Worell et al v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: William R. Worrell, Judy S. Worell and Judy S. Worrell
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01788
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DOCUMENT SHOULD NOT HAVE BEEN FILED ON ECF. REPORT re #8 Report Rule 16 WORKSHEET by Judy S. Worrell, William R. Worrell. (Peterson, Colin) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (MKB).
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 26(f) Report by Judy S. Worrell, William R. Worrell. (Peterson, Colin) Modified event/text on 9/5/2019 (MKB).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 9/9/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint filed by Walgreen Co.. (Burke, Michael)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Burke on behalf of Walgreen Co.. (Burke, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants. filed by William R. Worrell, Judy S Worrell. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service Exhibit A) (Peterson, Colin)
July 10, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1788 (DWF/SER). (MMP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury, #2 Certificate of Service) (Wood, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6984098) filed by Walgreen Co.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) Summons & Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wood, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Worell et al v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Worrell
Represented By: Brandon Thompson
Represented By: Colin Flynn Peterson
Represented By: Esther Agbaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy S. Worell
Represented By: Brandon Thompson
Represented By: Colin Flynn Peterson
Represented By: Esther Agbaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy S. Worrell
Represented By: Brandon Thompson
Represented By: Colin Flynn Peterson
Represented By: Esther Agbaje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Brian A Wood
Represented By: Michael T. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?