Arndt et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Ferguson, Ahrens Dederscheck, Ernest Cano, Waren Kilburn, Anthony Wyatt, Luis Renteria, Quinton Gainey, Raymond Frasch, Bernard Bell, Kenneth Bryant, Donald White, Ernest Muller, William Davis, Brent Slone, Steve Bareis, Jacqueline Arndt, Henry Sumrall, Jeremy Leatherberry, Brian Groves, Raymond Yaeger, Michael Calhoun, Wendell Provow, Raymond Johnson, Raymond Tomblin, Kevin Nugent, Karl Fukuda, Steven Clemen, Alex Roman, Bryan Wenzel, Joey Newby, Marcus Rodgiruez, Andrew Turturici, Dejuan Jackson, Joshua Rosing, Nicholas McCoy, Katherine Grubb, Jeffrey Van Eyck, Ben Rusch, Timothy Breen, John Kelly, Amy Smith, Eddie Holtzclaw, Ricky Hagen, Reginald Kinnaman, Joey Choate, Kevin Kidd, Matthew Reeder, Sandra Muehlbauer, Anthony Titel, Christopher Walker, Laura Ramirez, Tiffany Sims, Cain Robberson, Toby Mulholland, Loutf Hussain, Robert Rayburn, Thomas Purtee, Bryan Billiet, Joshua Rivas, Edwin Walden, Anton Gauna, Brian Lacelle, Jonathan Bradley, Eric Tiller, Todd Jones, Dwayne Carr, Gerardo Ramirez, David Downey, Joe Arner, Jose Rocha, Sherri Szydlowski, Wendy Plantz, Jeff Hays, Donald Thomas, Miguel Rodriguez, Vincent Commisso, Christopher Chaffin, Todd Hanevik, John McIntyre, Jimmy Thornell, Jamar Lee, Joel McKinney, Terry Cooper, Randy McDonald, James Calhoun, Jason Gomez, Kevin Driggars, Iris Callegan, Rickie Lantz, Jamie Threlkeld, Bart Mowen, Doug Totton, Arturo Rivas, Randall Seay and Ibrahim Yoldash
Defendant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02089
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacqueline Arndt, Joe Arner, Steve Bareis, Bernard Bell, Bryan Billiet, Jonathan Bradley, Timothy Breen, Kenneth Bryant, James Calhoun, Michael Calhoun, Iris Callegan, Ernest Cano, Dwayne Carr, Christopher Chaffin, Joey Choate, Steven Clemen, Vincent Commisso, Terry Cooper, William Davis, Ahrens Dederscheck, David Downey, Kevin Driggars, Jeffrey Van Eyck, Timothy Ferguson, Karl Fukuda, Quinton Gainey, Anton Gauna, Jason Gomez, Brian Groves, Katherine Grubb, Ricky Hagen, Todd Hanevik, Jeff Hays, Eddie Holtzclaw, Loutf Hussain, Dejuan Jackson, Raymond Johnson, Todd Jones, John Kelly, Kevin Kidd, Waren Kilburn, Reginald Kinnaman, Brian Lacelle, Rickie Lantz, Jeremy Leatherberry, Jamar Lee, Nicholas McCoy, Randy McDonald, John McIntyre, Joel McKinney, Bart Mowen, Sandra Muehlbauer, Toby Mulholland, Ernest Muller, Joey Newby, Kevin Nugent, Wendy Plantz, Wendell Provow, Thomas Purtee, Gerardo Ramirez, Laura Ramirez, Robert Rayburn, Matthew Reeder, Luis Renteria, Arturo Rivas, Joshua Rivas, Cain Robberson, Jose Rocha, Marcus Rodgiruez, Miguel Rodriguez, Alex Roman, Joshua Rosing, Ben Rusch, Randall Seay, Tiffany Sims, Brent Slone, Amy Smith, Henry Sumrall, Sherri Szydlowski, Donald Thomas, Jimmy Thornell, Jamie Threlkeld, Eric Tiller, Anthony Titel, Raymond Tomblin, Doug Totton, Andrew Turturici, Edwin Walden, Christopher Walker, Bryan Wenzel, Donald White, Anthony Wyatt, Raymond Yaeger, Ibrahim Yoldash. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 20 Declaration of Benjamin W. Hulse in Support of Defendants' Omnibus Opposition to Plaintiffs' #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-R)(Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/3/2020 (MMP).
November 3, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacqueline Arndt, Joe Arner, Steve Bareis, Bernard Bell, Bryan Billiet, Jonathan Bradley, Timothy Breen, Kenneth Bryant, James Calhoun, Michael Calhoun, Iris Callegan, Ernest Cano, Dwayne Carr, Christopher Chaffin, Joey Choate, Steven Clemen, Vincent Commisso, Terry Cooper, William Davis, Ahrens Dederscheck, David Downey, Kevin Driggars, Jeffrey Van Eyck, Timothy Ferguson, Karl Fukuda, Quinton Gainey, Anton Gauna, Jason Gomez, Brian Groves, Katherine Grubb, Ricky Hagen, Todd Hanevik, Jeff Hays, Eddie Holtzclaw, Loutf Hussain, Dejuan Jackson, Raymond Johnson, Todd Jones, John Kelly, Kevin Kidd, Waren Kilburn, Reginald Kinnaman, Brian Lacelle, Rickie Lantz, Jeremy Leatherberry, Jamar Lee, Nicholas McCoy, Randy McDonald, John McIntyre, Joel McKinney, Bart Mowen, Sandra Muehlbauer, Toby Mulholland, Ernest Muller, Joey Newby, Kevin Nugent, Wendy Plantz, Wendell Provow, Thomas Purtee, Gerardo Ramirez, Laura Ramirez, Robert Rayburn, Matthew Reeder, Luis Renteria, Arturo Rivas, Joshua Rivas, Cain Robberson, Jose Rocha, Marcus Rodgiruez, Miguel Rodriguez, Alex Roman, Joshua Rosing, Ben Rusch, Randall Seay, Tiffany Sims, Brent Slone, Amy Smith, Henry Sumrall, Sherri Szydlowski, Donald Thomas, Jimmy Thornell, Jamie Threlkeld, Eric Tiller, Anthony Titel, Raymond Tomblin, Doug Totton, Andrew Turturici, Edwin Walden, Christopher Walker, Bryan Wenzel, Donald White, Anthony Wyatt, Raymond Yaeger, Ibrahim Yoldash.(Gustafson, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion to Remand to State Court,,,,,, filed by Jacqueline Arndt, Joe Arner, Steve Bareis, Bernard Bell, Bryan Billiet, Jonathan Bradley, Timothy Breen, Kenneth Bryant, James Calhoun, Michael Calhoun, Iris Callegan, Ernest Cano, Dwayne Carr, Christopher Chaffin, Joey Choate, Steven Clemen, Vincent Commisso, Terry Cooper, William Davis, Ahrens Dederscheck, David Downey, Kevin Driggars, Jeffrey Van Eyck, Timothy Ferguson, Karl Fukuda, Quinton Gainey, Anton Gauna, Jason Gomez, Brian Groves, Katherine Grubb, Ricky Hagen, Todd Hanevik, Jeff Hays, Eddie Holtzclaw, Loutf Hussain, Dejuan Jackson, Raymond Johnson, Todd Jones, John Kelly, Kevin Kidd, Waren Kilburn, Reginald Kinnaman, Brian Lacelle, Rickie Lantz, Jeremy Leatherberry, Jamar Lee, Nicholas McCoy, Randy McDonald, John McIntyre, Joel McKinney, Bart Mowen, Sandra Muehlbauer, Toby Mulholland, Ernest Muller, Joey Newby, Kevin Nugent, Wendy Plantz, Wendell Provow, Thomas Purtee, Gerardo Ramirez, Laura Ramirez, Robert Rayburn, Matthew Reeder, Luis Renteria, Arturo Rivas, Joshua Rivas, Cain Robberson, Jose Rocha, Marcus Rodgiruez, Miguel Rodriguez, Alex Roman, Joshua Rosing, Ben Rusch, Randall Seay, Tiffany Sims, Brent Slone, Amy Smith, Henry Sumrall, Sherri Szydlowski, Donald Thomas, Jimmy Thornell, Jamie Threlkeld, Eric Tiller, Anthony Titel, Raymond Tomblin, Doug Totton, Andrew Turturici, Edwin Walden, Christopher Walker, Bryan Wenzel, Donald White, Anthony Wyatt, Raymond Yaeger, Ibrahim Yoldash.(Gustafson, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacqueline Arndt, Joe Arner, Steve Bareis, Bernard Bell, Bryan Billiet, Jonathan Bradley, Timothy Breen, Kenneth Bryant, James Calhoun, Michael Calhoun, Iris Callegan, Ernest Cano, Dwayne Carr, Christopher Chaffin, Joey Choate, Steven Clemen, Vincent Commisso, Terry Cooper, William Davis, Ahrens Dederscheck, David Downey, Kevin Driggars, Jeffrey Van Eyck, Timothy Ferguson, Karl Fukuda, Quinton Gainey, Anton Gauna, Jason Gomez, Brian Groves, Katherine Grubb, Ricky Hagen, Todd Hanevik, Jeff Hays, Eddie Holtzclaw, Loutf Hussain, Dejuan Jackson, Raymond Johnson, Todd Jones, John Kelly, Kevin Kidd, Waren Kilburn, Reginald Kinnaman, Brian Lacelle, Rickie Lantz, Jeremy Leatherberry, Jamar Lee, Nicholas McCoy, Randy McDonald, John McIntyre, Joel McKinney, Bart Mowen, Sandra Muehlbauer, Toby Mulholland, Ernest Muller, Joey Newby, Kevin Nugent, Wendy Plantz, Wendell Provow, Thomas Purtee, Gerardo Ramirez, Laura Ramirez, Robert Rayburn, Matthew Reeder, Luis Renteria, Arturo Rivas, Joshua Rivas, Cain Robberson, Jose Rocha, Marcus Rodgiruez, Miguel Rodriguez, Alex Roman, Joshua Rosing, Ben Rusch, Randall Seay, Tiffany Sims, Brent Slone, Amy Smith, Henry Sumrall, Sherri Szydlowski, Donald Thomas, Jimmy Thornell, Jamie Threlkeld, Eric Tiller, Anthony Titel, Raymond Tomblin, Doug Totton, Andrew Turturici, Edwin Walden, Christopher Walker, Bryan Wenzel, Donald White, Anthony Wyatt, Raymond Yaeger, Ibrahim Yoldash. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jacqueline Arndt, Joe Arner, Steve Bareis, Bernard Bell, Bryan Billiet, Jonathan Bradley, Timothy Breen, Kenneth Bryant, James Calhoun, Michael Calhoun, Iris Callegan, Ernest Cano, Dwayne Carr, Christopher Chaffin, Joey Choate, Steven Clemen, Vincent Commisso, Terry Cooper, William Davis, Ahrens Dederscheck, David Downey, Kevin Driggars, Jeffrey Van Eyck, Timothy Ferguson, Karl Fukuda, Quinton Gainey, Anton Gauna, Jason Gomez, Brian Groves, Katherine Grubb, Ricky Hagen, Todd Hanevik, Jeff Hays, Eddie Holtzclaw, Loutf Hussain, Dejuan Jackson, Raymond Johnson, Todd Jones, John Kelly, Kevin Kidd, Waren Kilburn, Reginald Kinnaman, Brian Lacelle, Rickie Lantz, Jeremy Leatherberry, Jamar Lee, Nicholas McCoy, Randy McDonald, John McIntyre, Joel McKinney, Bart Mowen, Sandra Muehlbauer, Toby Mulholland, Ernest Muller, Joey Newby, Kevin Nugent, Wendy Plantz, Wendell Provow, Thomas Purtee, Gerardo Ramirez, Laura Ramirez, Robert Rayburn, Matthew Reeder, Luis Renteria, Arturo Rivas, Joshua Rivas, Cain Robberson, Jose Rocha, Marcus Rodgiruez, Miguel Rodriguez, Alex Roman, Joshua Rosing, Ben Rusch, Randall Seay, Tiffany Sims, Brent Slone, Amy Smith, Henry Sumrall, Sherri Szydlowski, Donald Thomas, Jimmy Thornell, Jamie Threlkeld, Eric Tiller, Anthony Titel, Raymond Tomblin, Doug Totton, Andrew Turturici, Edwin Walden, Christopher Walker, Bryan Wenzel, Donald White, Anthony Wyatt, Raymond Yaeger, Ibrahim Yoldash. (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING Raymond Frasch. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/23/2020.(KKM)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Michael B. Terry, David G.H. Brackett, Matthew R. Sellers as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal for Plaintiff Raymond Frasch Without Prejudice by Raymond Frasch. Jointly Signed by 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC. (Gustafson, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 Defendants' 3M Company and Aearo Technologies, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMG)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2089 JRT/KMM. (MMG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8105228) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arndt et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ferguson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahrens Dederscheck
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Cano
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waren Kilburn
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Wyatt
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Renteria
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinton Gainey
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Frasch
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Bell
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bryant
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald White
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Muller
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Davis
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Slone
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Bareis
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Arndt
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Sumrall
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Leatherberry
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Groves
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Yaeger
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Calhoun
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Provow
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Johnson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Tomblin
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Nugent
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karl Fukuda
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Clemen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Roman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Wenzel
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Newby
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Rodgiruez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Turturici
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dejuan Jackson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rosing
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas McCoy
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Grubb
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Van Eyck
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Rusch
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Breen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kelly
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Smith
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Holtzclaw
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Hagen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Kinnaman
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey Choate
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kidd
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Reeder
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Muehlbauer
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Titel
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Walker
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ramirez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Sims
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cain Robberson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby Mulholland
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loutf Hussain
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rayburn
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Purtee
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Billiet
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rivas
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Walden
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Gauna
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lacelle
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bradley
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Tiller
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Jones
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Carr
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Ramirez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Downey
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Arner
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Rocha
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Szydlowski
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Plantz
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Hays
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Rodriguez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Commisso
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Chaffin
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hanevik
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McIntyre
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Thornell
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamar Lee
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel McKinney
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cooper
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy McDonald
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Calhoun
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Gomez
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Driggars
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Callegan
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie Lantz
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Threlkeld
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Mowen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Totton
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Rivas
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Seay
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ibrahim Yoldash
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Karla M Gluek
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?