Alexander v. State of MN
Petitioner: Miyo M. Alexander
Respondent: State of MN
Case Number: 0:2022cv00740
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal, #2 Appeal Packet)(MMP)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Miyo M. Alexander. Case dismissed. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/18/2022.(HMA)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Schmidt on behalf of State of MN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Miyo M. Alexander filed by Miyo M. Alexander, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Miyo M. Alexander Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/29/2022. (TJB)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by State of MN Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Miyo M. Alexander. (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/22/2022 (MTB).
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Miyo M. Alexander. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s) Letter from Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/22/2022 (MTB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. State of MN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miyo M. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of MN
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?