Sheehan et al v. Viking River Cruises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Sheehan and Timothy Sheehan
Defendant: Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD and Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00753
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Cragg, Daniel)
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation. (Otten, W)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion by Mary Sheehan, Timothy Sheehan. (Otten, W)
April 23, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc..(Cragg, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Stephan Erbe in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Cragg, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Stephanie Maldonado in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Cragg, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cragg, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc..(Cragg, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Cragg, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. (Cragg, Daniel)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation. Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD answer due 4/23/2020; Viking River Cruises, Inc. answer due 4/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/14/2020. (TJB)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Cragg, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Timothy Sheehan and Mary Sheehan. (Cragg, Daniel)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD answer due 4/9/2020; Viking River Cruises, Inc. answer due 4/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/30/2020. (TJB)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Cragg, Daniel)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Timothy Sheehan and Mary Sheehan. (Cragg, Daniel)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. (Cragg, Daniel)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-753 WMW/DTS. (CLK)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7576777) filed by Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD, Viking River Cruises, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cragg, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheehan et al v. Viking River Cruises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sheehan
Represented By: W Paul Otten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sheehan
Represented By: W Paul Otten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Ocean Cruises II LTD
Represented By: Daniel J Cragg
Represented By: Vince C Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking River Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J Cragg
Represented By: Vince C Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?