Minnesota Voters Alliance et al v. City of Minneapolis
Plaintiff: Ronald Moey, Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Marissa Skaja and Minnesota Voters Alliance
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Case Number: 0:2020cv02049
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief - Jury Trial Demanded against City of Minneapolis. filed by Minnesota Voters Alliance, Charles R. Halverson, Marissa Skaja, Ronald Moey, Blair L. Johnson. No summons requested. (Kaardal, Erick)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER on #26 Stipulation. City of Minneapolis answer due 11/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/27/2020. (HAM)
October 26, 2020 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 Stipulation. (Marttila, Kristen)
October 26, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by City of Minneapolis. Jointly Signed by Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja, Charles R. Halverson, and Blair L. Johnson. (Marttila, Kristen)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW &ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/16/2020. (GRR)
October 14, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by City of Minneapolis . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Supplemental Authority)(Marttila, Kristen)
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by City of Minneapolis . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Supplemental Authority)(Marttila, Kristen)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 01:00 PM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Michael J. Davis is CANCELLED. The Motion for Temporary Restraining Order will be ruled on the papers. (GRR)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 Declaration of Erick G. Kaardal in Support of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B (part 1), #3 Exhibit(s) B (part 2), #4 Exhibit(s) C)(Kaardal, Erick)
October 12, 2020 Filing 20 Reply to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kaardal, Erick)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Grace Wachlarowicz in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by City of Minneapolis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Nauen, Charles)
October 9, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Kristen G. Marttila in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by City of Minneapolis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J)(Nauen, Charles)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by City of Minneapolis. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nauen, Charles)
October 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE: Remote Public Access to #15 Motion Hearing on 10/15/2020 at 1:00 PM. To obtain the dial-in instructions, contact Gerri Rishel at 612-664-5070. (GRR)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 01:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Michael J. Davis. (Kaardal, Erick)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen G Marttila on behalf of City of Minneapolis. (Marttila, Kristen)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Zoll on behalf of City of Minneapolis. (Zoll, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles N Nauen on behalf of City of Minneapolis. (Nauen, Charles)
September 29, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #7 Motion for TRO. (Kaardal, Erick)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Declaration of Erick G. Kaardal in Support of #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Kaardal, Erick)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kaardal, Erick)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Kaardal, Erick)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja. (Kaardal, Erick)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory P Sautter on behalf of City of Minneapolis. (Sautter, Gregory)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. Declaration of Erick G. Kaardal in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson, Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex C, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex D)(Kaardal, Erick) Modified text on 9/29/2020 (MKB).
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Minnesota Voters Alliance. ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE - (Attachments: ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #1 Errata Notice of Hearing, ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #2 Errata TRO Memorandum, ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate,ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #4 Errata Declaration of Erick G. Kaardal,ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #5 Exhibit(s) Ex A, ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #6 Exhibit(s) Ex B, ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #7 Exhibit(s) Ex C, ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #8 Exhibit(s) Ex D, ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE #9 Exhibit(s) Ex E)(Kaardal, Erick) Modified text on 9/25/2020 (MMP). Modified text on 9/29/2020 (MKB).
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Minneapolis. (MTP)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-02049 MJD/TNL. (MTP)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Minneapolis (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8085001) filed by Minnesota Voters Alliance, Ronald Moey, Marissa Skaja, Charles R. Halverson, Blair L. Johnson . Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kaardal, Erick) Modified text on 9/24/2020 (MTP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minnesota Voters Alliance et al v. City of Minneapolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Moey
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles R. Halverson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair L. Johnson
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Skaja
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Voters Alliance
Represented By: Erick G Kaardal
Represented By: William F Mohrman
Represented By: Gregory M Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Minneapolis
Represented By: Kristen G Marttila
Represented By: Charles N Nauen
Represented By: David J Zoll
Represented By: Gregory P Sautter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?