Bliven et al v. 3M company et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Smith, Shawn Thackrah, Larry Moreno, Mark Bliven, Anthony Boykins, Jose Moran, Ector Saldias, William Brickhouse, Vincent Bruccheri, Usbaldo Munoz, Virgil Harris, Charles Johnson, Brett Burrows, William Khazaal, Robert Green, Cade Dixon, Higinio Casiano, Starlin Rogers, Michael Mansisidor, Kyle Kennedy, Jose Gonzales, Travis Brookshire, Dallas Wicker, Michael Carlisle, Justin Wilcox, Robert Johnson, Christopher Passmore, Charles Nazarene, Dwayne Burrow, Vicente Griego, Thomas Hues, Jessica Bowden, Robert Tidwell, Henry Fernandez, Stephen Crane, Tyler Stricker, Juan Luciow, Nicholas Miller, Manuel Vargas, Matthew Hill, Bobby Fulton, Craig Callaway, Jerome Lauzon, Dennis Chilcote, Luis Maciel and Felicia Ramirez
Defendant: 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC and Aearo Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 0:2021cv00908
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A- M)(Hulse, Benjamin)
May 24, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hulse, Benjamin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mark Bliven.(Williams, Amanda)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #7 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Mark Bliven.(Williams, Amanda)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mark Bliven. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Williams, Amanda)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Williams, Amanda)
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by all plaintiffs. (Williams, Amanda) Modified text on 5/3/2021 (MKB).
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 Defendants 3M Company and Aearo Technologies LLC's ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MMP)
April 1, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-908 (JRT/KMM). (MMP)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8655557) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 4/1/2021 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bliven et al v. 3M company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Smith
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Thackrah
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Moreno
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bliven
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Boykins
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Moran
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ector Saldias
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brickhouse
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Bruccheri
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Usbaldo Munoz
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Harris
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Burrows
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Khazaal
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Green
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cade Dixon
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Higinio Casiano
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starlin Rogers
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mansisidor
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Kennedy
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzales
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Brookshire
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Wicker
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carlisle
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wilcox
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Passmore
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Nazarene
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Burrow
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicente Griego
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hues
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Bowden
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tidwell
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Fernandez
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Crane
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Stricker
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Luciow
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Miller
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Vargas
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hill
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Fulton
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Callaway
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Lauzon
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Chilcote
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Maciel
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Ramirez
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Represented By: William R Sieben
Represented By: Amanda M Williams
Represented By: Matthew James Barber
Represented By: Daniel E Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Represented By: Jerry W Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aearo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?