Target Corporation v. ACE American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation and Target Corporation
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation, ACE American Insurance Company and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02916
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 18 Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Target Corporation's REPLY to Counterclaim by ACE American Insurance Company and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company filed by Target Corporation. (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Redacted Exhibit B re #1 Complaint,. (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Redacted Exhibit A re #1 Complaint,. (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Target Corporation. filed by ACE American Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co.. (Spevacek, Charles)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner for Target Corporation; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David B Goodwin for Target Corporation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/13/2019. (NAH)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: the Court grants Plaintiff's request #10 . Plaintiffs shall file the redacted copies on or before December 20, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/12/2019. (TJB)
December 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Goodwin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7329578 filed by Target Corporation. (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gretchen Hoff Varner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7329575 filed by Target Corporation. (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Target Corporation re #9 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court Plaintiff's Response and Request for Extension of Time to Comply. (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/9/2019. (TJB)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Target Corporation re #6 Exhibit, #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Upon Defendant ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Target Corporation re #6 Exhibit, #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Upon Defendant ACE American Insurance Company (Vats-Fournier, Mira)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit A to Complaint (filed in accordance with the Court's Order, Dkt. 5) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit B to Complaint)(Vats-Fournier, Mira)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER in Response to request by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/20/2019. (KAR)
November 19, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David B. Goodwin, Gretchen Hoff Varner as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACE American Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co.. (kt)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2916 WMW/DTS. (kt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Jury Trial Demanded) against ACE American Insurance Company, ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7277736) filed by Target Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vats-Fournier, Mira) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Target Corporation v. ACE American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation
Represented By: Mira Vats-Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Target Corporation
Represented By: Mira Vats-Fournier
Represented By: Gretchen Ann Hoff Varner
Represented By: David B Goodwin
Represented By: John B Lunseth, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles E Spevacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Charles E Spevacek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?