge. Modified on 6/11/2018 (lmb).
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #158 Motion to Compel(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/7/2018. (BJP)
June 7, 2018 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of Oregon for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #171 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Blatchley, Michael)
June 5, 2018 Filing 173 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) (kt)
June 5, 2018 Filing 172 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CenturyLink, Inc. for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #171 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (McNab, William)
June 4, 2018 Filing 171 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2018 re #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (BJP) Modified hearing date on 6/6/2018 (lmb). Modified filed date on 9/6/2018 (LEG).
May 31, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Paul Srodoski on behalf of Peter J. Denniston. (Srodoski, Michael)
May 30, 2018 Filing 169 DECLARATION of Douglas P. Lobel in Opposition to #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas)
May 30, 2018 Filing 168 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
May 30, 2018 Filing 167 DECLARATION of Douglas P. Lobel in Opposition to #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Lobel, Douglas)
May 30, 2018 Filing 166 DECLARATION of Steven J. Olson in Opposition to #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Lobel, Douglas)
May 30, 2018 Filing 165 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
May 25, 2018 Filing 164 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery, #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers : Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW)
May 23, 2018 Filing 163 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
May 23, 2018 Filing 162 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #158 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel.(Gudmundson, Brian)
May 23, 2018 Filing 161 Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson in Support of #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Gudmundson, Brian)
May 23, 2018 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Support re #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gudmundson, Brian)
May 23, 2018 Filing 159 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2018 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Gudmundson, Brian)
May 23, 2018 Filing 158 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Gudmundson, Brian)
May 22, 2018 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryce Daniel Riddle on behalf of 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Luke Roger Allison, Michael Anderson, Ralph Aragon, Spencer Berggren, Andrea Bornholdt, Brent Lee LLC, Francisco J. Carrillo, Jocelyn Carrillo, Anthony Chavez, Bunnie Clayton, Jean Clayton, Tajuana Dahib, Peter J. Denniston, Deen Dodge, Elizabeth Faulkner, Sue Ann Fitch, Donald Fournier, James T. Fowler, David H. Garten, Bob Glodowski, Heather Gonsior, Gulf Coast Attorneys LLC, Mandi Hanifen, Ben Jeske, Anthony Kramer, Jeff Landahl, Laurie A. Raymond, Attorney at Law, Rebecca Lavelle-Register, Jubilee Lawhead, Jon Lodestein, Richard Lucero, Michael Maguire, Jason Malueg, Robert Marchese, Bonnie Marino, Steven L. McCauley, Craig McLeod, Susan Miller, Kathryn O'Donnell, Maria Ochoa, Katherine Parkes, Susan Remmele, Hollie Richman, Rebeca Rocha, Pamela Romero, Victor Romero, Christina Scott, Rod Stucker, Deanne Tyler, Ed Weigt, Anna M. Williams, Sara Young-Buck. (Riddle, Bryce)
May 16, 2018 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Roxanne Barton Conlin on behalf of 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Luke Roger Allison, Ralph Aragon, Spencer Berggren, Andrea Bornholdt, Brent Lee LLC, Francisco J. Carrillo, Jocelyn Carrillo, Anthony Chavez, Bunnie Clayton, Jean Clayton, Tajuana Dahib, Peter J. Denniston, Deen Dodge, Does, John Does(1-100), Does 1 through 50, Does 1-50, Elizabeth Faulkner, Sue Ann Fitch, Donald Fournier, James T. Fowler, David H. Garten, Bob Glodowski, Heather Gonsior, Gulf Coast Attorneys LLC, Mandi Hanifen, Ben Jeske, Jeff Landahl, Laurie A. Raymond, Attorney at Law, Rebecca Lavelle-Register, Jubilee Lawhead, Jon Lodestein, Richard Lucero, Michael Maguire, Jason Malueg, Robert Marchese, Bonnie Marino, Steven L. McCauley, Craig McLeod, Susan Miller, Kathryn O'Donnell, Maria Ochoa, Katherine Parkes, Susan Remmele, Hollie Richman, Rebeca Rocha, Pamela Romero, Victor Romero, Christina Scott, Rod Stucker, Deanne Tyler, Ed Weigt, Anna M. Williams, Sara Young-Buck. (Conlin, Roxanne)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 155 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4: SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/15/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
May 15, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Langley on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Langley, Timothy)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/15/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00297-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00298-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00299-MJD-KMM(KMW)
May 15, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (McNab, William)
May 11, 2018 Filing 151 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Joint Case Management Order For the Consolidated Securities Action #115 Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Blatchley, Michael)
May 10, 2018 Filing 150 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Scheduling. (Gudmundson, Brian)
May 9, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Hillary Reese on behalf of 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Luke Roger Allison, Ralph Aragon, Spencer Berggren, Andrea Bornholdt, Brent Lee LLC, Francisco J. Carrillo, Jocelyn Carrillo, Anthony Chavez, Bunnie Clayton, Jean Clayton, Tajuana Dahib, Peter J. Denniston, Deen Dodge, Does, John Does(1-100), Does 1 through 50, Does 1-50, Elizabeth Faulkner, Sue Ann Fitch, Donald Fournier, James T. Fowler, David H. Garten, Bob Glodowski, Heather Gonsior, Gulf Coast Attorneys LLC, Mandi Hanifen, Ben Jeske, Jeff Landahl, Laurie A. Raymond, Attorney at Law, Rebecca Lavelle-Register, Jubilee Lawhead, Jon Lodestein, Richard Lucero, Michael Maguire, Jason Malueg, Robert Marchese, Bonnie Marino, Steven L. McCauley, Craig McLeod, Susan Miller, Kathryn O'Donnell, Maria Ochoa, Katherine Parkes, Susan Remmele, Hollie Richman, Rebeca Rocha, Pamela Romero, Victor Romero, Christina Scott, Rod Stucker, Deanne Tyler, Ed Weigt, Anna M. Williams, Sara Young-Buck. (Reese, Caitlin)
May 9, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Channa Lloyd on behalf of 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Luke Roger Allison, Ralph Aragon, Spencer Berggren, Andrea Bornholdt, Brent Lee LLC, Francisco J. Carrillo, Jocelyn Carrillo, Anthony Chavez, Bunnie Clayton, Jean Clayton, Tajuana Dahib, Peter J. Denniston, Deen Dodge, Does, John Does(1-100), Does 1 through 50, Does 1-50, Elizabeth Faulkner, Sue Ann Fitch, Donald Fournier, James T. Fowler, David H. Garten, Bob Glodowski, Heather Gonsior, Gulf Coast Attorneys LLC, Mandi Hanifen, Ben Jeske, Jeff Landahl, Laurie A. Raymond, Attorney at Law, Rebecca Lavelle-Register, Jubilee Lawhead, Jon Lodestein, Richard Lucero, Michael Maguire, Jason Malueg, Robert Marchese, Bonnie Marino, Steven L. McCauley, Craig McLeod, Susan Miller, Kathryn O'Donnell, Maria Ochoa, Katherine Parkes, Susan Remmele, Hollie Richman, Rebeca Rocha, Pamela Romero, Victor Romero, Christina Scott, Rod Stucker, Deanne Tyler, Ed Weigt, Anna M. Williams, Sara Young-Buck. (Lloyd, Channa)
May 9, 2018 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa Joy Flood on behalf of 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Luke Roger Allison, Ralph Aragon, Spencer Berggren, Andrea Bornholdt, Brent Lee LLC, Francisco J. Carrillo, Jocelyn Carrillo, Anthony Chavez, Bunnie Clayton, Jean Clayton, Tajuana Dahib, Peter J. Denniston, Deen Dodge, Does, John Does(1-100), Does 1 through 50, Does 1-50, Elizabeth Faulkner, Sue Ann Fitch, Donald Fournier, James T. Fowler, David H. Garten, Bob Glodowski, Heather Gonsior, Gulf Coast Attorneys LLC, Mandi Hanifen, Ben Jeske, Jeff Landahl, Laurie A. Raymond, Attorney at Law, Rebecca Lavelle-Register, Jubilee Lawhead, Jon Lodestein, Richard Lucero, Michael Maguire, Jason Malueg, Robert Marchese, Bonnie Marino, Steven L. McCauley, Craig McLeod, Susan Miller, Kathryn O'Donnell, Maria Ochoa, Katherine Parkes, Susan Remmele, Hollie Richman, Rebeca Rocha, Pamela Romero, Victor Romero, Christina Scott, Rod Stucker, Deanne Tyler, Ed Weigt, Anna M. Williams, Sara Young-Buck. (Flood, Alyssa)
May 8, 2018 Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #143 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (JGK)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant's Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers (MDL #87 ) is GRANTED. 2. Plaintiffs may conduct reasonable discovery specifically directed to their assertion that their claims are not subject to mandatory arbitration and class-action waivers. Additionally, Plaintiffs may conduct reasonable discovery related to CenturyLink's Alternative Motion to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), and, as the Court has previously ordered, Plaintiffs may conduct reasonable discovery specifically directed to the Motion to Intervene. All motions regarding discovery disputes related to this paragraph, Paragraph 2, shall be submitted to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. 3. In all other respects, discovery in this case is stayed until the Court rules on CenturyLinks Motion to Compel Arbitration. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/8/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
May 8, 2018 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of Oregon for a COPY OF #143 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (Blatchley, Michael)
May 4, 2018 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/2/2018 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (51 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 5/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2018. (SAH)
May 4, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (SAH)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EFFECT OF CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND UNDERLYING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
May 2, 2018 Filing 140 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CenturyLink, Inc. for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #139 Motion Hearing,,, to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (McNab, William)
May 2, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #138 Order: This document was filed in error. (ACH)
May 2, 2018 Filing 139 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2018 re #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by CenturyLink, Inc., #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, Qwest Corporation, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC. Motion was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (KMW)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING EFFECT OF CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND UNDERLYING ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR) Modified on 5/2/2018 (AKL).
April 28, 2018 Filing 137 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 136 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #132 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 135 Declaration of Kiran Seshagiri in Support of #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas) Modified on 4/30/2018 (lmb).
April 28, 2018 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM in Support re #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) : at date and time to be determined. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 132 MOTION to Dismiss/General - Defendant's Alternative Motion to Dismiss Under Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 131 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 130 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #122 Motion to Compel, filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 129 Declaration of Douglas Lobel in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 128 Declaration of Kimberly Irenze in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 127 Declaration of Kiran Seshagiri in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas) Modified on 4/30/2018 (lmb).
April 28, 2018 Filing 126 Declaration of Dyani Galligan in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-9)(Lobel, Douglas) Modified text on 4/30/2018 (lmb).
April 28, 2018 Filing 125 Declaration of Travis Beard in Support of #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4, #2 Exhibit(s) 5-6, #3 Exhibit(s) 7-8, #4 Exhibit(s) 9-11, #5 Exhibit(s) 12-15, #6 Exhibit(s) 16-48, #7 Exhibit(s) 49-72, #8 Exhibit(s) 73-85)(Lobel, Douglas) Modified text on 4/30/2018 (lmb).
April 28, 2018 Filing 124 MEMORANDUM in Support re #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers : at date and time to be determined. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 28, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 24, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE to Attorneys: Attached are the dial in instructions if you would like to listen to the Motion to Stay hearing on 5/2/18 at 10:30 a.m. (KMW)
April 23, 2018 Filing 120 DECLARATION of Brian C. Gudmundson in Opposition to #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Gudmundson, Brian)
April 23, 2018 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gudmundson, Brian)
April 23, 2018 Filing 118 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Scheduling. (Gudmundson, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Filing 117 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #116 Stipulation. (Gudmundson, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Filing 116 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Effect of Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Underlying Actions by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Jointly Signed by CenturyLink Inc.. (Gudmundson, Brian)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Motion of Lead Plaintiff Oregon for Consolidation of Related Action (MDL #53 ) is GRANTED. 2. Motion of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc. for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel (MDL #46 ) is DENIED. 3. Within three weeks of the date of this Order, Lead Plaintiff shall meet and confer with Defendant and shall submit a joint draft case management order, which shall include a proposed deadline for filing a consolidated complaint, for the parties' Rule 26(f) conference, and any other pertinent deadlines. The Court also directs Lead Plaintiff and Defendants to meet and confer with the leadership counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant in the CenturyLink sales cases to propose a date for the next joint status conference. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/20/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00296-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00297-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00298-MJD-KMM, 0:18-cv-00299-MJD-KMM(GRR)
April 20, 2018 Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/17/2018 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (26 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 5/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2018. (SAH)
April 20, 2018 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (64 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 5/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2018. (SAH)
April 19, 2018 Filing 112 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED-WILL REFILE. TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/17/2018 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (26 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 5/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2018. (SAH) Modified text on 4/19/2018 (lmb).
April 19, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (SAH)
April 19, 2018 Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by KBC Asset Management NV for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #107 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (Levin, Gregg)
April 17, 2018 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of Oregon for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #107 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (Blatchley, Michael)
April 17, 2018 Filing 108 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CenturyLink, Inc. for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #107 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (McNab, William)
April 17, 2018 Filing 107 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 4/17/2018 re #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc., #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon. Motions were moved, argued and preliminary ruling was made. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (KMW)
April 16, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE to Attorneys: For parties not planning to argue the pending motions before the Court on 4/17/18, you may dial into the conference bridge to listen to the hearing tomorrow at 11:00 a.m. Please find the attached instructions. (KMW)
April 11, 2018 Filing 105 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 4/5/2018 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (64 pages). Court Reporter: Staci Heichert. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 5/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2018. (SAH) Modified text on 4/19/2018 (lmb).
April 11, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (SAH)
April 10, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE by KBC Asset Management NV Notice of Withdrawal of KBC Asset Management NV's Lead Plaintiff Motion and its Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's October 20, 2017 Order (Cambronne, Karl)
April 10, 2018 Filing 102 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by State of Oregon for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #99 Status Conference to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (Blatchley, Michael)
April 10, 2018 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #99 Status Conference to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (Gudmundson, Brian)
April 6, 2018 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CenturyLink, Inc. for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #99 Status Conference to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (McNab, William)
April 5, 2018 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Status Conference held on 4/5/2018. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (KMW)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The opposition to Defendant's Affiliates' Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery #80 shall be filed on or before April 16, 2018. 2. The opposition to Defendant's Motion to Temporarily Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers #87 shall be filed on or before April 16, 2018. 3. Oral argument on both motions shall be heard on May 2, 2018, at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 13E of the United States Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/5/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
April 4, 2018 Filing 97 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 4, 2018 Filing 96 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 4/3/2018. (KMW)
April 3, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyLink, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (McNab, William)
April 2, 2018 Filing 93 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 92 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #87 Motion to Stay filed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 91 Declaration of Douglas P. Lobel in Support of #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 90 Declaration of Travis Beard in Support of #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 89 MEMORANDUM in Support re #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers : at date and time to be determined. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers filed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 86 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 85 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #80 Motion to Intervene,, filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation.(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 84 Declaration of Douglas P. Lobel in Support of #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 83 Declaration of Kiran Seshagiri in Support of #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Support re #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery : at date and time to be determined. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Moving to Compel Arbitration and Enforce Class-Action Waivers and to Join in Defendant CenturyLink, Inc.'s Motion for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Qwest Broadband Services, Inc., Qwest Corporation. (Lobel, Douglas)
April 2, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas P Lobel on behalf of Qwest Corporation, Embarq Florida, Inc., Embarq Missouri, Inc., Carolina Telephone and Telegraph Company LLC, Central Telephone Company, CenturyTel of Idaho, Inc., CenturyTel of Larsen-Readfield, LLC, CenturyTel of Washington, Inc., CenturyTel Broadband Services, LLC, Qwest Broadband Services, Inc. (Lobel, Douglas) Modified text on 4/3/2018 (lmb).
March 30, 2018 Filing 78 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Jointly Signed by CenturyLink, Inc..(Gudmundson, Brian)
March 29, 2018 Filing 77 (Text-only) NOTICE to Attorneys: Rule 26 Meeting Report shall be due by 3/30/2018 (parties may have an extra day to complete). (KMW)
March 28, 2018 Filing 76 EXHIBIT List re #75 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Affidavit of Michael D. Blatchley, #3 Exhibit(s) A - KBC's General Motors Brief, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Maricopa County Docket Report, #5 Exhibit(s) C - CTL Stock Price Chart, #6 Exhibit(s) D - S.A.C. Capital LP Order)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 27, 2018 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM in Support re #74 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyin Response to KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal Reply filed by State of Oregon. EXHIBIT DOCUMENTS FILED IN ERROR // (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Proposed Sur-Reply, #3 Proposed Affidavit of Michael D. Blatchley, #4 Exhibit(s) A - KBC's General Motors Brief, #5 Exhibit(s) B - Maricopa County Docket Report, #6 Exhibit(s) C - CTL Stock Price Chart, #7 Exhibit(s) D - S.A.C. Capital LP Order)(Blatchley, Michael) Modified text on 3/28/2018 (LPH).
March 27, 2018 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreplyin Response to KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal Reply filed by State of Oregon. (Blatchley, Michael)
March 23, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin Schenker on behalf of CenturyLink, Inc.. (Schenker, Martin)
March 23, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE to Attorneys. The Court is providing a conference call bridge for the status conference scheduled for 4/5/18 at 10:30 a.m. (Central Time). The Court would like to know ahead of time who will be joining the phone call and who will be coming to the hearing in person. Please e-mail the chambers emailbox at davis_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov if you plan to attend via phone conference or in person. We want to know the names of all participants so please list them in the e-mail if you are sending the confirmation for multiple attorneys. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW)
March 21, 2018 Filing 71 REPLY in Further Support of KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's October 20, 2017 Order re #45 Memorandum, filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cambronne, Karl) Modified text on 3/21/2018 (lmb).
March 20, 2018 Filing 70 DECLARATION of Karl L. Cambronne re #69 Reply, by KBC Asset Management NV . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Cambronne, Karl)
March 20, 2018 Filing 69 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED - REPLY re #45 Memorandum, Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's October 20, 2017 Order filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cambronne, Karl) Modified on 3/21/2018 (KNK).
March 20, 2018 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Michael D. Blatchley in SUPPORT OF #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Teamsters Local 445 Freight Division Pension Fund ECF No. 30, #2 Exhibit(s) B - In re Select Comfort Corp. Securities Litigation ECF No. 16)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 20, 2018 Filing 67 REPLY re #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 20, 2018 Filing 66 REPLY re #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Certificate of Service)(Federman, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Oregon's Memorandum Of Law In Opposition To IMG's Motion For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #63 Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Pio v. General Motors, ECF No. 20)(Blatchley, Michael) Modified text on 3/14/2018 (lmb).
March 13, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE re #45 Memorandum, Oregon's Memorandum Of Law In Response To KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 13, 2018 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cambronne, Karl)
March 13, 2018 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of William B. Federman in OPPOSITION TO #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Press Release, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Press Release, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Press Release, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - OR Loss Analysis, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Press Release)(Federman, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Federman, William)
March 12, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Lightdale on behalf of CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III. (Lightdale, Sarah)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER No. 2. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/7/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW) cc: Christopher Boyce Hood. Modified on 3/7/2018 (lmb).
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER based upon the stipulation of the parties [Doc. #42 in 17-md-2795]. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 3/6/2018. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW) cc: Christopher Boyce Hood. Modified on 3/7/2018 (lmb).
March 5, 2018 Filing 56 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon.(Blatchley, Michael)
March 5, 2018 Filing 55 AFFIDAVIT of Michael D. Blatchley in SUPPORT OF #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - IMG Notice)(Blatchley, Michael) Modified on 3/6/2018 (AKL).
March 5, 2018 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Support re #53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Blatchley, Michael)
March 5, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by State of Oregon. (Blatchley, Michael)
March 2, 2018 Filing 52 Proposed Order to Judge re #50 Memorandum, filed by State of Oregon. (Blatchley, Michael) Modified text on 3/2/2018 (ACH).
March 1, 2018 Filing 51 EXHIBIT List re #45 Memorandum, filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Cambronne, Karl) Modified text on 3/2/2018 (lmb).
February 27, 2018 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of the Motion of Lead Plaintiff Oregon for Consolidation of Related Action filed by State of Oregon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, ATTACHMENT/PROPOSED ORDER FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE SEPARATELY #2 Proposed Order). (Blatchley, Michael) Modified text on 3/2/2018 (lmb).
February 27, 2018 Filing 49 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc..(Federman, William)
February 27, 2018 Filing 48 AFFIDAVIT of William B. Federman in SUPPORT OF #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Certificate of Investment, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Loss Analysis, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit(s) E - Firm Resume)(Federman, William)
February 27, 2018 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Support re #46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc..(Federman, William) Modified text on 2/28/2018 (kt).
February 27, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Federman, William)
February 27, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM of Law in Further Support of KBC Asset Management NV's Appeal of the Magistrate Judge's October 20, 2017 Order filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, EXHIBITS ATTACHED IN ERROR. TO BE REFILED//#2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F)(Cambronne, Karl) Modified text on 3/1/2018 (ACH).
February 27, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Federman, William)
February 22, 2018 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #42 Stipulation. (Gudmundson, Brian)
February 22, 2018 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Jointly Signed by CenturyLink, Inc.. (Gudmundson, Brian)
February 21, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE by KBC Asset Management NV KBC's List of Affiliated Companies and Associated Counsel (Cambronne, Karl)
February 21, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTIONS. Motions Hearing is scheduled for 4/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 13E (MPLS) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW)
February 20, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by State of Oregon re #7 Order, OREGON'S LIST OF AFFILIATED COMPANIES AND ASSOCIATED COUNSEL (Blatchley, Michael)
February 15, 2018 Filing 38 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Bunnie Clayton, David H. Garten, Pamela Romero, Anthony Chavez, Luke Roger Allison, Jon Lodestein, Jubilee Lawhead, Peter J. Denniston, Richard Lucero, Bob Glodowski, Katherine Parkes, Jason Malueg, Hollie Richman, Tajuana Dahib, Rebeca Rocha, Rebecca Lavelle-Register, Elizabeth Faulkner, Laurie A. Raymond, Attorney at Law, Andrea Bornholdt, Michael Anderson, Maria Ochoa, Ben Jeske, Ed Weigt, Rod Stucker, Susan Remmele, Robert Marchese, Donald Fournier, Christina Scott, Deanne Tyler, Kathryn O'Donnell, Ralph Aragon, Sara Young-Buck, Jeff Landahl, 528 Sushi and Asian Cuisine LLC, Deen Dodge, Bonnie Marino, Sue Ann Fitch, Michael Maguire. No summons requested. (Anderson, Carolyn) Modified text on 2/16/2018 (kt).
February 15, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P Arnold on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV. (Arnold, Andrew)
February 12, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Browne on behalf of State of Oregon. (Browne, John)
February 8, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Scott Dubanevich, Timothy S. DeJong, Keil M. Mueller on behalf of State of Oregon. (Dubanevich, Keith) Modified text on 2/9/2018 (lmb).
February 8, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William Henry Narwold on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV. (Narwold, William)
February 8, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg S. Levin on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV. (Levin, Gregg)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO FILE UPDATED BRIEFS IN CASE 18-CV-296. Updated briefs in support of the Appeal of the Magistrate Judge Order #87 and Motion for Consolidation of Related Action #95 shall be filed by February 27, 2018. Updated opposition briefs shall be filed by March 13, 2018. Updated reply briefs shall be filed by March 20, 2018. The parties shall meet and confer regarding dates for oral argument and shall jointly propose several possible hearing dates to the Court. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/8/18. (KMW)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO FILE UPDATED BRIEFS IN 18-CV-299. Updated briefs in support of the Motion to Intervene #27 , Motion for Consolidation of Related Action #33 , and Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel #36 shall be filed by February 27, 2018. Updated opposition briefs shall be filed by March 13, 2018. Updated reply briefs shall be filed by March 20, 2018. The parties shall meet and confer regarding dates for oral argument and shall jointly propose several possible hearing dates to the Court.. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/8/18. (KMW)
February 6, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E Gibbs on behalf of CenturyLink, Inc., David D. Cole, R. Stewart Ewing, Jr, Glen F. Post, III. (Gibbs, Patrick)
February 6, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Carin L Marcussen on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Marcussen, Carin)
February 6, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Brooke Murphy on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Murphy, Amanda)
February 6, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart W Emmons on behalf of Inter-Marketing Group USA, Inc.. (Emmons, Stuart)
February 1, 2018 Filing 26 TRANSFER ORDER. (kt)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/4/18. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(GRR)
January 2, 2018 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 12/14/2017 before Judge Michael J. Davis. (39 pages). Court Reporter: Kristine Mousseau. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 1/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2018. (KM)
January 2, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (KM) cc: Christopher Boyce Hood. Modified on 1/2/2018 (lmb).
December 27, 2017 Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by In Re: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation for an Expedited Hourly Transcript (within 2 hours) of #19 Status Conference to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Gudmundson, Brian)
December 19, 2017 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CenturyLink Communications, LLC for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #19 Status Conference to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (McNab, William)
December 18, 2017 Filing 20 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by In Re: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #19 Status Conference to Court Reporter Staci Heichert. (Gudmundson, Brian) Modified text on 2/5/2018 (LEG).
December 14, 2017 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael J. Davis: Status Conference held on 12/14/2017. (Court Reporter Staci Heichert) (KMW)
December 7, 2017 Filing 18 BRIEF re #7 Order, - Defendants' [Proposed Draft] Initial Case Management Order Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 1. (Lobel, Douglas)
December 7, 2017 Filing 17 BRIEF re #7 Order, - Defendants' Brief Pursuant to Pretrial Order No. 1. (Lobel, Douglas)
December 7, 2017 Filing 16 BRIEF Plaintiffs' Scheduling and Discovery Plan Brief filed by In Re: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Plaintiffs' Proposed Initial Case Management Order)(Gudmundson, Brian)
December 6, 2017 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William A McNab on behalf of All Defendants. (McNab, William)
December 1, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE to Attorneys. The Status Conference Scheduled for 12/14/17 at 1:30 p.m. shall take place in Courtroom 15E (Chief Judge Tunheim's Courtroom) of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/1/17.
November 21, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE by Luke Roger Allison, Spencer Berggren, Brent Lee LLC, Francisco J. Carrillo, Jocelyn Carrillo, Anthony Chavez, Bunnie Clayton, Jean Clayton, James T. Fowler, David H. Garten, Heather Gonsior, Gulf Coast Attorneys LLC, Mandi Hanifen, Jubilee Lawhead, Richard Lucero, Steven L. McCauley, Craig McLeod, Susan Miller, Pamela Romero, Victor Romero, Anna M. Williams, Peter J. Denniston, Jon Lodestein OF PLAINTIFFS' LIST OF AFFILIATED COMPANIES AND ASSOCIATED COUNSEL (Anderson, Carolyn) Modified filers on 11/22/2017 (kt).
November 21, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE by CenturyLink, Inc. of Affiliated Companies and Counsel for Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Lobel, Douglas)
November 21, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE by Anthony Kramer Plaintiff's List of Affiliated Companies and Associated Counsel (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 20, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE to Attorneys. The Court is providing a conference call bridge for the status conference scheduled for 12/14/17 at 1:30 p.m. (Central Time). The Court would like to know ahead of time who will be joining the phone call and who will be coming to the hearing in person. Please e-mail the chambers emailbox at davis_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov if you plan to attend via phone conference or in person. We want to know the names of all participants so please list them in the e-mail if you are sending the confirmation for multiple attorneys. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW) cc: Christopher Boyce Hood. Modified on 11/20/2017 (lmb).
November 10, 2017 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE to Attorneys: The Status Conference scheduled for 11/30/17 has been rescheduled for 12/14/17 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 13E of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse. A conference bridge will be made available for parties to call into the status conference. Details will on the conference call information shall be made available in the near future. (KMW) cc: Christopher Boyce Hood. Modified on 11/13/2017 (lmb).
November 7, 2017 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) (kt)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER 1, The Court will hold an initial status conference in this matter on November 30, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 13E of the United States Courthouse, 300 South Fourth Street, Minneapolis, Minnesota. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 11/6/17. Associated Cases: 0:17-md-02795-MJD-KMM et al.(KMW) cc: Panel. (kt)
October 31, 2017 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) (kt)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER SUSPENDING ALL DEADLINES PENDING ENTRY OF OMNIBUS SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/16/17. (KMW)
October 11, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CenturyLink Communications, LLC, CenturyLink Public Communications, Inc., CenturyLink Sales Solutions, Inc., CenturyLink, Inc. re #2 Stipulation, #3 Proposed Order to Judge (Lobel, Douglas)
October 11, 2017 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #2 Stipulation. (Lobel, Douglas)
October 11, 2017 Filing 2 STIPULATION by Parties to Suspend All Deadlines Pending Entry of Omnibus Scheduling Order by CenturyLink Communications, LLC, CenturyLink Public Communications, Inc., CenturyLink Sales Solutions, Inc., CenturyLink, Inc.. (Lobel, Douglas)
October 10, 2017 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Distict of Minnesota are transferred to the District of Minnesota, creating MDL 2795. MDL 2795 assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis and referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (kt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: CenturyLink Sales Practices and Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant's Primary Outside Counsel
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: David A Vogel
Represented By: Douglas P Lobel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gutkin
Represented By: David M Aafedt
Represented By: William A McNab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In Re: CenturyLink Residential Customer Billing Disputes Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel
Represented By: James McDonough, III
Represented By: Benjamin Jared Meiselas
Represented By: Roxanne Barton Conlin
Represented By: Charles J. Hodge
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Represented By: Lori G. Feldman
Represented By: Mark J Geragos
Represented By: Mark M O'Mara
Represented By: Richard M. Hagstrom
Represented By: Carolyn G Anderson
Represented By: Michelle J Looby
Represented By: Francois Michel Blaudeau, MD
Represented By: Timothy R. Langley
Represented By: Hart L Robinovitch
Represented By: Brian C Gudmundson
Represented By: James F McDonough, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Ault
Represented By: Melissa A Fortunato
Represented By: Lawrence Paul Eagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?