Riddle v. Sherburne County et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Riddle
Defendant: Sherburne County, Sherburne County Jail, Joel Brott, Brian Frank, Diana VanDerBeek, Melissa Burgess, Sherburne County Jail Medical Dept., Anoka County, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse, Scott Wilson, Matt Hanson, Kurt Wosmek, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse Nursing Director, Jenn Simler, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse Medical Staff/Dept, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care Medical Staff, Sherburne County Jail Medical Staff, Scot Wilson, Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The and Anoka County Corrections Workhouse Medical Staff
Case Number: 0:2022cv00464
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Riddle. Anoka County served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022; Anoka County Corrections Workhouse Medical Staff served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022; Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022; Matt Hanson served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022; Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022; Scot Wilson served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022; Kurt Wosmek served on 4/21/2022, answer due 5/12/2022. (Ratkowski, Nicholas)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/5/2022. (EB)
May 4, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Joel Brott, Brian Frank, Sherburne County, Sherburne County Jail. (Hiveley, Jason)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The, Jenn Simler, Diana VanDerBeek.(Novak, Anthony)
May 3, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The, Jenn Simler, Diana VanDerBeek. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Novak, Anthony)
May 3, 2022 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The, Jenn Simler, Diana VanDerBeek.(Novak, Anthony)
May 3, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Novak, Anthony)
May 3, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The, Jenn Simler, Diana VanDerBeek. (Novak, Anthony)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jeremy Riddle. Joel Brott waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022; Brian Frank waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022; Sherburne County waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022; Sherburne County Jail waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 waiver of service form, #2 waiver of service form, #3 waiver of service form)(Ratkowski, Nicholas)
April 5, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Diana VanDerBeek. Diana VanDerBeek waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Novak, Anthony)
April 5, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jenn Simler. Jenn Simler waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Novak, Anthony)
March 30, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC. MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Novak, Anthony)
March 30, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Todd Leonard. Todd Leonard waiver sent on 3/4/2022, answer due 5/3/2022. (Novak, Anthony)
March 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor R McKenney on behalf of Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care Medical Staff, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC. (McKenney, Taylor)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Novak on behalf of Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care Medical Staff, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC. (Novak, Anthony)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anoka County Corrections Workhouse Medical Staff, Matt Hanson, Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care Medical Staff, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Jenn Simler, The Nursing Director at Anoka County Correctins & Workhouse, Kurt Wosmek. (KNK)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anoka County, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse, Joel Brott, Melissa Burgess, Brian Frank, Sherburne County, Sherburne County Jail, Sherburne County Jail Medical Staff, Diana VanDerBeek, Scot Wilson. (KNK)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-464 (JRT/TNL). (KNK)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anoka County, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse Medical Staff/Dept, Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse Nursing Director, Joel Brott, Melissa Burgess, Brian Frank, Matt Hanson, Todd Leonard, MEnD Correctional Care Medical Staff, MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC, Sherburne County, Sherburne County Jail, Sherburne County Jail Medical Dept., Jenn Simler, Diana VanDerBeek, Scott Wilson, Kurt Wosmek (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9341140) filed by Jeremy Riddle. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ratkowski, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riddle v. Sherburne County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Riddle
Represented By: Nicholas Ratkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Brott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana VanDerBeek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail Medical Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Wosmek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse Nursing Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenn Simler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka County Corrections and Workhouse Medical Staff/Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEnD Correctional Care, PLLC
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Leonard
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEnD Correctional Care Medical Staff
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Represented By: Taylor R McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherburne County Jail Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scot Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Director at Anoka County Corrections & Workouse, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anoka County Corrections Workhouse Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?