Occhino v. Geo, Sherman and Assoc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Leo Occhino
Defendant: MN State Judge John B. Schultee, Brent Malvick, State of MN, Geo, Sherman and Assoc., Holly LaBoone Haller and Geo. Sherman and Assoc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02546
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 35 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Richard Leo Occhino filed by Richard Leo Occhino, #1 Complaint, filed by Richard Leo Occhino. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/15/2019. (JLB)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/15/2019. (JLB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 33 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 11/8/2019 (MKB).
November 5, 2019 Filing 32 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 11/7/2019 (MKB).
November 4, 2019 Filing 31 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino. Document restricted per LIB Chambers due to financial identifiers. (MKB) Document QC'd on 11/7/2019 (MKB).
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 11/7/2019 (MKB).
October 28, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (MTP) Document QC'd on 10/30/2019 (MKB).
October 28, 2019 Filing 28 REQUEST for assistance in finding temporary winter shelter filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #1 Exhibit(s)) (MTP). Document QC'd by KMH on 10/30/2019 (KMH).
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST to remove jury demand filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Modified text on 10/23/2019 (MTP). Document QC'd by KMH on 10/30/2019 (KMH).
October 22, 2019 Filing 26 REQUEST for Possible Temporary Winter Shelter filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(lmb) Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
October 16, 2019 Filing 25 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (MTP) Document restricted per ECT Chambers due to personal data. Modified text on 10/16/2019 (lmb). Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
October 15, 2019 Filing 24 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
October 15, 2019 Filing 23 EXHIBIT re: #22 Letter to the Court filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Modified text on 10/15/2019 (MTP). Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
October 10, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
October 7, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Richard Leo Occhino. (MTP) RESTRICTED PER JUDGE TOSTRUD'S CHAMBERS. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/30/2019 (KMH).
October 4, 2019 Filing 19 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/30/2019 (KMH).
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBIT re: #16 Letter to the Court filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT of Duluth MN City Hall Medical Incident on 9/27/2019 filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MTP). Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Leo Occhino. Please send all mail to: Richard L. Occhino - General Delivery, Duluth, MN 55806-9999. (MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER REQUESTING case be moved up or heard soon filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re: #9 Motion filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (MTP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2019: #1 Envelope) (MTP). Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH).
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #6 Letter to the Court filed by Richard Leo Occhino.(MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER TO THE COURT filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (MTP) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (MTP). Modified text on 10/1/2019 (MTP). Document QC'd on 10/22/2019 (MKB).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ADDITIONAL STATEMENT OF CASE re #1 Complaint filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (MTP) Document QC'd on 10/9/2019 (MKB).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBITS 1-2 re #1 Complaint filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(kt) Document QC'd on 9/19/2019 (MKB). Modified text on 9/20/2019 (MTP).
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO THE COURT re #1 Complaint filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (kt) Document QC'd on 9/19/2019 (MKB). Modified text on 9/20/2019 (MTP).
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Richard Leo Occhino. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MKB)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geo, Sherman and Assoc., Holly LaBoone Haller, Brent Malvick, John B. Schultee, State of MN filed by Richard Leo Occhino. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (5th - Civil Housing Accomadations/ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) cc: Occhino. (MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Occhino v. Geo, Sherman and Assoc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Leo Occhino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MN State Judge John B. Schultee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Malvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of MN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo, Sherman and Assoc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly LaBoone Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo. Sherman and Assoc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?