Bolotin et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Lunsford, Shamailla White, Oliver Bolotin, Daniel Taylor, Kenya Clinton, Steven Yorkey, Curtis King, Henry Jepsen, Clarence Gallinger, Kenny Irizarry, Glenn Collins, Joseph Moriarty, Nichalaus Franco, Charles Wilkerson, Anthony Brazil, Benjamin El, Jeffrey Bradley, David Riggins, William Smith, Lawanda Drayton, Jason Vaughan, Alan McKittrick, Sergio Flores, Donald Tapley, Bobby Davis, Gino Socciarelli, Maurice Saxton, Todd Wilson, Raymond Lapollo, Theron Graham, Frank Segoviano, Jr., Kelvin Robinson and Guadalupe Sandoval
Defendant: 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv02481
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Oliver Bolotin, Jeffrey Bradley, Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Glenn Collins, Bobby Davis, Lawanda Drayton, Benjamin El, Sergio Flores, Nichalaus Franco, Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Kenny Irizarry, Henry Jepsen, Curtis King, Raymond Lapollo, Lisa Lunsford, Alan McKittrick, Joseph Moriarty, David Riggins, Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Maurice Saxton, Frank Segoviano, Jr, William Smith, Gino Socciarelli, Donald Tapley, Daniel Taylor, Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Charles Wilkerson, Todd Wilson, Steven Yorkey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
January 13, 2021 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-K)(Hulse, Benjamin)
January 13, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
December 23, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Oliver Bolotin, Jeffrey Bradley, Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Glenn Collins, Bobby Davis, Lawanda Drayton, Benjamin El, Sergio Flores, Nichalaus Franco, Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Kenny Irizarry, Henry Jepsen, Curtis King, Raymond Lapollo, Lisa Lunsford, Alan McKittrick, Joseph Moriarty, David Riggins, Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Maurice Saxton, Frank Segoviano, Jr, William Smith, Gino Socciarelli, Donald Tapley, Daniel Taylor, Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Charles Wilkerson, Todd Wilson, Steven Yorkey.(Gustafson, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Remand to State Court,, filed by Oliver Bolotin, Jeffrey Bradley, Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Glenn Collins, Bobby Davis, Lawanda Drayton, Benjamin El, Sergio Flores, Nichalaus Franco, Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Kenny Irizarry, Henry Jepsen, Curtis King, Raymond Lapollo, Lisa Lunsford, Alan McKittrick, Joseph Moriarty, David Riggins, Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Maurice Saxton, Frank Segoviano, Jr, William Smith, Gino Socciarelli, Donald Tapley, Daniel Taylor, Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Charles Wilkerson, Todd Wilson, Steven Yorkey.(Gustafson, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Oliver Bolotin, Jeffrey Bradley, Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Glenn Collins, Bobby Davis, Lawanda Drayton, Benjamin El, Sergio Flores, Nichalaus Franco, Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Kenny Irizarry, Henry Jepsen, Curtis King, Raymond Lapollo, Lisa Lunsford, Alan McKittrick, Joseph Moriarty, David Riggins, Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Maurice Saxton, Frank Segoviano, Jr, William Smith, Gino Socciarelli, Donald Tapley, Daniel Taylor, Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Charles Wilkerson, Todd Wilson, Steven Yorkey. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gustafson, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Gustafson, Daniel)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Oliver Bolotin, Jeffrey Bradley, Anthony Brazil, Kenya Clinton, Glenn Collins, Bobby Davis, Lawanda Drayton, Benjamin El, Sergio Flores, Nichalaus Franco, Clarence Gallinger, Theron Graham, Kenny Irizarry, Henry Jepsen, Curtis King, Raymond Lapollo, Lisa Lunsford, Alan McKittrick, Joseph Moriarty, David Riggins, Kelvin Robinson, Guadalupe Sandoval, Maurice Saxton, Frank Segoviano, Jr, William Smith, Gino Socciarelli, Donald Tapley, Daniel Taylor, Jason Vaughan, Shamailla White, Charles Wilkerson, Todd Wilson, Steven Yorkey. (Gustafson, Daniel)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 12/15/2020 (MKB).
December 10, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2481 (JRT/KMM). (MMP)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8285140) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolotin et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lunsford
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamailla White
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Bolotin
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Taylor
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya Clinton
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Yorkey
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis King
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Jepsen
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Gallinger
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Irizarry
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Collins
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Moriarty
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichalaus Franco
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Wilkerson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Brazil
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin El
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Bradley
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Riggins
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda Drayton
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Vaughan
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan McKittrick
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Flores
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Tapley
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Davis
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gino Socciarelli
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Saxton
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Wilson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lapollo
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theron Graham
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Segoviano, Jr.
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Robinson
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Sandoval
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?