Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Ziani et al

Plaintiff: Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc., Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. as Personal Representative of the Estate of Prince Rogers Nelson and Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Eric Ziani, Piet Van Ryckeghem, Marcel Peters, John 1-20 Does, Frederic Bianco, Doe 1, Does 4-20, Doe 3 and Doe 2
Case Number: 0:2018cv02556
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc. re #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Declaration in Support, #10 Meet and Confer Statement, #11 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #7 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (Fairbairn, Grant)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery #6 Motion to Expedite. (Fairbairn, Grant)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Expedite filed by Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc..(Fairbairn, Grant)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration of Grant D Fairbairn in Support of #6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - P)(Fairbairn, Grant)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fairbairn, Grant)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Fairbairn, Grant)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A., Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.. (Fairbairn, Grant)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/6/2018. (CLB)
September 3, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Frederic Bianco, Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Does, Marcel Peters, Piet Van Ryckeghem, Eric Ziani. (AKL)
September 3, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18cv2556 DSD/TNL. (AKL)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. as Personal Representative of the Estate of Prince Rogers Nelson, Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.. (Friedemann, Lora)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6344578) filed by Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc., Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. as Personal Representative of the Estate of Prince Rogers Nelson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-K, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Friedemann, Lora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Ziani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ziani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piet Van Ryckeghem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcel Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-20 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic Bianco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 4-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paisley Park Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Lora Mitchell Friedemann
Represented By: Barbara Marchevsky
Represented By: Grant D Fairbairn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A. as Personal Representative of the Estate of Prince Rogers Nelson
Represented By: Lora Mitchell Friedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank & Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Lora Mitchell Friedemann
Represented By: Barbara Marchevsky
Represented By: Grant D Fairbairn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?